Belloni v. Archdiocese of San Francisco

Plaintiff: Cheryl Belloni
Defendant: Archdiocese of San Francisco
Case Number: 4:2013cv03509
Filed: July 30, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Cont ADR deadlines and Case Management Conference filed by Cheryl Belloni, Archdiocese of San Francisco Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Case Management statement due 11/9/13.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/27/13. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
October 9, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Cheryl Belloni, Archdiocese of San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/9/13. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
November 13, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 20 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by The Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Francisco filed by Cheryl Belloni, The Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Francisco, Case referred to mediation.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/12/13. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
January 21, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 29 Notice of Substitution of Counsel, filed by The Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/21/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
March 27, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by The Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Francisco filed by Cheryl Belloni, The Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/26/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
October 9, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Case Management and Pre-Trial Order for Jury Trial filed by Cheryl Belloni, The Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Francisco. Non-expert Discovery due by 10/30/2014. Motions to be heard by 12/18/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/9/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
November 20, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to exceed otherwise applicable page limit filed by Cheryl Belloni, The Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/20/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
January 7, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 45 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
March 9, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 69 Notice (Other) filed by Cheryl Belloni Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/9/15. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
April 6, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for dismissal with prejudice filed by Cheryl Belloni, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/6/15. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belloni v. Archdiocese of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Belloni
Represented By: John A. McGuinn, Jr.
Represented By: Jeannette Vaccaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archdiocese of San Francisco
Represented By: Peter O. Glaessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]