Miller v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association

Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Plaintiff: Theresa Miller
Case Number: 4:2013cv01622
Filed: April 10, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REMAND AND CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/25/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
September 12, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/12/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
April 15, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Referring Case to ADR Unit for Assessment Telephone Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/15/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Kenneth Allen Franklin
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Miller
Represented By: Art Hoomiratana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.