Radware, LTD. et al v. A10 Networks, Inc.

Defendant: A10 Networks, Inc.
Plaintiff: Radware, Inc. and Radware, LTD.
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv02021
Filed: May 1, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2014 100 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER 98 in C-13-02021 and 70 in C-13-02024 to Enlarge Time. Claims Construction Hearing set for 4/8/2014 09:00 AM. Tutorial Hearing set for 4/8/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/15/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
February 18, 2014 116 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 75 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory as to Eyal Felstaine and deferring Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory for 10 days as to Smadar Fuks; granting 97 Motion for Joinder; denying 109 Motion for Protective Order. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
March 5, 2014 128 Featured Case REDACTED ORDER by Judge Ronald M Whyte granting 77 , 94 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Attorney Dominik B. Slusarczyk; Gavin Kenneth Snyder; Ryan Alexander Ward; Hong Annita Zhong; Elliot Brown and Morgan Chu terminated. UNREDACTED ORDER sent to parties consistent with 91 Order re: in camera review. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 6, 2014 133 Featured Case ORDER re Joint Discovery Dispute No. 1 re Smadar Fuks Deposition. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/6/14. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
April 4, 2014 170 Featured Case ORDER granting (104 in 5:13-cv-02021-RMW), (72 in 5:13-cv-02024-RMW) Motion For Leave To Amend Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/4/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
April 18, 2014 185 Featured Case ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS re (136 in 5:13-cv-02021-RMW) (92 in 5:13-cv-02024-RMW). Signed by Judge Ronald M Whyte on 4/18/2014. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 18, 2014 186 Featured Case ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL MSJ BRIEFING. A10/F5 5 page brief due 4/23/2014; Radware 5 page response due 4/25/2014. Signed by Judge Ronald M Whyte on 4/18/2014. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 30, 2014 198 Featured Case ORDER for Briefing Regarding Motion for Relief from Magistrate's Order Granting Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/30/14. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
June 11, 2014 230 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting in part and denying in part (137) Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement; denying (139) Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity in case 5:13-cv-02021-RMW; granting in part and denying in part (91) Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement in case 5:13-cv-02024-RMW (rmwlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
June 27, 2014 239 Featured Case ORDER to meet and confer re 215 , 216 . Signed by Judge Ronald M Whyte on 6/27/2014. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
July 2, 2014 243 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 137 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 157 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 161 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 192 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 193 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 200 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 217 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (rmwlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
July 28, 2014 247 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying as moot 218 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 236 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 237 Motion to Amend/Correct (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 28, 2014 248 Featured Case ORDER granting 225 motion to amend invalidity contentions. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/28/14. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 24, 2013 33 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER 32 Selecting ADR Process. Case Referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/24/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
September 10, 2013 44 Featured Case Pre-Claim Construction Discovery Order Adopting 42 (proposed pre-claim construction and discovery plan) with Modifications (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 24, 2013 49 Featured Case Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion to Dismiss(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 27, 2013 51 Featured Case STIPULATED ORDER 50 Re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/27/13. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
December 19, 2013 74 Featured Case Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting with modifications (60) Motion extend claim construction discovery, claim construction briefing, and claim construction hearing dates in case 5:13-cv-02021-RMW.Associated Cases: 5:13-cv-02021-RMW, 5:13-cv-02024-RMW(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 20, 2013 85 Featured Case ORDER clarifying claim construction deadlines. Signed by Judge Whyte on 12/20/2013. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
January 7, 2014 90 Featured Case ORDER denying 55 Motion to Dismiss Radware's Willful and Indirect Infringement Claims; denying 63 Motion to Strike Exhibits in Support of A10's Motion to Dismiss. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
January 8, 2014 91 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte GRANTING with Conditions 79 Motion for In Camera Review of Motion for Disqualification of Counsel and Supporting Documents. (rmwlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 10, 2014 93 Featured Case Corrected ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte GRANTING with Conditions 79 Motion for In Camera Review of Motion for Disqualification of Counsel and Supporting Documents, allowing Radware to file Exhibit A to the Sawyer Declaration for in camera review. Radware must publicly file a redacted version of the Sawyer Declaration, redacting only Exhibit A and paragraph 3 of the declaration. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 15, 2014 99 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER 92 to Continue Deadlines for Oppositions to Radware's Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/15/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Radware, LTD. et al v. A10 Networks, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A10 Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Elliot Brown
Represented By: Morgan Chu
Represented By: Dean Geoffrey Dunlavey
Represented By: Mark A. Flagel
Represented By: Andrew John Fossum
Represented By: Dominik B. Slusarczyk
Represented By: Ryan Alexander Ward
Represented By: Hong Annita Zhong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radware, Inc.
Represented By: Judith S.H. Hom
Represented By: Nitin Gambhir
Represented By: Barrington E Dyer
Represented By: Fabio Elia Marino
Represented By: Terrence Patrick McMahon
Represented By: Teri H.P. Nguyen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radware, LTD.
Represented By: Teri H.P. Nguyen
Represented By: Terrence Patrick McMahon
Represented By: Fabio Elia Marino
Represented By: Judith S.H. Hom
Represented By: Nitin Gambhir
Represented By: Barrington E Dyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]