"The Apple iPod iTunes Anti-Trust Litigation" Featured Case

Plaintiff alleged that defendant Apple Computer, Inc. unlawfully bundled and tied digital music files sold through the Apple iTunes Music Store to its own iPod portable digital music player.

Plaintiff: Plaintiffs, Stacie Somers, Mariana Rosen, Somtai Troy Charoensak and Melanie Tucker
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 5:2005cv00037
Filed: January 3, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2014 778 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Alexandra Senya Bernay [Plaintiffs' Notice of Change in Counsel Regarding Thomas R. Merrick] (Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 1, 2014 777 Statement of Recent Decision, filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 4/1/2014) Modified on 4/2/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2014 776 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Case Management Conferernce Held on 02/07/14, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, filed by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 2/13/2014) Modified on 2/14/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2014 775 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 7, 2014, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/14/2014. (Related documents(s) 772 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 11, 2014 774 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING THE FEBRUARY 18, 2014 MOTION HEARING. THE COURT TAKES THE PENDING MOTIONS UNDER SUBMISSION AND NOTIFIES PARTIES THAT THE COURT MAY REQUEST ARGUMENT OR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING AT A LATER DATE, AS NECESSARY. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 10, 2014 772 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Order to Show Cause Hearing Held on 02/07/14, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker for Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 2/10/2014) Modified on 2/11/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2014 773 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/7/2014 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 2/7/2014), Pre-filing Conference re Motion for Summary Judgment held on 2/7/2014 before Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 2/7/2014), Show Cause Hearing held - and DISCHARGED on 2/7/2014 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 2/7/2014). (Court Reporter: Diane Skillman.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/7/2014) Modified on 2/12/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2014 771 OBJECTIONS to Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey M. Wooldridge re [763-5] Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kiernan Decl ISO Obj to Wooldridge Supp, # 2 Exhibit to Kiernan Decl ISO Obj to Wooldridge Supp)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 2/7/2014) Modified on 2/10/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2014 770 RESPONSE (re 767 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike the Supplemental Report of Kevin M. Murphy and Robert H. Topel, dated December 20, 2013 ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Declaration of David C. Kiernan ISO Apple's Response, # 3 Exhibit 1-4 to Kiernan Decl ISO Apple's Response)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 6, 2014 769 RESPONSE (re 766 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Pre-filing Conference Letter ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David C. Kiernan ISO Apple's Response, # 2 Exhibit 1-3 to Kiernan Decl ISO Apple's Response)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 4, 2014 768 RESPONSE (re 763 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Kevin M. Murphy and Robert H. Topel and Exhibit 1] ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Declaration of David C. Kiernan ISO Apple's Response, # 3 Exhibit 1-3 to Kiernan Declaration, # 4 Proposed Redactions to Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 3, 2014 767 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike the Supplemental Report of Kevin M. Murphy and Robert H. Topel, dated December 20, 2013 filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, # 3 Redacted Version of Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Supplemental Report of Murphy and Topel, dated December 20, 2013, # 4 Unredacted Version of Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Supplemental Report of Murphy and Topel, dated December 20, 2013)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 766 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Pre-filing Conference Letter filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Pre-filing Conference Letter, # 4 Unredactecd Version of Plaintiffs' Pre-filing Conference Letter)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 765 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Response re 760 Order to Show Cause, filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 2/3/2014) Modified on 2/4/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2014 764 Response to Order to Show Cause re 760 Order to Show Cause, filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Apple's Letter Pursuant to Paragraph 9 of the Standing Order)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 2/3/2014) Modified on 2/4/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2014 763 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Kevin M. Murphy and Robert H. Topel and Exhibit 1] filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Suppot of Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Kevin M. Murphy and Robert H. Topel, # 4 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Kevin M. Murphy and Robert H. Topel, # 5 Exhibit 1 Unredacted Version of Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey M. Wooldridge in Support of Plaintiffs Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Kevin M. Murphy and Robert H. Topel)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
January 31, 2014 762 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment 740 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of David C. Kiernan in Support of Apple's Admin. Motion to Seal, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5 to David C. Kiernan Declaration, # 4 REDACTED Reply in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 UNREDACTED Reply in Support of Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
January 31, 2014 761 UPDATED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, filed by Apple Inc., Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Stacie Somers, Melanie Tucker. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 1/31/2014) Modified on 2/3/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2014 760 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDER SETTING PRE-HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Friday, 2/7/2014 03:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by Monday, 2/3/2014. Case Management Conference also set for Friday, 2/7/2014 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Pre-Hearing Conference set for Friday, 2/7/2014 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/29/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 28, 2014 759 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 758 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike 750 (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 27, 2014 758 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike 750 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, # 2 Declaration of David Kiernan in Support of Motion to Seal, # 3 Exhibit 1 - 2 to Kiernan Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal, # 4 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike (ECF No. 750) REDACTED, # 5 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike (ECF No. 750) UNREDACTED, # 6 Declaration of Kiernan in Support of Apple's Opposition, # 7 Exhibit 1 to Kiernan Declaration in Support of Apple's Opposition REDACTED, # 8 Exhibit 1 to Kiernan Declaration in Support of Apple's Opposition UNREDACTED, # 9 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 21, 2014 757 RESPONSE (re 751 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and to Exclude Expert Testimony of Roger G. Noll; Plaintiffs' Responsive Separate Statement in Support of ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Amir Q. Amiri in Support of Apple's Response to Plaintiffs' Admin. Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order by Apple Granting Plaintiffs' Admin. Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Exhibit - Apple's (Proposed) Redactions to Plaintiffs' Exhibit Nos. 1-3, and 54, # 4 Exhibit - Apple's (Proposed) Excerpt to Plaintiffs' Exhibit No. 22, # 5 Exhibit - Apple's (Proposed) Redactions to Plaintiffs' Exhibit Nos. 9-11; 14; 48; 50-53; and 62, # 6 Apple's (Proposed) Redactions to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of its Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, etc., # 7 Apple's (Proposed) Redactions to Plaintiffs' Responsive Separate Statement in Support of its Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, etc.)(Amiri, Amir) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 756 RESPONSE (re 750 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Kevin M. Murphy and Robert H. Topel, dated December 20, 2013 ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Amir Q. Amiri in Support of Apple's Response, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Admin. Motion to Seal, # 3 Apple's (Proposed) Redactions to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Suppl. Report of K. Murphy and R. Topel)(Amiri, Amir) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 14, 2014 755 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 754 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion 737 (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
January 14, 2014 754 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion 737 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kiernan ISO Admin Motion to Seal, # 2 Exhibit 1 of Kiernan ISO Admin Motion to Seal, # 3 Exhibit 2 of Kiernan ISO Admin Motion to Seal, # 4 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, # 5 Apple's Opp to Pls' Daubert Motion (Redacted), # 6 Apple's Opp to Pls' Daubert Motion, # 7 Declaration of Kiernan ISO Apple's Opp to Pls' Daubert Motion, # 8 Exhibit 1-4 (Redacted), # 9 Exhibit 5-12 (Redacted), # 10 Exhibit 1-2, 6, 9-11, # 11 Proposed Order Denying Plfs' Daubert Motion)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
January 14, 2014 753 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. 754 *** EXHIBITS re 752 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit 8, # 8 Exhibit 9, # 9 Exhibit 11, # 10 Exhibit 12, # 11 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 752 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/14/2014) Modified on 1/14/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2014 752 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. 754 *** RESPONSE (re 737 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Kevin M. Murphy and Robert H. Topel and Exhibits 1-10 Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-11 and 79-5 ) filed byApple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/14/2014) Modified on 1/14/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2014 751 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and to Exclude Expert Testimony of Roger G. Noll; Plaintiffs' Responsive Separate Statement in Support of Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and to Exclude Expert Testimony of Roger G. Noll and Exhibits 1-4, 9-17, 20-29, 31-46, 48-54, 56, and 58-62 Under Seal Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-11 and 79-5(c) filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in support thereof, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal, # 3 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and to Exclude Expert Testimony of Roger G. Noll, # 4 Exhibit 1-2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5-8, # 8 Exhibit 9-17, # 9 Exhibit 18-19, # 10 Exhibit 20-29, # 11 Exhibit 30, # 12 Exhibit 31-35, # 13 Exhibit 36-46, # 14 Exhibit 47, # 15 Exhibit 48-54, # 16 Exhibit 55, # 17 Exhibit 56, # 18 Exhibit 57, # 19 Exhibit 58-62, # 20 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of Plaintiffs Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and to Exclude Expert Testimony of Roger G. Noll, # 21 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Responsive Separate Statement in Support of Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and to Exclude Expert Testimony of Roger G. Noll, # 22 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and to Exclude Expert Testimony of Roger G. Noll)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 13, 2014 750 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Kevin M. Murphy and Robert H. Topel, dated December 20, 2013 filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in support thereof, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal, # 3 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Kevin M. Murphy and Robert H.Topel, dated Decemeber 20, 2013, # 4 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Kevin M. Murphy and Robert H. Topel, dated December 20, 2013)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 2, 2014 749 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 747 Supplemental Brief, (Amiri, Amir) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
December 31, 2013 748 NOTICE OF ERRATA to Exhibit 14 re 740 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Corrected signature page))(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 12/31/2013) Modified on 1/2/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 31, 2013 747 Supplemental Response re 737 Administrative Motion to Seal Daubert, filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Plaintiffs Daubert Motion REDACTED, # 3 Exhibits 1-4 to Daubert Motion REDACTED, # 4 Exhibit 5 to Daubert Motion REDACTED, # 5 Exhibits 6, 9-10 to Daubert Motion REDACTED)(Related document(s) 737 ) (Amiri, Amir) (Filed on 12/31/2013) Modified on 1/2/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/2/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 24, 2013 746 Declaration of Amir Amiri in Support of 745 Response to Administrative Motion to File Under Seal 737 , filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Exhibits 1-2 to Amiri Declaration)(Related document(s) 745 ) (Amiri, Amir) (Filed on 12/24/2013) Modified on 12/26/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 24, 2013 745 RESPONSE (re 737 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Kevin M. Murphy and Robert H. Topel and Exhibits 1-10 Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-11 and 79-5 ) filed byApple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 12/24/2013)
December 23, 2013 744 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 740 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Amiri, Amir) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 743 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 740 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 23, 2013 742 ERRATA re 740 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Apple's Corrected Administrative Motion to File Under Seal)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 21, 2013 741 Proposed Order re 740 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Amended] by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 12/21/2013)
