Capitol Specialty Insurance Corp. v. Jenzeh et al

Defendant: Quantum Biotek Pty, Ltd., Michael Jenzeh, Stefanie Jenzeh and Omni Enviro, LLC
Plaintiff: Capitol Specialty Insurance Corp.
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00564
Filed: February 8, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANTS. Case Management Statement due by 6/12/2013. Case Management Conference set for 6/19/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/8/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
June 6, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 12 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE UPON DEFENDANTS JENZEH AND OMNI ENVIRO, LLC. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 6, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 13 REQUEST TO VACATE AND RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
August 8, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 20 Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Case Management Conference. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
September 26, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 25 Stipulation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
October 2, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Deeming Case to be Related to C-12-01809-RMW. The Clerk shall reassign case to Judge Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings. Judge Claudia Wilken is no longer assigned to the case. All hearings presently set before Judge Wilken are vacated. Parties are directed to re-notice any pending motions before Judge Whyte. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/2/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
November 18, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 34 Approving Stipulation to Stay Declaratory Action. Case is Stayed. Motions terminated: 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Regarding Case Management Conference and Motion to Dismiss or Stay filed by Capitol Spe cialty Insurance Corp., 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 30 Amended MOTION to Dismiss of Stay Stipulation to Extend Briefing Deadlines Re: Motion to Dismiss or Stay filed by Capitol Specialty Insurance Corp., 22 MO TION to Dismiss or Stay filed by Omni Enviro, LLC, Michael Jenzeh, Stefanie Jenzeh, 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Declaratory Action filed by Omni Enviro, LLC, Quantum Biotek Pty, Ltd., Michael Jenzeh, Capitol Specialty Insurance Corp., Stefanie Jenzeh, 30 Amended MOTION to Dismiss of Stay filed by Omni Enviro, LLC, Michael Jenzeh, Stefanie Jenzeh. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/18/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Capitol Specialty Insurance Corp. v. Jenzeh et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quantum Biotek Pty, Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Jenzeh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stefanie Jenzeh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omni Enviro, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capitol Specialty Insurance Corp.
Represented By: Jay Richard Graif
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]