Argenal v. Reassure America Life Insurance Company et al

Defendant: Swiss Reinsurance America Corporation, Royal MacCabees Life Insurance Company, MacCabees Mutual Life Insurance Company and Reassure America Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Agustin Argenal
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01947
Filed: April 29, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 Stipulation filed by Agustin Argenal Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2013. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 10/18/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/9/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
November 20, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER granting 20 Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER CONTINUING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Reassure America Life Insurance Company, et al. Reset Deadlines/Hearing as to [ 18] First MOTION for Summary Judgment , Motion Hearing reset for 1/31/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/20/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
February 4, 2014 41 Featured Case ORDER granting 36 MOTION for Hearing re 18 First MOTION for Summary Judgment re Change of Hearing Date filed by Reassure America Life Ins. Co., et al. Reset Hearing as to 18 First MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing reset for 3/21/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/3/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
April 28, 2014 46 Featured Case ORDER RE CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/28/2014. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
May 12, 2014 50 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 48 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
June 3, 2014 53 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL (30 days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/3/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Argenal v. Reassure America Life Insurance Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swiss Reinsurance America Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal MacCabees Life Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MacCabees Mutual Life Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reassure America Life Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agustin Argenal
Represented By: Alexander MacDougall
Represented By: Ray Francis Bourhis, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]