Shaw v. Diaz

Petitioner: John Shaw
Respondent: Ralph M. Diaz
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01739
Filed: April 17, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: PSLC ECK
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court **DISREGARD, SEE DOCKET NO. 11 .** ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 8/5/2013. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/5/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 8/5/2013. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/5/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
January 16, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING RESPONDENTS 14 MOTION TO DISMISS AND PETITIONERS 19 MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE NEW WARDEN AS RESPONDENT AND DENYING 13 PETITIONERS MOTION TO JOIN HABEAS AND CIVIL RIGHTS CASES. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/16/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 16, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/16/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
February 11, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claidia Wilken DECLINING TO RELATE CASES PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-12 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 12, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING PETITIONERS ( 26 , 27 , 31 ) MOTIONS TO PROCEED IFP ON APPEAL, TO APPOINT COUNSEL ON APPEAL AND FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Shaw v. Diaz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Shaw
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ralph M. Diaz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]