December 21, 2013 740 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Kiernan Declaration ISO Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, # 3 Exhibit Rdacted Version of Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment and to Exclude Expert Testimony of Roger G. Noll, # 4 Exhibit SEALED Version of Motion for Summary Judgment and to Exclude Testimony, # 5 Exhibit REDACTED - Separate Statement ISO MSJ, # 6 Exhibit SEALED - Separate Statement ISO MSJ, # 7 Exhibit REDACTED - Exhibit 3 to Amiri Decl., # 8 Exhibit SEALED - Exhibit 3 to Amiri Dec, # 9 Exhibit REDACTED - Exhibit 4 to Amiri Dec, # 10 Exhibit SEALED - Exhibit 4 to Amiri Dec, # 11 Exhibit REDACTED - Exhibit 5 to Amiri Dec, # 12 Exhibit SEALED - Exhibit 5 to Amiri Dec, # 13 Exhibit REDACTED - Exhibit 6 to 8 to Amiri Dec, # 14 Exhibit SEALED - Exhibits 6 to 8 to Amiri Dec, # 15 Exhibit REDACTED - Exh 9 to Amiri Dec, # 16 Exhibit SEALED - Exh 9 to Amiri Dec, # 17 Exhibit REDACTED - Exh 10 to Amiri Dec, # 18 Exhibit SEALED - Exh 10 to Amiri Dec, # 19 Exhibit REDACTED - Exh 11 to Amiri Dec, # 20 Exhibit SEALED - Exh 11 to Amiri Dec, # 21 Exhibit SEALED - Exh 13 to Amiri Dec, # 22 Exhibit REDACTED - Exh 14 to Amiri Dec, # 23 Exhibit SEALED - Exh 14 to Amiri Dec, # 24 Exhibit SEALED - Exh 15 to Amiri Dec, # 25 Exhibit SEALED - Exh 16 to Amiri Dec, # 26 Exhibit SEALED - Exh 17 to Amiri Dec, # 27 Exhibit SEALED - Exh 18 to Amiri Dec, # 28 Exhibit SEALED - Exh 19 to Amiri Dec)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 12/21/2013)
December 21, 2013 739 Declaration of Amir Amiri in Support of 738 Motion for Summary Judgment and to Exclude Expert Testimony of Roger G. Noll [REDACTED], filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 12)(Related document(s) 738 ) (Amiri, Amir) (Filed on 12/21/2013) Modified on 12/23/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2013 738 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to Exclude Expert Testimony of Roger G. Noll [REDACTED], filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 1/13/2014. Replies due by 1/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 12/21/2013) Modified on 12/23/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2013 737 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Kevin M. Murphy and Robert H. Topel and Exhibits 1-10 Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-11 and 79-5 filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in support thereof, # 2 Proposed Order regarding Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Kevin M. Murphy and Robert H. Topel, # 4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Kevin M. Murphy and Robert H. Topel, # 5 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeny in Support of Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Kevin M. Murphy and Robert H. Topel, # 6 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibits 1-10, # 7 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibits 1-4, # 8 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibits 6-10, # 10 Exhibit 11-14, # 11 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinion Testimony of Kevin M. Murphy and Robert H. Topel)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 19, 2013 736 NOTICE of Appearance by Amir Q Amiri (Amiri, Amir) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
November 1, 2013 735 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR MODIFICATION OF SCHEDULE. Set/Reset Deadlines as to Oppositions/Responses due by 1/13/2014. Replies due by 1/31/2014. Motion for Summary Judgment and to Exclude Expert Testimony Hearing set for 2/18/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/1/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
October 28, 2013 734 Letter to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers re entry of revised schedule, from Alexandra S. Bernay, dated 10/28/13. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulated Request for Modification of Schedule and [Proposed] Order)(Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 10/28/2013) Modified on 10/29/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2013 733 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 732 Stipulated Proposed Schedule Without Prejudice. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 9, 2013 732 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Schedule, filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker, Apple Inc., Stacie Somers. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of Stipulated Proposed Order Regarding the Schedule)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 10/9/2013) Modified on 10/10/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2013 731 NOTICE of Appearance of Jennifer N. Caringal as Counsel, filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker (Caringal, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/27/2013) Modified on 9/30/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/30/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2013 730 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 729 Stipulation regarding Schedule As Modified by the Court (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
May 31, 2013 729 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Schedule, filed by Apple Inc., Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Stacie Somers, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of David Kiernan in Support of Stipulated Proposed Order Regarding the Schedule)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 5/31/2013) Modified on 6/3/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2013 728 Featured Case ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for April 8, 2013 is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/5/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
April 1, 2013 727 CORRECTED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT, filed by Apple Inc., Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 4/1/2013) Modified on 4/2/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2013 726 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, filed by Apple Inc., Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 4/1/2013) Modified on 4/2/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2013 725 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 723 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference to 4/8/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 15, 2013 724 Declaration of David Kiernan in Support of 723 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference to 04/08/13, filed by Apple Inc.. (Related document(s) 723 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 2/15/2013) Modified on 2/19/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2013 723 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference to 04/08/13, filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 2/15/2013) Modified on 2/19/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to re 722 Order. Responses due by 9/16/2013. Replies due by 10/18/2013. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
January 28, 2013 722 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE re 721 Letter, Stipulation; proposed order. Motions for Summary Judgment filed by 8/16/2013. Responses due by 09/16/13; Replies due by 10/18/13. Case Management Conference set for Monday, 3/11/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Motions for Summary Judgment and to exclude Expert Testimony Hearing set for 11/12/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/28/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013) Modified on 1/29/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2013 721 Letter to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers re Parties' Joint Proposed Schedule, from Alexandra S. Bernay, dated 01/09/13. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation Regarding Schedule, # 2 Proposed Order Regarding Schedule)(Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/9/2013) Modified on 1/10/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2012 720 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc., Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 9/17/2012) Modified on 9/18/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2012 719 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, filed by Apple Inc., Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 9/17/2012) Modified on 9/18/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2012 718 Featured Case REASSIGNMENT ORDER OF JUDGE YVONNE GONZALEZ ROGERS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/6/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
September 5, 2012 717 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Judge James Ware no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 09/05/2012. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
August 8, 2012 716 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 691 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
June 13, 2012 715 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE OF ATTORNEY JOHN J. STOIA, JR. by Chief Judge James Ware, granting 714 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John J. Stoia, Jr. terminated. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 7, 2012 714 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney John. J. Stoia, Jr. filed by Melanie Tucker. Responses due by 6/21/2012. Replies due by 6/28/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Attorney John J. Stoia, Jr.)(Stoia, John) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
May 2, 2012 713 Featured Case ORDER following case management conference; referring case to Magistrate Judge Spero. Signed by Judge James Ware on May 2, 2012. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
May 2, 2012 712 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held after Settlement Conference. Court to issue order.Further Case Management Conference held on 5/2/2012 before James Ware (Date Filed: 5/2/2012). (Court Reporter N/A.) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/2/2012)
May 2, 2012 711 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held. Case did not settle.Settlement Conference (Date Filed: 5/2/2012). (Court Reporter N/A.) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/2/2012)
May 1, 2012 710 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference Held. Case did not settle. (Date Filed: 5/1/2012). Further Settlement Conference set for 5/2/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/1/2012)
April 23, 2012 709 Order Setting Settlement Conference for 5/1/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/23/12. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 23, 2012 708 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/23/12. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 23, 2012 707 Minute Entry: Status Conference - Held (Date Filed: 4/23/2012). Settlement Conference set for 5/1/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter not reported.) (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/23/2012)
April 13, 2012 706 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 2, 2012 705 Featured Case ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE Joint Status Conference Statement due by 4/13/2012. Status Conference set for 4/23/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/29/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
March 29, 2012 704 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING RENOTICED JOINT PROPOSAL REGARDING NOTICE PLAN. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/29/12. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 23, 2012 703 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of 702 Brief, Renoticed Joint Propsal Regarding Notice Plan filed bySomtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6)(Related document(s) 702 ) (Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 23, 2012 702 Brief re 698 Brief, 700 Order [Renoticed Joint Proposal Regarding Notice Plan] filed bySomtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 698 , 700 ) (Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 13, 2012 701 FILED ORDER (SUSAN P. GRABER and N. RANDY SMITH) The parties motions to file appendices under seal are granted. Petitioners opposed motion for leave to file a reply brief in support of this petition for permission to appeal is granted. The court, in its discretion, denies the petition for permission to appeal the district courts November 22, 2011 order granting class action certification. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(f); Chamberlan v. Ford Motor Co., 402 F.3d 952 (9th Cir. 2005) (per curiam). 8101612 (KKW) (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012) (tsh, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2012 700 Featured Case ORDER re 698 Brief filed by Mariana Rosen, Somtai Troy Charoensak, Melanie Tucker. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 12, 2012. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 9, 2012 699 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of 698 Brief Joint Proposal Regarding Notice Plan filed bySomtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7)(Related document(s) 698 ) (Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 9, 2012 698 Brief [Joint Proposal Regarding Notice Plan] filed bySomtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
December 8, 2011 696 Featured Case ORDER (as modified) re 695 Stipulation, filed by Melanie Tucker. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/8/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
December 7, 2011 695 STIPULATION re 694 Order [Extending Time to File Proposed Form of Notice and Notice Plan] by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support Thereof, # 2 Proposed Order)(Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
December 6, 2011 697 FILED ON 12/06/2011 PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAL PURSUANT TO RULE 23(f). (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
November 22, 2011 694 Featured Case ORDER re 477 Redacted Document,, filed by Mariana Rosen, Somtai Troy Charoensak, Melanie Tucker. Signed by Judge James Ware on November 22, 2011. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 15, 2011 693 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 691 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Redacted Portions of the Second Supplemental Report of Dr. Michelle M. Burtis and Exhibits Thereto, 692 Redacted Document (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 14, 2011 692 REDACTION Second Supplemental Report of Dr. Michelle M. Burtis by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
November 14, 2011 691 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Redacted Portions of the Second Supplemental Report of Dr. Michelle M. Burtis and Exhibits Thereto filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
October 24, 2011 690 Featured Case ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF by Judge James Ware denying 687 Motion (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011) Modified on 10/25/2011 (tsh, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2011 689 RESPONSE (re 687 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 Regarding Seven Motions Renoticed by Plaintiffs ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Apple's Administrative Motion Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 Regarding Seven Motions Renoticed by Plaintiffs filed byMelanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 14, 2011 688 Declaration of David Kiernan in Support of 687 Notice (Other) Apple's Administrative Motion Regarding Seven Motions Renoticed by Plaintiffs filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 687 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 687 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 Regarding Seven Motions Renoticed by Plaintiffs filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 10/14/2011) Modified on 10/17/2011 (far, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2011 686 Renotice motion hearing of Pending Motions Pursuant to Court's September 27, 2011 Order filed byMelanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
October 4, 2011 685 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 684 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Second Supplemental Declaration of Roger G. Noll on Class Certification and Exhibit 1 attached thereto by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
