Cedillo et al v. Transcor America LLC

Plaintiff: Terry Houston, Justin Wright, John Roussel, John Greenemeier, Alonzo Cleaves, Ruben Cedillo, Craig Arno and Leonard Hugall
Defendant: Transcor America, LLC
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01580
Filed: April 8, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
August 13, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/30/13 is continued to 10/11/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/13/13., Motions terminated: 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 7 Clerks Notice (to Continue Case Management Conference set for August 30, 2013) filed by Transcor America, LLC. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
August 27, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE 15 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
May 29, 2013 8 Featured Case JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cedillo et al v. Transcor America LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Houston
Represented By: Karen Leigh Snell
Represented By: Andrew Charles Schwartz
Represented By: Mark E. Merin, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Wright
Represented By: Karen Leigh Snell
Represented By: Andrew Charles Schwartz
Represented By: Mark E. Merin, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Roussel
Represented By: Karen Leigh Snell
Represented By: Andrew Charles Schwartz
Represented By: Mark E. Merin, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Greenemeier
Represented By: Karen Leigh Snell
Represented By: Andrew Charles Schwartz
Represented By: Mark E. Merin, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alonzo Cleaves
Represented By: Karen Leigh Snell
Represented By: Andrew Charles Schwartz
Represented By: Mark E. Merin, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Cedillo
Represented By: Karen Leigh Snell
Represented By: Andrew Charles Schwartz
Represented By: Mark E. Merin, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Arno
Represented By: Karen Leigh Snell
Represented By: Andrew Charles Schwartz
Represented By: Mark E. Merin, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Hugall
Represented By: Karen Leigh Snell
Represented By: Andrew Charles Schwartz
Represented By: Mark E. Merin, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transcor America, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]