Parents on Behalf of Student v. Santa Clara Unified School District

Plaintiff: Parents on Behalf of Student
Defendant: Santa Clara Unified School District
Case Number: 4:2013cv00733
Filed: February 19, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401 Education: Handicapped Child Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/18/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
July 19, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/19/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
September 30, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 JOINT STIPULATION TO VACATE OCTOBER 1, 2013, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR GOOD CAUSE. Case Management Conference continued to 11/19/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/30/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
May 1, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 4 Motion to Amend the Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parents on Behalf of Student v. Santa Clara Unified School District
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parents on Behalf of Student
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Clara Unified School District
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]