Gametek LLC v. Rockyou, Inc.

Plaintiff: Gametek LLC
Defendant: RockYou, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv01205
Filed: March 18, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Case referred to mediation. Markman hearing set for 2/5/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/18/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
September 27, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER TO ACCORD WITH THE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SCHEDULE IN RELATED CASES. Markman hearing set for 6/2/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/27/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
October 31, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO STAY PENDING FINAL INSTALLMENT PAYMENT OF SEPTEMBER 2, 2014, AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/31/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
September 3, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/3/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gametek LLC v. Rockyou, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gametek LLC
Represented By: Johnathan Yazdani
Represented By: Stephen F. Schlather
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RockYou, Inc.
Represented By: Julie S Turner
Represented By: Heather Lynn Thompson Potts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]