Sentry Insurance Company v. United States of America

Defendant: United States of America
Plaintiff: Sentry Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01771
Filed: April 19, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134 P.I.- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2013 20 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Sentry Insurance Company, United States of America Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2013 01:30 PM.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/13/13. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
August 5, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER Granting Plaintiff Sentry Insurance's request to appear telephonically at the August 6, 2013 Case Management Conference. Plaintiff's counsel must arrange the appearance with CourtCall prior to the hearing. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/5/2013. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
September 26, 2013 29 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF COMPROMISE AND SETTLEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Sentry Insurance Company, United States of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/24/13. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
November 4, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER granting 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by United States of America. The Case Management Conference scheduled for November 12, 2013 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/4/2013. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
February 10, 2014 34 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Sentry Insurance Company, United States of America, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/7/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sentry Insurance Company v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Michael Thomas Pyle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sentry Insurance Company
Represented By: Lawrence R. Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]