Cheung et al v. Actionlink, L.L.C.

Plaintiff: Cathlene Cheung, Jeff Koenig, Christian Santos and Scott Sobczak
Defendant: Actionlink, L.L.C.
Case Number: 4:2013cv01931
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
December 19, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JANUARY 17, 2014 filed by Actionlink, L.L.C.. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/17/14 is continued to 1/24/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/18/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
November 10, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (JOINT) - VACATING STAY AND ORDER CERTIFYING CLASSES AND SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Actionlink, L.L.C.. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2014 03:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/10/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 25, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting substitution of attorney. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/21/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
February 9, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice upon settlement. Within 90 days from the date hereof, that settlement has not in fact occurred, the foregoing order shall be vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/9/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2015) Modified on 2/10/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheung et al v. Actionlink, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathlene Cheung
Represented By: Craig Justin Ackermann
Represented By: Julian Ari Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Koenig
Represented By: Craig Justin Ackermann
Represented By: Julian Ari Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Santos
Represented By: Craig Justin Ackermann
Represented By: Julian Ari Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Sobczak
Represented By: Craig Justin Ackermann
Represented By: Julian Ari Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actionlink, L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael E. Brewer
Represented By: Alexa L Woerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]