Hampton et al v. City Of Oakland et al

Defendant: City Of Oakland and City of Emeryville
Plaintiff: Ramal Lamar, Dawn Scott, Nyoka Lowery and Fred Hampton, Jr.
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv03094
Filed: July 3, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 3, 2014 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 76 Motion to Amend/Correct. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
November 4, 2014 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/04/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
August 16, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS 9 , 10 ) MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Responses due by 8/21/2013. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/16/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
September 30, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING ACTION TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/26/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
January 8, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 33 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by City of Emeryville.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/8/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
May 20, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/20/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
July 5, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on July 5, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2013)
August 19, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Counsel Kevin Allen's requests to appear in lieu of lead trial counsel and telephonically on 8/20/2014 01:30 PM Further Case Management Conference re 55 Letter filed by City of Emeryville. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/19/14. (Attachments: # 1 Notice re Telephonic Appearance Procedures)(ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
August 19, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Counsel Barbara Parker's request to appear in lieu of the the lead trial counsel Arlene Rosen for the 8/20/2014 Further Case Management Conference re 57 Letter filed by City Of Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/19/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
September 17, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Emergency Telephonic Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2014 11:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/17/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 18, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 80 Letter filed by City of Emeryville. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/18/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 30, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Chambers Copies of 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendant City of Oakland's Motion for Summary Judgment, or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment (Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4 and 56.) filed by City Of Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/30/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
October 9, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Further Briefing re City of Oakland's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/09/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hampton et al v. City Of Oakland et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Oakland
Represented By: Jennifer N. Logue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Emeryville
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Allen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramal Lamar
Represented By: Dan Siegel
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Represented By: Anne Butterfield Weills
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Scott
Represented By: Dan Siegel
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Represented By: Anne Butterfield Weills
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nyoka Lowery
Represented By: Anne Butterfield Weills
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Represented By: Dan Siegel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Hampton, Jr.
Represented By: Anne Butterfield Weills
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Represented By: Dan Siegel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]