Groth-Hill Land Company, LLC et al v. General Motors, LLC et al

Defendant: Kevin Wrate, General Motors, LLC, Ally Financial Inc., Randy Parker, James Gentry, Inderjit Dosanjh and California Automotive Retailing Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Groth-Hill Land Company, LLC, Robin Hill, Joseph Hill and Crown Chevrolet
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01362
Filed: March 27, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2013 29 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Modifying Briefing Schedule for Motions to Dismiss and Consolidating Plaintiffs' Oppositions to Motions to Dismiss. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 4 8 13 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 4/23/2013. Replies due by 5/6/2013. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/15/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
June 27, 2013 50 Featured Case ORDER (as modified) Granting re 47 Defendants' Joint MOTION for Administrative Relief - Rescheduling of Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 8/19/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2013 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/26/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
July 23, 2013 52 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 4 Motion to Dismiss; granting 8 Motion to Dismiss; granting 13 Motion to Dismiss (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
August 7, 2013 55 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 11/18/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/25/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/07/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 26, 2013 63 Featured Case ORDER to appear at September 16, 2013 hearing. Plaintiffs Robin and Joseph Hill must personally attend the hearing on 57 Plaintiff's counsel's motion to withdraw. Plaintiff's counsel shall serve a copy of this order on Plaintiffs Groth-Hill Land Co., Robin Hill, and Joseph Hill and file a proof of service by 08/30/13. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/26/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
September 18, 2013 67 Featured Case ORDER Dismissing Certain Claims of Plaintiffs Groth-Hill Land Company, LLC, Joseph Hill, and Robin Hill; Granting 57 Michaels Law Group's MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs Groth-Hill Land Company, LLC, Joseph Hill, and Robin Hill. Groth-Hill Land Company, LLC, Robin Hill, and Joseph Hill terminated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/18/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
September 18, 2013 68 Featured Case ORDER Setting Deadline for filing an Amended Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 10/2/2013. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/18/13. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
October 31, 2013 78 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 1/17/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/30/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
October 31, 2013 79 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Modifying Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 74 and 75 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint . Responses due by 11/15/2013. Replies due by 11/27/2013. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/30/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
December 18, 2013 85 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/14/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/18/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
January 22, 2014 87 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 74 Motion to Dismiss and 75 Motion to Dismiss. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Groth-Hill Land Company, LLC et al v. General Motors, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Wrate
Represented By: Donald Hogan Cram, III
Represented By: Andrew S. Elliott
Represented By: Duane M. Geck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Richard Oxford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial Inc.
Represented By: Donald Hogan Cram, III
Represented By: Andrew S. Elliott
Represented By: Duane M. Geck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Parker
Represented By: Gregory Richard Oxford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gentry
Represented By: Gregory Richard Oxford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inderjit Dosanjh
Represented By: David C. Lee
Represented By: Ilse C. Scott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Automotive Retailing Group, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Lee
Represented By: Ilse C. Scott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Groth-Hill Land Company, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan A. Michaels
Represented By: Lisa S. Inouye
Represented By: Kathryn Jeanine Harvey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Hill
Represented By: Jonathan A. Michaels
Represented By: Lisa S. Inouye
Represented By: Kathryn Jeanine Harvey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Hill
Represented By: Jonathan A. Michaels
Represented By: Lisa S. Inouye
Represented By: Kathryn Jeanine Harvey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crown Chevrolet
Represented By: Kathryn Jeanine Harvey
Represented By: Lisa S. Inouye
Represented By: Jonathan A. Michaels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]