Perkinelmer, Inc. et al v. Bruker Corporation

Plaintiff: Xenogen Corporation, Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Perkinelmer, Inc. and Caliper Life Sciences, Inc.
Defendant: Bruker Corporation
Case Number: 4:2013cv01602
Filed: April 9, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PATRICK J. O'SHEA PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 20, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
July 2, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference is rescheduled from July 12, 2013 to September 13, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 2, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
July 17, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 17, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
July 30, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 30, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkinelmer, Inc. et al v. Bruker Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xenogen Corporation
Represented By: Gabrielle Elizabeth Higgins
Represented By: Andrew Radsch
Represented By: Dalila Argaez Wendlandt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University
Represented By: Gabrielle Elizabeth Higgins
Represented By: Andrew Radsch
Represented By: Dalila Argaez Wendlandt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perkinelmer, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Radsch
Represented By: Dalila Argaez Wendlandt
Represented By: Gabrielle Elizabeth Higgins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caliper Life Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Gabrielle Elizabeth Higgins
Represented By: Andrew Radsch
Represented By: Dalila Argaez Wendlandt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruker Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]