Tomada et al v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Plaintiff: Gloria Santiago, Wilhelmina De Leon and Teresita Tomada
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01647
Filed: April 11, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/25/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
February 4, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO HAVE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS HEARD re 13 Case Management and Pretrial Order. Deadline for Dispositive Motions to be heard by Extended to Tuesday, March 25, 2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/4/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
May 14, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXCUSING PLAINTIFFS' APPEARANCE AT COMPLIANCE HEARING ON 5/16/2014. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/14/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
May 15, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL DATES. Pretrial Conference set for 6/6/2014 is CONTINUED to Friday, 7/25/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance Hearing re pretrial preparation set for 5/16/14 is CONTINUED to Friday, 7/3/2014 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/15/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
June 3, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 36 Motion for Summary Judgment as to all claims. A final Judgment in favor of defendant and against plaintiff shall issue separately. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/3/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Tomada et al v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Santiago
Represented By: Allan Alcon Villanueva
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilhelmina De Leon
Represented By: Allan Alcon Villanueva
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresita Tomada
Represented By: Allan Alcon Villanueva
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Jill Vogt Cartwright
Represented By: Kevin Durrell Reese
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]