Thomason v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Ljuliet W. Thomason
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 4:2013cv01479
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO INFORM COURT WHETHER THEY CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/10/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
May 2, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Granting Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
May 5, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/5/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 7, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/7/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomason v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ljuliet W. Thomason
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.