Sanchez et al v. Bay Area Rapid Transit District et al

Plaintiff: Jose Sanchez and Nena Sanchez
Defendant: Bay Area Rapid Transit District, San Francisco Municipal Transportation Agency, Deborah Palmer, Jennifer Ishikawa and City and County of San Francisco
Case Number: 4:2013cv01885
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 6 Motion to Dismiss as Moot. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
September 5, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 23 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Strike. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
September 23, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/23/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
January 8, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE;CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Monday, 1/27/2014 02:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by Friday, 1/17/2014. Case Management Conference set for Monday, 1/27/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/8/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 21, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING DATES AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING;DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 3/7/2014 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The Monday, 1/27/2014 at 2:00pm OSC hearing is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/21/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
May 1, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING COMPLIANCE HEARING AND REINSTATING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES.***Deadlines terminated: Vacating the 5/2/2014 Compliance Hearing re 53 Clerks Notice,. Jury Selection set for Monday, 7/21/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oak land before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. 5 Day Jury Trial set for 7/21/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 7/11/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland b efore Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 6/20/2014 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/1/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
June 18, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SUBMISSION AND CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing set for Friday, 6/20/2014 is CONTINUED to Friday, 6/27/2014 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.***Deadlines terminated. 55 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Deadlines. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/18/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
June 19, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES; CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing set for 6/27/14 at 9:01AM is CONTINUED to 10/10/2014 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/19/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
October 9, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing set for 10/10/14 is CONTINUED to Friday, 10/17/2014 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. File by 10/13/14.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/9/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
October 14, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL re 63 Proposed Order filed by Jose Sanchez, Deborah Palmer, City and County of San Francisco and Jennifer Ishikawa terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/14/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING re 64 Ex Parte Application Plaintiff Jose Sanchez's Ex Parte Application to Continue Compliance Hearing Date of October 17, 2014 to a Later Date filed by Jose Sanchez. Compliance Hearing set for 10/17/14 is CONTINUED to Friday, 10/31/2014 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/14/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
November 4, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/3/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
November 24, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING CMS TO PROVIDE INFORMATION REGARDING JOSE SANCHEZ [AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT] re 71 Proposed Order filed by Jose Sanchez. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/24/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez et al v. Bay Area Rapid Transit District et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Sanchez
Represented By: Manuel Alzamora Juarez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nena Sanchez
Represented By: Manuel Alzamora Juarez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Area Rapid Transit District
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Municipal Transportation Agency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Palmer
Represented By: Duncan Carling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Ishikawa
Represented By: Duncan Carling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Duncan Carling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]