Sime Darby Jomalina SDN BHD v. Hornbill Foods Corp

Plaintiff: Sime Darby Jomalina SDN BHD
Defendant: Hornbill Foods Corp
Case Number: 4:2013cv01837
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
July 18, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 17 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference (by Stipulation) filed by Hornbill Foods Corp. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/2/13 is continued 8/30/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/18/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
October 7, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/11/13 is continued to 11/22/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/7/13., Motions terminated: 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 20 Case Management Conference - Initial, Set Hearings,, Regarding Continuing Further Case Management Conference filed by Sime Darby Jomalina SDN BHD.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
October 29, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 28 Motion to Appear by Telephone: Counsel is directed to provide the clerk with a direct dial phone number. The Court initiates all conference calls. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
November 25, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/25/13. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
January 29, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING CROSS-DEFENDANT WESTERN PACIFIC OILS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS 34 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
February 25, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE due to Bankruptcy. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/25/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sime Darby Jomalina SDN BHD v. Hornbill Foods Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sime Darby Jomalina SDN BHD
Represented By: Bruce H. Jackson
Represented By: Christina Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hornbill Foods Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.