In re Reyna Alvarado

Trustee: E Lynn Schoenmann and Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF
Defendant: Judge Dennis Montali
Plaintiff: Albert M. Kun
Miscellaneous: U.S. Bankruptcy Court, No. District of CA (San Francisco)
Appellant: Reyna Alvarado
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv06190
Filed: December 6, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
 
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 4 Motion to Stay.(hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2013)
April 29, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSOLIDATING APPEALS. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/29/2013. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (vlk, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/29/2013 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING ORDERS OF THE BANKRUPTCY COURT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/29/2013. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (vlk, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/29/2013 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Hearing. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/7/2013. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (nah, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: In re Reyna Alvarado
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: E Lynn Schoenmann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF
Represented By: Kumar Vikas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Dennis Montali
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert M. Kun
Represented By: Albert Miklos Kun
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: U.S. Bankruptcy Court, No. District of CA (San Francisco)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Reyna Alvarado
Represented By: Albert Miklos Kun
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]