Alpi International, Ltd. v. Prime Resources Corp.

Plaintiff: Alpi International, Ltd.
Defendant: Prime Resources Corp.
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01511
Filed: April 4, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY re 37 Status Report filed by Alpi International, Ltd. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/03/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 27, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE ENE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/27/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
March 3, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/03/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Alpi International, Ltd. v. Prime Resources Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alpi International, Ltd.
Represented By: Nicholas Ranallo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Resources Corp.
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Noel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]