Alsabur v. Autozone, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jowhar Alsabur
Defendant: Autozone, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01689
Filed: April 18, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2013 16 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ALLOW FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 15 Stipulation (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
October 7, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 20 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Jury Demand. Absent a joint stipulation for a jury trial, a bench trial will be held on the originally scheduled trial date of May 5, 2014. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
October 7, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 18 Motion to Dismiss the Second Cause of Action with prejudice. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
January 6, 2014 39 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO MODIFY CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR BENCH TRIAL filed by Jowhar Alsabur, Autozone, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/3/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
March 19, 2014 50 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 42 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Jowhar Alsabur, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 42 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2014 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/19/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
April 3, 2014 51 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying Plaintiff's 42 Motion for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
June 6, 2014 64 Featured Case ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 61 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal . Plaintiff may either submit an amended motion to file under seal or file an unredacted version of [60-1] Mr. Alsabur's declaration in support of his opposition on or before 6/13/2014. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/6/2014. (kawlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
June 17, 2014 66 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore ordering the parties to further meet and confer regarding 55 Discovery Letter Brief and to file another joint letter within 14 days of this order if they are unable to resolve their dispute informally. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 17, 2014 67 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore ordering the parties to further meet and confer regarding 57 Discovery Letter Brief and to file another joint letter within 14 days of this order if they are unable to resolve their dispute informally. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 18, 2014 68 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part 54 Discovery Letter Brief concerning Rule 30(b)(6) deposition. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Alsabur v. Autozone, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jowhar Alsabur
Represented By: Tiega Noel Varlack
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Hoffman, III
Represented By: Ronald D. Arena
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]