Guenot v. SKS Ocular, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jeanmarie Guenot
Defendant: SKS Ocular, LLC, SKS Ocular 1, LLC, Jason Slakter and Glenn Stoller
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01875
Filed: April 24, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2014 104 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/20/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2014)
May 29, 2013 19 Featured Case JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
June 11, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER (duplicate) extending deadline to respond to the complaint signed by Judge Illston on 6/11/13 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
July 30, 2013 31 Featured Case PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/29/13. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
August 15, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER RE: INQUIRY RE PAYMENT OF MEDIATOR'S FEES (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
January 13, 2014 57 Featured Case ORDER RE: DISCOVERY (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 31, 2014 67 Featured Case ORDER, Motions terminated: 65 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Further Extending Briefing Schedule re Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and for Modification of Pretrial Preparation Order filed by SKS Ocular 1, LLC, Jason Slakter, SKS Ocular, LLC, Glenn Stoller. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/31/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
March 7, 2014 76 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 45 74 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/7/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Guenot v. SKS Ocular, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanmarie Guenot
Represented By: Steven L. Friedlander
Represented By: Kevin Anthony Mills
Represented By: Andrew Edward Saxon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKS Ocular, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKS Ocular 1, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Slakter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Stoller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]