Schoop v. Commissioner of Internal Revenue et.al.

Defendant: United States of America and Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Plaintiff: Catherine Schoop
Case Number: 4:2013cv02230
Filed: May 16, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7609 IRS: Petition to Quash IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Illston's standing ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
August 12, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
September 10, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESCHEDULING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS TO OCTOBER 11, 2013 AT 9:00 AM (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 25, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING (23 in 3:13-cv-02230-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR SEPTEMBER 27, 2013 filed by United States of America, Commissioner of Internal Revenue, Catherine Schoop. Initial case management conferences are vacated pending motion to quash hearing set for 10/11/13. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/24/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
October 2, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND ORDERING COMPLIANCE WITH SUMMONSES. 14 1 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/2/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schoop v. Commissioner of Internal Revenue et.al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Cynthia Lewis Stier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Schoop
Represented By: Cindy Lan Ho
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Goldstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]