Tabones et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al

Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Power Default Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Felomena Tabones and Rey Tabones
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv05225
Filed: November 11, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
 
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Hon. Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/9/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 11, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON 21 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 4/1/2014. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/11/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
February 19, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE; VACATING PENDING MOTIONS. Plaintiff and defendants' counsel shall participate in a telephone conference, to be scheduled by the ADR Unit as soon as possible but no later than March 31, 2014. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/19/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
April 14, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/14/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Tabones et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Allison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Allison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Default Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Allison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felomena Tabones
Represented By: Megan Ann Dailey
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rey Tabones
Represented By: Michael James Yesk
Represented By: Megan Ann Dailey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]