October 4, 2011 684 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 678 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
October 3, 2011 683 RESPONSE (re 678 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Second Supplemental Declartaion of Roger G. Noll on Class Certification and Exhibit 1 ) Cover Page Of Response (Filed Under Seal) Dkt. No. 681 filed byApple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
October 3, 2011 682 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. 681 Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal; and Declaration of David Kiernan in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal With Exhibits 1 and 2 (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
September 30, 2011 681 Document E-Filed Under Seal Declaration of David Kiernan in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal 678 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 9/30/2011) Modified on 9/30/2011 (sis, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/3/2011 (mjj2S, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2011 680 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware terminating 486 Motion to Certify Class; terminating 573 Motion for Leave to File; terminating 579 Motion for Leave to File; terminating 604 Motion for Leave to File; terminating 605 Motion to Strike ; terminating 607 Motion for Leave to File (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 23, 2011 679 REDACTION to the Second Supplemental Declaration of Roger G. Noll on Class Certification by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 678 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Second Supplemental Declartaion of Roger G. Noll on Class Certification and Exhibit 1 filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Bonny E. Sweeney, # 2 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
August 10, 2011 677 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 674 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal 647 Exhibits to the Declaration of David C. Kiernan In Support of Apple's Further Supplemental Brief Re Class Certification Doc. 646 by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 9, 2011 676 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 673 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Corrected 664 Ex. 2 To Kiernan Declaration ISO Apple's Response To Professor Noll's July 18 Declaration by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 8, 2011 675 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 673 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Ex. 2 To Kiernan Declaration ISO Apple's Response To Professor Noll's July 18 Declaration by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
August 5, 2011 674 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 647 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
August 2, 2011 673 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 666 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
August 2, 2011 672 Featured Case ORDER DENYING STIPULATION; SETTING SCHEDULE FOR SUBMISSION OF SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS re 661 Stipulation, filed by Melanie Tucker. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/1/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
July 27, 2011 671 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 670 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Declaration of Roger G. Noll by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 27, 2011 670 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 659 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 25, 2011 669 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 666 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Ex. 2 To Kiernan Declaration ISO Apple's Response To Professor Noll's July 18 Declaration ; Declaration of David Kiernan in Support of Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal [Exhibits 1-3]; [Proposed] Order Granting Apple's Administrative Motion to Seal (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 7/25/2011)
July 25, 2011 668 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 664 Declaration in Support, of Apple's Response to Professor Noll's July 18 Declaration [Exhibit 2 Filed Under Seal] (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 7/25/2011)
July 25, 2011 667 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 662 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 7/25/2011)
July 22, 2011 666 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Ex. 2 To Kiernan Declaration ISO Apple's Response To Professor Noll's July 18 Declaration filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration ISO Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 1 To Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 3 To Declaration, # 5 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 665 Declaration in Support of 663 Response ( Non Motion ) to Professor Noll's July 18 Declaration filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 663 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 664 Declaration of David C. Kiernan in Support of 663 Response ( Non Motion ) to Professor Noll's July 18 Declaration filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 663 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 663 RESPONSE to re 660 Redacted Document Professor Nol's July 18 Declaration by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 662 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 661 STIPULATION Regarding Schedule for Submission of Supplemental Expert Reports Re Class Certification as Set Forth in the Court's June 27, 2011 Order by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 18, 2011 660 REDACTION Supplemental Declaration of Roger G. Noll by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 18, 2011 659 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Declaration of Roger G. Noll and Exhibit 1 filed by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney, # 2 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 15, 2011 Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to case. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 14, 2011 658 Featured Case ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/14/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 14, 2011 657 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/27/11, before Judge JAMES WARE. Court Reporter/Transcriber Margaret "Margo" Gurule, Telephone number 415-504-4204 or margolargo@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2011. (mng, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 8, 2011 656 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 655 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reponse to the Court's June 22, 2011 Order Requiring Further Supplemental Briefing by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support Thereof)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 7, 2011 655 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 642 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
June 29, 2011 654 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 652 Motion for Extension of Time to File (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2011)
June 28, 2011 653 Declaration of Carmen A. Medici in Support of 652 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Declaration and Submit Proposed Schedule for Supplemental Expert Reports filed byMelanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 652 ) (Medici, Carmen) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 28, 2011 652 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Declaration and Submit Proposed Schedule for Supplemental Expert Reports filed by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 27, 2011 651 Minute Entry: Arguments heard, matter submitted. Court to issue order.Motion Hearing held on 6/27/2011 before James Ware (Date Filed: 6/27/2011) re 605 MOTION to Strike; Motion to Certify Class filed by Melanie Tucker. (Court Reporter Margo Gurule.) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 650 Featured Case ORDER requiring supplemental declaration. Signed by Judge James Ware on June 27, 2011. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 24, 2011 649 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 646 Opposition/Response to Motion, 647 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Declaration of David C. Kiernan In Support of Apple's Further Supplemental Brief Re Class Certification Doc. 646, 648 Declaration in Support of Apple's Further Supplemental Brief Re Class Certification (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 23, 2011 648 Declaration of David C. Kiernan in Support of 646 Opposition/Response to Motion ISO Apple's Further Supplemental Brief Re Class Certification filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 646 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 647 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Declaration of David C. Kiernan In Support of Apple's Further Supplemental Brief Re Class Certification Doc. 646 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in support of motion to file under seal, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 646 RESPONSE (re 486 REDACTION to RENEWED MOTION to Certify Class ) in Response to the Court's June 22, 2011 Order Requiring Further Supplemental Briefing filed byApple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 645 REDACTION Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to the Court's June 22, 2011 Order Requiring Further Supplemental Briefing by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 644 REDACTION Plaintiffs' Response to the Court's June 22, 2011 Order Requiring Further Supplemental Briefing by Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 643 Letter from Bonny E. Sweeney. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 642 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Response to the Court's June 22, 2011 Order Requiring Further Supplemental Briefing filed by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney, # 2 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 641 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 602 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 640 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 630 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 22, 2011 639 Featured Case ORDER requiring further supplemental briefing. Signed by Judge James Ware on June 22, 2011. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 22, 2011 638 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Apple's Request for Leave and Supplemental Brief Re Wal-Mart Stores Inc. v. Dukes (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 7, 2011 637 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 628 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Carmen A. Medici in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Apple's Supplemental Objections to Reply Declaration of Roger G. Noll and Supplemental Opposition to Class Certification Motion by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Medici, Carmen) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 636 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 628 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Apple's Supplemental Objections to Reply Declaration of Roger G. Noll and Supplemental Opposition to Class Certification Motion by Melanie Tucker. (Medici, Carmen) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 635 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 630 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 633 Redacted Document, 632 Redacted Document, 634 Declaration in Support, 631 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Michael Scott in Support of Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 6, 2011 634 Declaration of Michael Scott in Support of 633 Redacted Supplemental Brief Re Class Certification filed by Apple Inc.. (Related document(s) 633 ) (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 6/6/2011) Modified on 6/7/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2011 633 REDACTION to Supplemental Brief Re Class Certification amendment to 633 by Apple Inc.. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 6/6/2011) Modified on 6/7/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2011 632 *** FILED IN ERROR *** Please see 633 REDACTION to Apple's Supplemental Brief Re Class Certification by Apple Inc.. (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 6/6/2011) Modified on 6/7/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2011 631 DECLARATION of Michael Scott in Support of Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 6/6/2011) Modified on 6/7/2011,(counsel selected incorrect event) (cvS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2011 630 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Michael) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 6, 2011 629 Brief re 627 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Motion for Leave to File [Supplemental Brief In Support of Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion For Class Certification and Response to Court's May 19, 2011 Order] filed bySomtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Related document(s) 627 ) (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 3, 2011 628 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 606 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
May 20, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 486 REDACTION to RENEWED MOTION to Certify Class; Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 19, 2011 627 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting in part and denying in part 473 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 598 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot 599 Motion for Leave to File (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 11, 2011 626 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 3, 2011, before Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Court Reporter/Transcriber Stacy Wegner, Telephone number 859-539-2802. Tape Number: FTR. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/1/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2011.(jy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 6, 2011 625 Featured Case ORDER DENYING AS MOOT Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Date (Docket No. 556 ) and DENYING Plaintiffs' Request for Fees and Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/6/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 3, 2011 624 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/3/2011 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 5/3/2011) re 556 MOTION to Compel filed by Melanie Tucker. (Court Reporter FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/3/2011)
April 29, 2011 623 CLERKS NOTICE Motion Hearing re: Motion to Exclude 548 , continued from 05/02/11 and set for 6/27/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 28, 2011 622 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/18/2011, before Judge Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/26/2011. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 27, 2011 621 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: MAY 3, 2011 HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DATA. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT the hearing on Plaintiffs' motion to compel the production of data (Docket No. 556), currently set for May 3, 2011 at 10:00 a.m., shall be conducted telephonically. The parties shall initiate the call to the Court via CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 just prior to the time appointed for the hearing. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2011)
