Corbin v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Defendant: Wells Fargo Insurance Services USA, Inc. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Douglas Corbin
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01353
Filed: March 26, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 20 Stipulation REgarding Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance Services USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/10/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
June 18, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation Regarding Future Filing Deadlines, dkt no. 35. Responses to Class Cert due by 4/18/2014. Replies to Class Cert due by 5/9/2014. Motion on Class Cert. Hearing set for 6/6/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Motion for Class Cert due by 3/14/2014.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/18/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
February 26, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 61 Stipulation To STay Case filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance Services USA, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2014. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 2/28/14 at 9:30 AM has been specially re-set for 4/11/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/26/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
April 9, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Extending Stay and Continuing CMC re 63 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/9/2014. (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
July 25, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING re 69 Status Report/Request to Vacate 8/1/14 Case Management Conference filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Insurance Services USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/25/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
July 30, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, signed 7/30/14, re 71 Letter filed by Douglas Corbin for Richard Kellner to appear by phone on 8/1/14 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/30/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
August 11, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/29/2014 at 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/11/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 27, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/27/14. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Corbin v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Insurance Services USA, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Corbin
Represented By: Richard L. Kellner
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Represented By: Shanon Jude Carson
Represented By: Patrick Fanning Madden
Represented By: Evan Michael Zucker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]