Trujillo v. Optio Solutions, LLC et al

Defendant: Optio Solutions, LLC and Cross Check Services LLC
Plaintiff: Jonathan Trujillo
 
Case Number: 4:2014cv01704
Filed: April 14, 2014
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 7/7/2014. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 06/23/14. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
July 3, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; STRIKING PROPOSED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, see 24 . Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 07/03/2014. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
August 5, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 26 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT; TERMINATING 16 MOTION TO DISMISS & 10 MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 08/05/2014. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
October 17, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Jonathan Trujillo filed by Optio Solutions, LLC, Jonathan Trujillo, Cross Check Services LLC, Crosscheck, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/16/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Trujillo v. Optio Solutions, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optio Solutions, LLC
Represented By: D. Lilah McLean
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cross Check Services LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Trujillo
Represented By: Timothy Allen Reed
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]