April 26, 2011 620 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 618 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Data by Melanie Tucker. (Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 26, 2011 619 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 618 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Data by Melanie Tucker. (Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 26, 2011 618 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 612 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/26/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 25, 2011 617 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 616 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Defendant's Expert, Dr. Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D. by Melanie Tucker. (Merrick, Thomas) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 22, 2011 616 Featured Case ORDER Granting 610 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/22/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 19, 2011 614 REDACTION to Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Data by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/19/2011) Modified on 4/20/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2011 613 REDACTION Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Data by Melanie Tucker. (Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 19, 2011 612 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Data and the Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(c) filed by Melanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (Attachments: # 1 Pursuant to General Order 62 Declaration will be marked *Restricted* and will not be viewable by the public (or the filer). # 2 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 4/19/2011) Modified on 4/19/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2011 615 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/18/2011 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 4/18/2011) re 473 REDACTION to MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc. The motion is taken under submission. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/18/2011)
April 17, 2011 611 REDACTION Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Defendants Expert, Dr. Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D. by Melanie Tucker. (Merrick, Thomas) (Filed on 4/17/2011)
April 17, 2011 610 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Defendant's Expert, Dr. Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D. Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(b)-(c) filed by Melanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Attachments: # 1 Pursuant to General Order 62 Declaration will be marked *Restricted* and will not be viewable by the public (or the filer). # 2 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 4/17/2011) Modified on 4/19/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2011 609 Declaration of Carmen A. Medici in Support of 607 MOTION for Leave to File to File Plaintiffs' Opposition to Apple's Supplemental Objections to Reply Declaration of Roger G. Noll and Supplemental Opposition to Class Certification Motion, 582 Objection [Declaration of Carmen A. Medici in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Apples Supplemental Objections to Reply Declaration of Roger G. Noll and Supplemental Opposition to Class Certification Motion] filed byMelanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 607 , 582 ) (Medici, Carmen) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 15, 2011 608 RESPONSE to re 607 MOTION for Leave to File to File Plaintiffs' Opposition to Apple's Supplemental Objections to Reply Declaration of Roger G. Noll and Supplemental Opposition to Class Certification Motion, 582 Objection [Plaintiffs Opposition to Apples Supplemental Objections to Reply Declaration of Roger G. Noll and Supplemental Opposition to Class Certification Motion] by Melanie Tucker. (Medici, Carmen) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 15, 2011 607 MOTION for Leave to File to File Plaintiffs' Opposition to Apple's Supplemental Objections to Reply Declaration of Roger G. Noll and Supplemental Opposition to Class Certification Motion filed by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 15, 2011 606 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Apple's Supplemental Objections to Reply Declaration of Roger G. Noll and Supplemental Opposition to Class Certification Motion and Exhibits 1-2 to the Declaration of Carmen A. Medici Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(b)-(c) filed by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # Pursuant to General Order 62 Declaration will be marked *Restricted* and will not be viewable by the public (or the filer). # 2 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 4/15/2011) Modified on 4/19/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2011 605 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D. filed by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/15/2011) Modified on 4/15/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2011 604 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Strike the Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D. filed by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/15/2011) Modified on 4/15/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2011 603 Pursuant to General Order 62 Declaration will be marked *Restricted* and will not be viewable by the public (or the filer). Declaration of Michael Scott in Support of 602 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 602 ) (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 4/15/2011) Modified on 4/15/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2011 602 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Michael) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 15, 2011 601 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of Plaintiffs Submission of Supplemental Evidence From the Deposition of Steve Jobs in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Summary Judgment filed by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4-5)(Related document(s) 600 , 514 , 599 ) (Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/15/2011) Modified on 4/15/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2011 600 REDACTION to Submission of Supplemental Evidence From the Deposition of Steve Jobs in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Summary Judgment] (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 4/15/2011) Modified text on 4/15/2011,(to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2011 599 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Evidence From the Deposition of Steve Jobs in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 15, 2011 598 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Evidence From the Deposition of Steve Jobs in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Summary Judgment and Exhibits 1-3, 5 to the Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(b)-(c) filed by Melanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Attachments: # 1 Pursuant to General Order 62 Declaration will be marked *Restricted* and will not be viewable by the public (or the filer)., # 2 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 4/15/2011) Modified on 4/15/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2011 597 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 592 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Defendant's Expert, Dr. Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D. by Apple Inc.. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
April 14, 2011 596 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 592 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Report of Dr. Michelle M. Burtis in Support of Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
April 14, 2011 595 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 592 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of David C. Kiernan in Support of Apple Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Defendant's Expert, Dr. Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
April 13, 2011 594 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 584 Defendant's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/13/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 13, 2011 593 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 591 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Apple's Objections to Plaintiffs' Evidence Filed in Support of Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for Class Certification and Exhibits 1-30 by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-30)(Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 13, 2011 592 Featured Case ORDER Granting 578 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/13/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 13, 2011 591 Featured Case ORDER Granting 574 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/13/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 13, 2011 590 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 588 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Data by Melanie Tucker. (Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 13, 2011 589 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 588 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Production of Data by Melanie Tucker. (Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/13/2011) Modified on 4/21/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/21/2011, Counsel failed to calendar motion hearing. (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2011 588 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 549 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Motion to Compel and Bernay Declaration Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(c) . Plaintiffs shall e-filed the documents per General Order No. 62. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/13/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011) Modified on 4/21/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/21/2011 Clerk calendared motion hearing. (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2011 587 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 586 Redacted Document, 585 Redacted Document, 584 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Apple's Opposition to Motion to Compel (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 12, 2011 586 REDACTION to Declaration of David C. Kiernan in Support of Apple's 585 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 4/12/2011) Modified on 4/14/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2011 585 REDACTION to Opposition to Motion to Compel by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 4/12/2011) Modified on 4/14/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2011 584 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Attachments: # 1 Michael Scott Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Scott, Michael) (Filed on 4/12/2011) Modified on 4/21/2011 Clerk calendared motion hearing. (cvS, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2011 583 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
April 11, 2011 582 SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTIONS to Reply Declaration of Roger C. Noll and Supplemental Opposition To Class Certification Motion by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 4/11/2011) Modified on 4/12/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2011 581 Proposed Order re 579 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Objections To Reply Declaration of Roger C. Noll and Supplemental Opposition to Class Certification Motion by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 11, 2011 580 OPPOSITION to Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Defendant's Expert, Dr. Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Expert Report)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 4/11/2011) Modified on 4/12/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2011 579 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Objections To Reply Declaration of Roger C. Noll and Supplemental Opposition to Class Certification Motion filed by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 11, 2011 578 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Scott, # 2 Exhibit 1-3, # 3 Proposed Order)(Scott, Michael) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 11, 2011 577 Declaration of Paula M. Roach in Support of 575 Response ( Non Motion ), Response ( Non Motion ) Declaration of Paula M. Roach in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Apples Objections to Plaintiffs Evidence Filed in Support of Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for Class Certification filed byMelanie Tucker. (Related document(s) 575 ) (Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 11, 2011 576 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of 575 Response ( Non Motion ), Response ( Non Motion ) Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Apples Objections to Plaintiffs Evidence Filed in Support of Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for Class Certification filed byMelanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-30 [Redacted])(Related document(s) 575 ) (Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 11, 2011 575 OPPOSITION to 572 Objection, to plaintiffs' evidence filed in support of reply in support of plaintiff's renewed motion for class certification by Melanie Tucker. (Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/11/2011) Modified on 4/12/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2011 574 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 1-30 to the Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Apples Objections to Plaintiffs Evidence Filed in Support of Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(b) filed by Melanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Attachments: # 1 Pursuant to General Order 62 Declaration will be marked *Restricted* and will not be viewable by the public (or the filer). # 2 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 4/11/2011) Modified on 4/12/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2011 573 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Response to Apples Objections to Plaintiffs Evidence Filed in Support of Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for Class Certification filed by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 4, 2011 572 OBJECTIONS to evidence filed in support of reply in support of REDACTED RENEWED MOTION to Certify Class by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 4/4/2011) Modified text on 4/6/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2011 571 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 562 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude The Opinions of Defendant's Expert, Dr. Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D. by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 4, 2011 570 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 562 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Defendant's Expert, Dr. Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D. by Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 4, 2011 569 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 561 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Carmen A. Medici in Support of Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 4, 2011 568 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 561 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification by Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 4, 2011 567 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 561 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply Declaration of Roger G. Noll by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 4, 2011 566 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 561 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification by Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 4, 2011 565 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Apple Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit 1)(Scott, Michael) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 4, 2011 564 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 560 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Michael T. Scott in Support of Apple's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment by Apple Inc.. (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 4, 2011 563 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 560 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment by Apple Inc.. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 1, 2011 562 Featured Case ORDER Granting 548 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/1/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
