Global Community Monitor v. McWane, Inc.

Plaintiff: Global Community Monitor
Defendant: McWane, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv02014
Filed: May 1, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference and Assoicated Deadlines. Case Management Statement due by 1/17/2014. Case Management Conference set for 1/24/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/14/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
January 8, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Staying Proceeding and Vacating Existing Deadlines and Notice of Settlement. Case stayed. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 01/08/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
March 6, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 03/05/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Community Monitor v. McWane, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Community Monitor
Represented By: Michael Robert Lozeau
Represented By: Richard Toshiyuki Drury
Represented By: Douglas Jonathan Chermak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McWane, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]