Reynolds v. Target

Plaintiff: Nancy Reynolds
Defendant: Target
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv02141
Filed: May 9, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 16, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
December 2, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 2, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
December 20, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/20/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
March 11, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 11, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
June 17, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 17, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 19, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; VACATING JULY 11, 2014 STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 19, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Reynolds v. Target
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Reynolds
Represented By: Kenneth Douglas Atkinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target
Represented By: Gail C. Trabish
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]