Pascual v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Juan G. Pascual
Case Number: 4:2013cv02005
Filed: May 1, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court Motions terminated: 4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. The Court will hear Wells Fargo's 12 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on July 18, 2013. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/5/2013. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
August 8, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 12 Motion to Dismiss without leave to amend. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
September 27, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring Additional Briefing by Plaintiff's Counsel Wendell J. Jones re 24 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Mr. Jones' Response due by 10/4/2013. Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/27/2013. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
February 13, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 24 Motion for Attorney Fees and Order referring Attorney Wendell Jones to the Standing Committee on Professional Conduct. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pascual v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Melissa Marie Coyle
Represented By: Christopher Alan Carr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan G. Pascual
Represented By: Wendell Jamon Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]