Levy v. Apple, Inc.

Plaintiff: Amanda U. Levy
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv02075
Filed: May 7, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSTRUING PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF APPEAL 9 AS A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/14/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
September 12, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING WHETHER CASES 13-2075 AND 13-4143 ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/12/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
July 10, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/10/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Levy v. Apple, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda U. Levy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]