Briggs v. Blomkamp et al

Defendant: Tristar Pictures, Inc., Sony Pictures Ent., Inc., Neill Blomkamp, Media Rights Capital and QED International
Plaintiff: Steve Wilson Briggs
Case Number: 4:2013cv04679
Filed: October 8, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 30 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/17/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
April 17, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court FIRST NOTICE OF FILING OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 37 Case Management Conference - Further. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/17/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
July 15, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. See order for deadlines regarding Plaintiff's pending amended motion to compel. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2014)
July 17, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 45 MOTION To disqualify Export Report of Jeff Rovin filed by Steve Kenyatta Wilson Briggs. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 7/17/2014. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
August 4, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Steve Kenyatta Wilson Briggs. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 8/4/2014. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
August 7, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING 53 PLAINTIFF'S JULY 10, 2014 MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/7/2014.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
August 20, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 61 Motion for Leave to File (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
October 3, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 45 Motion to Exclude Expert; denying 63 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 64 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briggs v. Blomkamp et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tristar Pictures, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Pictures Ent., Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neill Blomkamp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Media Rights Capital
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QED International
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Wilson Briggs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]