Teferi et al v. Delta Air Lines, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Samson Teferi and Ruth Berhane
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc. and Mesaba Aviation, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv05926
Filed: November 20, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Airline Crash
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 11 Stipulation selecting Mediation (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
November 25, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Order Vacating Further Case Management Conference filed by Samson Teferi, Mesaba Aviation, Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., Ruth Berhane.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on November 25, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
February 7, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND VACATING PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2014 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/7/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
April 15, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING APRIL 17, 2014 MOTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 04/15/2014. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 24, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal With Prejudice as to Claim of Ruth Berhane, as an Individual, ONLY filed by Samson Teferi, Mesaba Aviation, Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., Ruth Berhane. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/23/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
June 2, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE re 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Order of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Samson Teferi, Mesaba Aviation, Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/2/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teferi et al v. Delta Air Lines, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samson Teferi
Represented By: Daniel Reid Price
Represented By: Howard Steven Burnside
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Berhane
Represented By: Daniel Reid Price
Represented By: Howard Steven Burnside
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Grotch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesaba Aviation, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Grotch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]