April 1, 2011 561 Featured Case ORDER Granting 547 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/1/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
April 1, 2011 560 Featured Case ORDER Granting 545 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/1/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
March 30, 2011 559 Exhibits 4c and 8b to the Declaration of Augustin Farrugia) (Kiernan, David) (Notice of Manual Filing)(Filed on 3/30/2011) Modified on 3/31/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2011 558 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 29, 2011 557 REDACTION to Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Production of Data by Melanie Tucker. (Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 3/29/2011) Modified on 4/4/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2011 556 REDACTION to Motion to Compel Production of Data by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 3/29/2011) Modified on 4/4/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2011 555 Declaration Of Alexandra S. Bernay In Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Defendants Expert, Dr. Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D. by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 3/29/2011) Modified on 4/6/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2011 554 REDACTION to Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Defendants Expert, Dr. Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D. by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 3/29/2011) Modified on 4/4/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2011 553 Declaration of Carmen A. Medici in Support of Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for Class Certification filed by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-2)(Related document(s) 547 ) (Medici, Carmen) (Filed on 3/29/2011) Modified on 3/31/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2011 552 REDACTION to Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for Class Certification by Melanie Tucker. (Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 3/29/2011) Modified on 3/31/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2011 551 REDACTION to Reply Declaration of Roger G. Noll by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-3)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 3/29/2011) Modified on 4/4/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2011 550 REDACTION to Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for Class Certification, Portions of the Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support Thereof and Exhibits 1-2 < by Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 3/29/2011) Modified on 3/31/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2011 549 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions Of Plaintiffs Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Production Of Data And Declaration Of Alexandra S. Bernay In Support Thereof Pursuant To Local Rule 79-5(C) filed by Melanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (Attachments: # 1Pursuant to General Order 62 Declaration will be marked *Restricted* and will not be viewable by the public (or the filer). # 2 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 3/28/2011) Modified on 3/30/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2011 548 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions Of Plaintiffs Motion To Exclude The Opinions Of Defendants Expert, Dr. Michelle M. Burtis, Ph.D. And Exhibit 1 To The Declaration Of Alexandra S. Bernay In Support Thereof Pursuant To Local Rule 79-5(B)-(C) filed by Melanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Attachments: # 1 Pursuant to General Order 62 Declaration will be marked *Restricted* and will not be viewable by the public (or the filer). # 2 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 3/28/2011) Modified on 3/30/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2011 547 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Renewed Motion for Class Certification, Portions of the Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support Thereof and Exhibits 1-2 to the Declaration of Carmen A. Medici in Support Thereof and Portions of the Reply Declaration of Roger G. Noll and Exhibits 1-3 Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(b)-(c) filed by Melanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Attachments: # 1 Pursuant to General Order 62 Declaration will be marked *Restricted* and will not be viewable by the public (or the filer)., # 2 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 3/28/2011) Modified on 3/30/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2011 546 REDACTION to Reply in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed by Apple Inc.. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 3/28/2011) Modified on 3/31/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2011 545 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of MSJ and Declaration of Michael Scott filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit David Kiernan decl, # 2 Exhibit 1 and 2, # 3 Proposed Order)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 21, 2011 544 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 15, 2011, before Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Court Reporter/Transcriber Stacy Wegner, Telephone number 859-539-2802. Tape Number: FTR. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 4/11/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/21/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2011. (jy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 21, 2011 543 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 396 Apple Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/21/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 18, 2011 542 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 524 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of David Kiernan in Support of Apple's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 4)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 17, 2011 541 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 524 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Augustin Farrugia in Support of Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3a, # 4 Exhibit 3b, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8a)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 17, 2011 540 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 527 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of David F. Martin in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment by Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 17, 2011 539 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 527 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5-11, # 2 Exhibit 14-18, # 3 Exhibit 20-26, # 4 Exhibit 28, # 5 Exhibit 30-38, # 6 Exhibit 39, # 7 Exhibit 40-47, # 8 Exhibit 48, # 9 Exhibit 50-52, # 10 Exhibit 54-57)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 17, 2011 538 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 524 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Jeffrey Robbin in Support of Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 Exhibit 6, # 5 Exhibit 7a, # 6 Exhibit 7b, # 7 Exhibit 8, # 8 Exhibit 9, # 9 Exhibit 10, # 10 Exhibit 11, # 11 Exhibit 12, # 12 Exhibit 13, # 13 Exhibit 14, # 14 Exhibit 15, # 15 Exhibit 16, # 16 Exhibit 19, # 17 Exhibit 20, # 18 Exhibit 21, # 19 Exhibit 22, # 20 Exhibit 23, # 21 Exhibit 24, # 22 Exhibit 25a, # 23 Exhibit 25b, # 24 Exhibit 26, # 25 Exhibit 27, # 26 Exhibit 28, # 27 Exhibit 29, # 28 Exhibit 30, # 29 Exhibit 31a, # 30 Exhibit 31b, # 31 Exhibit 32, # 32 Exhibit 33a, # 33 Exhibit 34, # 34 Exhibit 35, # 35 Exhibit 36a, # 36 Exhibit 37, # 37 Exhibit 38, # 38 Exhibit 39a, # 39 Exhibit 39b, # 40 Exhibit 39c, # 41 Exhibit 40, # 42 Exhibit 41, # 43 Exhibit 42)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 17, 2011 537 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 527 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment by Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 17, 2011 536 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 524 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Dr. John P.J. Kelly in Support of Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by Apple Inc.. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 17, 2011 535 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 525 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Roger G. Noll by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-12, # 2 Appendix B)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 17, 2011 534 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 525 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Lead Class Counsel by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10, # 2 Exhibit 11-17, # 3 Exhibit 19-29, # 4 Exhibit 31)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 17, 2011 533 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 524 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment by Apple Inc.. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 17, 2011 532 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 525 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Lead Class Counsel by Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 15, 2011 531 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 526 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to David Kiernan Declaration by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2-5)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
March 15, 2011 530 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 526 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Expert Report of Dr. Michelle M. Burtis by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
March 15, 2011 529 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 526 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple's Opposition to Renewed Motion for Class Certification by Apple Inc.. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
March 15, 2011 528 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/15/2011 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 3/15/2011) re 396 (Court Reporter FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/15/2011)
March 11, 2011 527 Featured Case ORDER Granting 513 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/11/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 11, 2011 526 Featured Case ORDER Granting 509 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/11/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 11, 2011 525 Featured Case ORDER Granting 475 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/11/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 11, 2011 524 Featured Case ORDER Granting 466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/11/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 11, 2011 523 Featured Case ORDER re 521 setting hearing on 396 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Preventing the Deposition of Steve Jobs. Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/11/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 10, 2011 522 Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of 521 Stipulation, to Shorten Time for Hearing the Motion for a Protective Order Preventing the Deposition of Steve Jobs filed byMelanie Tucker. (Related document(s) 521 ) (Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
March 10, 2011 521 STIPULATION to Shorten Time for Hearing the Motion for a Protective Order Preventing the Deposition of Steve Jobs by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order to Shorten Time for Hearing the Motion for a Protective Order Preventing the Deposition of Steve Jobs)(Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
March 9, 2011 520 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 518 Document E-Filed Under Seal, 517 Document E-Filed Under Seal (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
March 7, 2011 519 RESPONSE (re 513 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support Thereof and Exhibits 5-11, 14-18, 20-26, 28, 30-48, 50-52 And 54- ) Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 518 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 491 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration in support of Response to Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Apple Inc.. (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 517 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 491 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Response to Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Apple Inc.. (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 3, 2011 516 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re documents submitted under seal in support of Apple's 2/28/2011 filing (Stewart, Craig) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
February 28, 2011 515 REDACTION to Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of Plaintiffs' 514 redacted Memorandum in Opposition to Apple's 473 Motion for Summary Judgment by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-57 [Redacted])(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 2/28/2011) Modified on 3/1/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2011 514 REDACTION to Memorandum in Opposition to Apple's 473 Motion for Summary Judgment, Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support Thereof and Exhibits 5-11, 14-18, 20-26, 28, 30-48, 50-52 And 54 by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 2/28/2011) Modified on 3/1/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/1/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2011 513 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support Thereof and Exhibits 5-11, 14-18, 20-26, 28, 30-48, 50-52 And 54-57 Attached Thereto, and Declaration Of David Martin Pursuant To Local Rule 79-5(b)-(c). filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support Thereof, *** Declaration will be marked *Restricted* and will not be viewable by the public (or the filer). Per General Order 62. # 2 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 2/28/2011) Modified on 3/1/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2011 512 OPPOSITION to 486 Renewed Motion for Class Certification filed by Apple Inc.. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 2/28/2011) Modified on 3/1/2011,(incorrect link.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2011 511 REDACTION Expert Report of Dr. Michelle M. Burtis by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations), # 2 Exhibit A)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
February 28, 2011 510 Declaration of Michael T. Scott in Support of Apple Inc.'s 509 Administrative Motion to Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3)(Scott, Michael) (Filed on 2/28/2011) Modified on 3/1/2011,(link to motion.)*** Declaration will be marked *Restricted* and will not be viewable by the public (or the filer). Per General Order 62. (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2011 509 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal portions of Apples Opposition to Renewed Motion for Class Certification and the Expert Report of Dr. Michelle M. Burtis and the exhibits to the Declaration of David C. Kiernan in support thereof filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Michael) (Filed on 2/28/2011) Modified on 3/1/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2011 508 Declaration of David Kiernan in Support of Apple Inc.'s 512 Opposition to 486 Renewed Motion for Class Certification filed by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 2/28/2011) Modified on 3/1/2011,(link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2011 507 Featured Case ORDER Granting 504 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Paula Michelle Roach terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/10/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 8, 2011 506 ERRATA re 472 Exhibits, 471 Declaration in Support, Notice of Errata to Declaration of Augustin Farrugia in Support of Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Errata)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
