Branon v. United States of America

Respondent: United States of America
Petitioner: Mark Branon
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01350
Filed: March 26, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Bernardino
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: PSLC GRC
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
August 21, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING PETITIONERS 21 REQUEST TO PROCEED PRO SE AND DENYING 14 COUNSELS REQUEST FOR SUBSTITUTION. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 26, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/26/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
August 26, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/26/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Branon v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Branon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]