Ball v. C.D.C.R. et al

Defendant: California Attorney General and C.D.C.R.
Plaintiff: Robert Lamar Ball
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01483
Filed: April 3, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: PSLC GRC
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2014 10 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
April 21, 2014 12 Featured Case JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 4/18/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
June 4, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert Lamar Ball. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/13/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
September 17, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/17/2013. Amended Complaint due by 10/15/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ball v. C.D.C.R. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Attorney General
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.D.C.R.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lamar Ball
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]