February 8, 2011 505 NOTICE of Appearance by Carmen Anthony Medici (Medici, Carmen) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
February 4, 2011 504 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Paula M. Roach filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Roach, Paula) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
January 26, 2011 503 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 491 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion Regarding Schedule for Class Certification and Depositions by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 502 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 491 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion Regarding Schedule for Class Certification and Depositions by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 501 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 463 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of Plaintffs Melanie Tucker, Mariana Rosen, and Somtai Troy Charoensak's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 500 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 463 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Melanie Tucker, Mariana Rosen, and Somtai Troy Charoensak's Memorandum in Oppostion to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 499 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 438 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Paula M. Roach in Support of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum in Further Support of Their Opposition to Apple, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order Preventing the Deposition of Steve Jobs by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-12)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 498 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 438 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum in Further Support of Their Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order Preventing the Deposition of Steve Jobs by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 497 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 422 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order Preventing the Deposition of Steve Jobs by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit 8, # 8 Exhibit 9, # 9 Exhibit 10, # 10 Exhibit 11)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 496 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 422 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order Preventing the Deposition of Steve Jobs by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 25, 2011 495 Proposed Order re 475 Administrative Motion to Seal portions of MOTION for Class Certification and declaration in support thereof. by Apple Inc.. (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2011) Modified on 1/26/2011,(link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2011 494 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 492 Declaration in Support, 493 Declaration in Support, 490 Response in Support (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 25, 2011 493 Declaration of Michael T. Scott in Support of 490 Response in Support Declaration of Michael T. Scott In Support Of Apple Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 490 ) (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 25, 2011 492 Declaration of Mark Buckley in Support of 490 Response in Support Declaration of Mark Buckley In Support of Apple Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 490 ) (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 25, 2011 491 Featured Case ORDER Granting 434 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/25/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 25, 2011 490 RESPONSE in Support re 475 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 25, 2011 489 Declaration of Paula M. Roach in Support of Plaintiffs 486 REDACTED Renewed Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Lead Class Counsel CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 480 filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Roach, Paula) (Filed on 1/25/2011) Modified on 1/25/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2011 488 REDACTION to REDACTION 479 Declaration of Roger G. Noll by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-12 [Redacted], # 2 Appendix A, # 3 Appendix B [Redacted])(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/25/2011) Modified on 1/25/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2011 487 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of Plaintiffs 486 REDACTED Renewed Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Lead Class Counsel CORRECTION to # 478 filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-17 [Redacted], # 2 Exhibit 18, # 3 Exhibit 19-29 [Redacted], # 4 Exhibit 30, # 5 Exhibit 31)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/25/2011) Modified on 1/25/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2011 486 REDACTION to Plaintiffs 477 REDACTION Renewed Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Lead Class Counsel by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointing Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP As Lead Class Counsel)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/25/2011) Modified on 1/25/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2011 485 REDACTION to 443 REDACTED Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of Plaintiffs Melanie Tucker, Mariana Rosen, and Somtai Troy Charoensaks Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Apple Inc.s Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production CORRECTION to 443 by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/25/2011) Modified on 1/25/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2011 484 REDACTION to 442 REDACTED Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Request for Production CORRECTION to # 442 by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/25/2011) Modified on 1/25/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2011 483 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Evidence in Support of Their Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order Preventing the Deposition of Steve Jobs filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum in Further Support of Their Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order Preventing the Deposition of Steve Jobs, # 2 Declaration of Paula M. Roach in Support of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum in Further Support of Their Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order Preventing the Deposition of Steve Jobs and Redacted Exhibits 1-12, # 3 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Additional Evidence in Support of Their Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order Preventing the Deposition of Steve Jobs)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 24, 2011 482 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 19, 2011 481 Featured Case ORDER re 474 TERMINATING 410 Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production. Apple may file another motion to compel if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/19/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 18, 2011 480 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. REFER TO DOCUMENT 489 *** Declaration of Paula M. Roach in Support of 477 Redacted version of the Renewed Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Lead Class Counsel filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Related document(s) 477 ) (Roach, Paula) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011 *** an order to file the redacted version of the document has not been filed.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/25/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/25/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 479 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. REFER TO DOCUMENT 488 *** REDACTION to Declaration of Roger G. Noll by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-12 (Redacted), # 2 Appendix A, # 3 Appendix B (Redacted))(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/25/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/25/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/25/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/25/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 478 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. REFER TO DOCUMENT 487 *** Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of 477 Redacted Document, Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Renewed Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Lead Class Counsel filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-17 (Redacted), # 2 Exhibit 18, # 3 Errata 19-29 (Redacted), # 4 Exhibit 30, # 5 Exhibit 31 (Redacted)(Related document(s) 477 ) (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011, *** an order to file the redacted version of the document has not been filed.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/25/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/25/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 477 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. REFER TO DOCUMENT 486 *** REDACTION to Renewed Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Lead Class Counsel by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011,*** an order to file the redacted version has not been granted.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/25/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/25/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/25/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 476 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of 475 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Related document(s) 475 ) (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011, ***(Per General Order 62 the Declaration will be marked *Restricted* and will not be viewable by the public.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 475 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Lead Class Counsel, Exhibits 1-17, 19-29 & 31 to the Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney and Exhibits 1-12, Portions of Appendix B and Portions of the Declaration of Roger G. Noll Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(b)-(c)filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 474 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Apple's 410 Motion To Compel by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 473 REDACTION to MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011,(an order to file the redacted version has not been filed.)(cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/25/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 472 Declaration of Augustin Farrugia in support of Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment. filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 list of exhibits being "SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL. *** please note the motion has not been granted.)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 471 Declaration of Augustin Farrugia under seal in Support of Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment *** please note the motion has not been granted. filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4A, # 2 Exhibit 4B)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 470 Declaration of David Kiernan under seal in Support of Apple's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment *** please note the motion has not been granted. filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 list of exhibits filed under seal)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 469 Declaration of Jeffrey Robbin under seal. *** please note the motion has not been granted to file under seal the declaration.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 17A, # 2 Exhibit 17B, # 3 Exhibit 18, # 4 Exhibit 36B)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011, (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 468 Declaration of Jeffrey Robbin in Support of Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 list of exhibits filed under seal,*** please note the motion has not been granted.*** # 2 Exhibit 2A, # 3 Exhibit 2B, # 4 Exhibit 3A, # 5 Exhibit 3B)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011, (the motion has not been granted to file under seal exhibits). (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 467 Declaration of Jeffrey Robbin in Support of Apple's 466 Administrative Motion to Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011, *** Per General Order 62 the Declaration will be marked *Restricted* and will not be viewable by the public.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Michael) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/19/2011,(counsel selected incorrect event, the correct event is Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 465 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 447 Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/18/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 464 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 449 Apple Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/18/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 463 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 440 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/18/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 462 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 461 . The 1/18/2011 hearing on defendant Apple Inc.,'s motion for protective order 396 is VACATED without prejudice. Apple may re-notice its motion should circumstances later warrant doing so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/18/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 461 STIPULATION and [Proposed] order re 396 MOTION for Protective Order PREVENTING THE DEPOSITION OF STEVE JOBS by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/18/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2011 460 Featured Case ORDER Denying 432 Motion to Continue Schedule for Class Certification and Depositions. The parties shall comply with the Court's prior scheduling. