Devore et al v. Prospect Mortgage, LLC

Plaintiff: Javan Devore, Barbara Kite, Joanna Lopez and Patricia Regan
Defendant: Prospect Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 4:2013cv01841
Filed: April 23, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RELATE CASES C 13-01841 RS and C 13-03711 WHO. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/20/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
October 3, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/3/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
December 17, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MDL ORDER Denying Transfer. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
January 9, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2014 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2015 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 4/20/2015 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 4/20/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/9/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
June 23, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/21/2014 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 8/18/2014. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/23/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
October 3, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/3/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Devore et al v. Prospect Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javan Devore
Represented By: Adam W. Hansen
Represented By: Matthew C Helland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Kite
Represented By: Adam W. Hansen
Represented By: Matthew C Helland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Lopez
Represented By: Adam W. Hansen
Represented By: Matthew C Helland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Regan
Represented By: Adam W. Hansen
Represented By: Matthew C Helland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prospect Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.