United States of America v. Suk

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Tim Suk
Case Number: 4:2013cv01089
Filed: March 11, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7609 IRS: Petition to Quash IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/12/2013 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
April 18, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/13/2013 11:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 5/23/2013.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/18/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
May 29, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING STATUS CONFERENCE.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/29/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Suk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael G. Pitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Suk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.