Internet Patents Corporation v. Tree.com Inc.

Defendant: Tree.com Inc.
Plaintiff: Internet Patents Corporation
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv06505
Filed: December 21, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/25/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
May 6, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 21 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TREE.COM, INC. TO FILE ITS RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/6/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
September 24, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 24, 2013. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
October 25, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/25/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Internet Patents Corporation v. Tree.com Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tree.com Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Internet Patents Corporation
Represented By: Michael Pierre Adams
Represented By: Brian Lawrence King
Represented By: L. Eric Loewe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]