Burns et al v. TDW Construction, Inc.

Plaintiff: Heavy and Highway Committee, Pensioned Operating Engineers' Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice and Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Richard Piombo, Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Russell E. Burns and Operating Engineers Local 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO
Defendant: TDW Construction, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv02713
Filed: June 13, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/25/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
November 4, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 17 STIPULATION selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/4/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
February 24, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 21 Judgment Pursuant to Stipulation. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/24/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Burns et al v. TDW Construction, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heavy and Highway Committee
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pensioned Operating Engineers' Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice and Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Piombo
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell E. Burns
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDW Construction, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]