Korby v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al

Defendant: Computer Sciences Corporation Accidental Death and Dismemberment Plan and Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Joshua Korby
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01768
Filed: April 18, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 7/10/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 15, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Joshua Korby filed by Joshua Korby, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/15/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
July 15, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint Stipulation to Continue CMC Pending September 30, 2013 Mediation) filed by Life Insurance Company of North America Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2013. Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/15/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
October 15, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ENTIRE ACTION AGAINST ALL PARTIES) filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/15/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Korby v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Computer Sciences Corporation Accidental Death and Dismemberment Plan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Melissa Michelle Cowan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Korby
Represented By: Michael B. Horrow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]