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/14/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 14, 2011 459 NOTICE of Appearance by George A. Riley (Riley, George) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 14, 2011 458 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 456 Response in Support, 457 Declaration in Support, (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 14, 2011 457 Declaration of Mark Buckley in Support of 456 Response in Support, Declaration of Mark Buckley in Support of Apple Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Adminitrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 456 ) (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 14, 2011 456 RESPONSE in Support re 440 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Michael) (Filed on 1/14/2011) Modified on 1/18/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2011 455 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 454 Declaration in Support, 453 Response in Support (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 14, 2011 454 Declaration of Mark Buckley in Support of 453 Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Related document(s) 453 ) (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 1/14/2011) Modified on 1/18/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2011 453 RESPONSE in Support re 434 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 13, 2011 452 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 450 Response, 451 Declaration in Support, (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 13, 2011 451 Declaration of David C. Kiernan in Support of 450 Response, 449 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Apple Inc.'s Motion For Protective Order filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 450 , 449 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 13, 2011 450 Response re 449 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Apple Inc.'s Motion For Protective Order byApple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 13, 2011 449 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Apple Inc.'s Motion For Protective Order filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 13, 2011 448 Declaration of Michael Scott in Support of 447 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 447 ) (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 13, 2011 447 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Michael) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 12, 2011 446 Reply in Support of its Cross-Motion to Extend Time for Apple's Renewed Rule 56 Motion filed by Apple Inc.. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 1/12/2011) Modified on 1/13/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2011 445 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of 444 Reply in Support of Motion Re Scheduling and Opposition to Apple's Cross-Motion to Extend Time for Apple's Renewed Rule 56 Motion filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 444 ) (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/11/2011) Modified on 1/13/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2011 444 Reply Memorandum in Support Of Motion Re Scheduling and Opposition to Apple's Cross-Motion to Extend Time for Apple's Renewed Rule 56 Motion filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/11/2011) Modified on 1/12/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2011 443 REDACTION to Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of Plaintiffs Melanie Tucker, Mariana Rosen, and Somtai Troy Charoensak's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/11/2011) Modified on 1/12/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2011 442 REDACTION to Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/11/2011) Modified on 1/12/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2011 441 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of 440 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Related document(s) 440 ) (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/11/2011) Modified on 1/12/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2011 440 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Melanie Tucker, Mariana Rosen, and Somtai Troy Charoensak's Memorandum in Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production and Portions of the Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support Thereof Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(c) filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 439 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 426 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Leave to File Additional Evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/11/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 11, 2011 438 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 427 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/11/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 10, 2011 437 Memorandum in Opposition to 434 Motion re Scheduling and Cross-Motion to Extend Time for Renewed Rule 56 Motion filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 1/10/2011) Modified on 1/10/2011(link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2011 436 Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' 430 Motion to Shorten Time, and Cross-Motion to Shorten Time for Its Scheduling Motion filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order re: Motion to Shorten Time for Cross-Motion to extend Time for renewed Rule 56 Motion )(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 1/10/2011) Modified on 1/10/2011,(link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/13/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2011 435 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of 434 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Related document(s) 434 ) (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/7/2011) Modified on 1/10/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2011 434 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Motion Regarding Schedule for Class Certification and Depositions and Portions of the Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support thereof, Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(c) filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/7/2011) Modified on 1/10/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2011 433 REDACTION to Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion Regarding Schedule for Class Certification and Depositions by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/7/2011) Modified on 1/10/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2011 432 REDACTION to MOTION Regarding Schedule for Class Certification and Depositions related document 434 filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/7/2011) Modified on 1/10/2011,(counsel selected incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2011 431 Declaration of Paula M. Roach in Support of 430 MOTION to Shorten Time For Hearing Plaintiffs' Motion To Modify Scheduling Order As To Class Certification Briefing And Depositions filed bySomtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Related document(s) 430 ) (Roach, Paula) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 7, 2011 430 MOTION to Shorten Time For Hearing Plaintiffs' Motion To Modify Scheduling Order As To Class Certification Briefing And Depositions related document 434 filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/7/2011) Modified on 1/10/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2011 429 Declaration of Paula M. Roach in Support of 426 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Evidence in Support of Their Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order Preventing the Depostion of Steve Jobs filed bySomtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Related document(s) 426 ) (Roach, Paula) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 7, 2011 428 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of 427 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Related document(s) 427 ) (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/7/2011) Modified on 1/7/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2011 427 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum in Further Support of Their Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order Preventing the Deposition of Steve Jobs and Exhibits 1-12 to the Declaration of Paula M. Roach in Support Thereof, Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(b) and (c) filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 7, 2011 426 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Evidence in Support of Their Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order Preventing the Depostion of Steve Jobs filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (Attachments: # 1 [Redacted] Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum in Further Support of Their Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order Preventing Deposition of Steve Jobs, # 2 Declaration of Paula M. Roach in Support of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum in Further Support of Their Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order Preventing Deposition of Steve Jobs and Redacted Exhibits 1-12, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Additional Evidence in Support of Their Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order Preventing Deposition of Steve Jobs)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 6, 2011 425 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 423 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Declaration of David C. Kiernan in Support of Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order Preventing the Deposition of Steve Jobs by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
January 6, 2011 424 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 423 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Reply in Support of Its Motion for Protective Order Preventing the Deposition of Steve Jobs by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
January 6, 2011 423 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 417 Defendant's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (as modified by the Court). Apple shall file the documents in accordance with General Order 62. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/6/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
January 6, 2011 422 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 406 Plaintiff's Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Plaintiffs shall file the documents under seal in accordance with General Order 62. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/6/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
January 6, 2011 421 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 412 Defendant's Administrative Motion to Shorten Time re: Motion to Compel. Defendant's motion to compel shall be heard on February 1, 2011 as noticed and briefing on the motion shall proceed in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/6/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
January 4, 2011 420 Declaration of David C. Kiernan in Support of 419 Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion for Protective Order Preventing the Deposition of Steve Jobs filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 419 ) (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
January 4, 2011 419 Reply Memorandum In Support of Its 396 Motion for Protective Order Preventing the Deposition of Steve Jobs filed by Apple Inc.. (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 1/4/2011) Modified on 1/5/2011,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2011 418 Declaration of Michael Scott in Support of 417 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 417 ) (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
January 4, 2011 417 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Michael) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
January 4, 2011 416 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 401 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR TAKING DEPOSITIONS. The Stipulation is DENIED as vague and without prejudice to refile. In refiling the Stipulation, the parties shall provide a specific time line as to how much time is needed to complete the remaining depositions. Because this is a 2005 case, the Court will not permit the parties to have an open ended discovery schedule. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/4/2011.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
December 30, 2010 415 Declaration of Paula M. Roach in Support of 414 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendant's Motion to Shorten Time filed bySomtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Stacie Somers, Melanie Tucker. (Related document(s) 414 ) (Roach, Paula) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 414 Memorandum in Opposition re 412 MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing Defendant's Motion to Compel filed bySomtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Stacie Somers, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Shorten Time)(Roach, Paula) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 27, 2010 413 Declaration of David Kiernan in Support of Apple Inc.'s Administrative 412 Motion to Shorten Time filed by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 12/27/2010) Modified on 12/28/2010 (counsel failed to properly link to motion.)(cv, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2010 412 MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing Defendant's 410 Motion to Compel filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 12/27/2010) Modified on 12/28/2010(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2010 411 Declaration of David Kiernan in Support of 410 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F, # 2 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 410 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 27, 2010 410 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 23, 2010 409 Declaration of Eddy Cue in Support of 408 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Apple Inc.. (Related document(s) 408 ) (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 12/23/2010) Modified on 12/27/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2010 408 REPLY to Response to Motion Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Amended Administrative Motion to Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Michael) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 22, 2010 407 Amended Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of 406 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Related document(s) 406 ) (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 12/22/2010) Modified on 12/22/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2010 406 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Opposition to Apple, Inc.s Motion for Protective Order Preventing the Deposition of Steve Jobs, Portions of the Bernay Declaration and Exhibits 1-4 and 6-11 Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(b) and (c) filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (Amended))(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
December 20, 2010 405 REDACTION to 404 Redacted Document Declaration of Alexandra S. Bernay in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order Preventing the Deposition of Steve Jobs by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1,2,3,4,6,7,8,9,10,11, ***UNDER SEAL*** Unable to link to order granting to file under seal the exhibits. (Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 12/20/2010) Modified on 12/21/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2010 404 REDACTION to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Apple Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order Preventing the Deposition of Steve Jobs by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 20, 2010 403 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of 402 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Related document(s) 402 ) (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 12/20/2010) Modified on 12/21/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2010 402 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Apple, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order Preventing the Deposition of Steve Jobs and Exhibits 1-4 and 6-11 to the Bernay Declaration Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(b) and (c) filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 17, 2010 401 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR TAKING DEPOSITIONS by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen, Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 15, 2010 400 Featured Case ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DENYING EXTENSION OF FACT DISCOVERY. In light of the parties' pending dispositive Motions, the Court finds that a Case Management Conference is not necessary at this time. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the 12/20/2010 Conference. The Court will set a new Case Management Conference date in its Order addressing the parties' various Motions, if necessary. Further, the Court DENIES Defendants' request for a discovery extension as premature, without prejudice to raise the request again should their Motion for a Protective Order be denied. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/14/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 10, 2010 399 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc.. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 9, 2010 398 Proposed Order IN SUPPORT OF ( 396 ) APPLE INC.S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PREVENTING THE DEPOSITION OF STEVE JOBS by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 12/9/2010) Modified text to add linkage on 12/10/2010 (srm, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2010 397 Declaration of David C. Kiernan in Support of 396 MOTION for Protective Order PREVENTING THE DEPOSITION OF STEVE JOBS filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 To Kiernan Decl., # 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 To Kiernan Decl., # 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 To Kiernan Decl., # 4 Exhibit Ex. 4 To Kiernan Decl., # 5 Exhibit Ex. 5 To Kiernan Decl., # 6 Exhibit Ex. 6 To Kiernan Decl., # 7 Exhibit Ex. 7 To Kiernan Decl., # 8 Exhibit Ex. 8 To Kiernan Decl., # 9 Exhibit Ex. 9 To Kiernan Decl., # 10 Exhibit Ex. 10 To Kiernan Decl.)(Related document(s) 396 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
