Keith Allen Lewis,Sr. v. Andrew Deems, et al

Plaintiff: Keith Allen Lewis, Sr.
Defendant: Andrew Deems, Elena Tootell, Kevin Chappell and Shannon Garrigan
Case Number: 4:2014cv03324
Filed: July 23, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Referring Judge: PSLC MWD
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE; ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION OR NOTICE REGARDING SUCH MOTION; INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK. Dispositive Motion due by 2/9/2015. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/18/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
January 13, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/13/15. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2015)
March 11, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANTS' SECOND 22 REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keith Allen Lewis,Sr. v. Andrew Deems, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Allen Lewis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Deems
Represented By: Amy W. Lo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elena Tootell
Represented By: Amy W. Lo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Chappell
Represented By: Amy W. Lo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Garrigan
Represented By: Amy W. Lo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.