Alford v. American Red Cross Blood Services

Plaintiff: Sonya Alford
Defendant: American Red Cross Blood Services
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01499
Filed: April 3, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2013 11 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 10 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/13. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
September 4, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING ADR EXTENSION by Hon. William Alsup granting 18 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
October 17, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO COMPLETE ADR by Hon. William Alsup granting 20 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Alford v. American Red Cross Blood Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Alford
Represented By: Michael James Reed
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Red Cross Blood Services
Represented By: Kristin L. Oliveira
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]