Crane v. Wells Fargo

Plaintiff: Barbara Crane
Defendant: Wells Fargo
Case Number: 4:2013cv01932
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 18 Motion to Remand (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/19/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 8/20/2013.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on August 6, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 23, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLANTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re 38 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Barbara Crane. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on August 23, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
October 24, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE Motions to Remand and Dismiss; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why Plaintiff's case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 11/8/2013. Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss the first amended complaint due by 11/8/2013. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/24/2013. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
February 12, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 28 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Wells Fargo. The Court finds the motion suitable for resolution on the papers pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-1(b). Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/12/2014. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
March 24, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge 3/24/2014 granting 28 Motion to Dismiss in full and without leave to amend. The Clerk is ordered to close the case. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crane v. Wells Fargo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Crane
Represented By: Peter Remington Crane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo
Represented By: Mark Douglas Lonergan
Represented By: Laszlo Ladi, Jr
Represented By: Edward Rick Buell, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]