December 9, 2010 396 MOTION for Protective Order PREVENTING THE DEPOSITION OF STEVE JOBS filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
November 29, 2010 395 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding supplement to stipulated protective order 394 . Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/29/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 12, 2010 394 STIPULATION re 112 Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Supplement to Stipulated Protective Order by Apple Inc.. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 11, 2010 393 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Senya Bernay (Bernay, Alexandra) (Filed on 11/11/2010)
October 28, 2010 392 Featured Case STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE SCHEDULING DIRECT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. (1) Opening Briefs for both Motions shall be filed on or before January 17, 2011; (2) Opposition Briefs for both Motions shall be filed on or before February 28, 2011;(3) Reply Briefs for both Motions shall be filed on or before March 28, 2011; (4) The Court will conduct a hearing on both Motions on April 18, 2011 at 9 a.m. In light of the liberal schedule set forth above, providing the parties with ample time between now and the due date for the Opening Briefs for both Motions, the parties may not Stipulate to a different briefing schedule. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/28/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 22, 2010 391 Stipulation and Proposed Order Re: 384 Scheduling Direct Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification and Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 10/22/2010) Modified on 10/25/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2010 390 First Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint byApple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 14, 2010 389 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re Time To File Amended Answer and Defenses re 388 Stipulation filed by Apple Inc. Deadline to file by 9/24/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/14/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 10, 2010 388 STIPULATION re Time To File Amended Answer and Defenses by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 7, 2010 387 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Defendant's Answer and Defenses to Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Complaint by re 386 Stipulation. Response due 9/10/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/7/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 3, 2010 386 STIPULATION Stipulation Regarding Time to Respond to Defendant's Answer and Defenses to Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Complaint by Somtai Troy Charoensak. (Carpenter, Todd) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
July 30, 2010 385 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 7/30/2010) Modified on 8/2/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2010 384 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: On July 19, 2010, the Court conducted a Case Management Conference. In light of the discussion at the Conference, the Court orders as follows: The Direct Purchaser Action Plaintiffs shall have full and open discovery. Defendant may not stage or limit discovery. Close of Discovery due by 12/20/2010. Discovery in the Indirect Purchaser/iTunes Purchaser Plaintiff's action shall not commence until the Court addresses Defendants anticipated Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 12/10/2010. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Anticipated Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. The parties may Stipulate to a briefing schedule as to these Motions. However, All briefing shall be completed on or before 11/22/2010. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/21/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 19, 2010 383 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 7/19/2010 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 7/19/2010). Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2010. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Anticipated Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. The Court to issue further Order following Conference. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/19/2010)
July 9, 2010 382 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc.. Filed byStacie Somers. (Haeggquist, Alreen) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 381 STATUS REPORT Joint Case Management Statement by Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 380 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Answer the Amended Consolidated Complaint re 378 Stipulation. Response due 7/30/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/9/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 7, 2010 379 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 378 Stipulation (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 7, 2010 378 STIPULATION Regarding Time to Answer the Amended Consolidated Complaint by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
June 30, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2010. Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 29, 2010 377 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS; DENYING AS PREMATURE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; GRANTING INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge James Ware granting in part and denying in part 325 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 338 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 341 Sealed Motion (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
May 13, 2010 376 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/10/2010, before Judge Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/14/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2010. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 10, 2010 375 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/10/2010 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 5/10/2010) re (325 in 5:05-cv-00037-JW) MOTION to Dismiss Or, Alternatively, For Summary Judgment. Matter submitted after oral argument. The Court to issue further Order following hearing in both cases. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/10/2010)
May 7, 2010 372 Featured Case ORDER Granting 364 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/7/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 3, 2010 371 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 370 Proposed Order, 368 Response in Support, 369 Declaration in Support (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 370 Proposed Order re 364 MOTION to file under seal Reply pursuant to Rule 56(f) and declaration of T. Merrick by Apple Inc.. (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 5/3/2010) Modified on 5/4/2010,( counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2010 369 Declaration of Michael Scott in Support of 368 Response in Support of Apple's Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 368 ) (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 368 RESPONSE in Support re 364 MOTION to Seal Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
April 27, 2010 Received Document declaration (submitted) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 27, 2010 Received Document reply (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 27, 2010 Received Document Declaration (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 26, 2010 367 REDACTION to 366 Redacted Document Declaration of Thomas R. Merrick in Support of Motion for Additional Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(f) by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Merrick, Thomas) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 366 REDACTION to 345 Redacted Document Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Additional Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(f) by Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 365 Declaration of Thomas R. Merrick in Support of 364 MOTION to Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Their Motion for Additional Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(f)filed by Melanie Tucker. (Related document(s) 364 ) (Merrick, Thomas) (Filed on 4/26/2010) Modified on 4/27/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2010 364 MOTION to Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Their Motion for Additional Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(f), Portions of the Merrick Declaration and Portions of Exhibits A and C to the Merrick Declaration Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(c) filed by Melanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Merrick, Thomas) (Filed on 4/26/2010) Modified on 4/27/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2010 363 Declaration (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 362 Reply Memorandum (UNDER SEAL)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Received Document Declaration (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Received Document Reply (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 357 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 356 MOTION to Seal Reply and Declaration of David Kiernan (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Michael) (Filed on 4/12/2010) Modified on 4/13/2010,(counsel selected multiple motions.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2010 355 Declaration of David C. Kiernan in Support of 354 Reply to Opposition Declaration of David C. Kiernan in Support of Apple's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, for Summary Judgment [Redacted] filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Related document(s) 354 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 354 REDACTION to Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, for Summary Judgment [Redacted] filed by Apple Inc.. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 4/12/2010) Modified on 4/13/2010,(counsel selected incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2010 353 Featured Case ORDER Granting 343 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/8/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 7, 2010 352 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Hearings from 4/26/2010 to 5/10/2010 re 5:05-cv-00037-JW 325 , 341 . As to 5:05-cv-00037-JW: Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. As to 5:07-06507-JW: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/10/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. All briefing deadlines shall remain unchanged. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010) Modified text on 4/7/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2010 351 Proposed Order re 343 Motion To File Under Seal by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 3/29/2010) Modified on 3/30/2010,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2010 350 Declaration of Eddy Cue in Support of 349 Response in Support Plaintiffs' Motion To File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 349 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 29, 2010 349 RESPONSE in Support re 343 MOTION to Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 26, 2010 348 NOTICE by Melanie Tucker Notice of Firm Name Change (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 23, 2010 360 Declaration (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 23, 2010 359 Declaration (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 23, 2010 358 Memorandum in Opposition (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 23, 2010 Received Document Exhibits (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 23, 2010 Received Document declaration (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 23, 2010 Received Document memorandum (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 22, 2010 347 REDACTION to 345 Declaration of Paula M. Roach Pursuant to Rule 56(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Apple's Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, for Summary Judgment by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Roach, Paula) (Filed on 3/22/2010) Modified on 3/23/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2010 346 REDACTION Exhibits 2,3,4,5,7,9 to 345 Declaration of Thomas R. Merrick in Support of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Apple's Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, for Summary Judgment by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Merrick, Thomas) (Filed on 3/22/2010) Modified on 3/23/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2010 345 REDACTION to Memorandum in Opposition to Apple's Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, for Summary Judgment by Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 3/22/2010) Modified on 3/23/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2010 344 Declaration of Paula M. Roach in Support of 343 MOTION to Seal Notice of Motion and Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Apples Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, for Summary Judgment, Portions of the Roach Declaration and Exhibits 2, 3, 4 filed byMelanie Tucker. (Related document(s) 343 ) (Roach, Paula) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 22, 2010 343 MOTION to Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Apples Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, for Summary Judgment, Portions of the Roach Declaration and Exhibits 2, 3, 4, 5, 7, 9 to the Merrick Declaration Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(b)-(c) filed by Melanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Roach, Paula) (Filed on 3/22/2010) Modified on 3/23/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2010 340 Featured Case ORDER Granting 327 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 12, 2010 337 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 335 Motion to Withdraw 306 Motion to Compel by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 12, 2010 336 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART 304 Motion to Seal by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 9, 2010 335 MOTION to Withdraw 306 REDACTION to MOTION to Compel Further Response From Defendant Apple, Inc. Set For March 23, 2010 filed by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Roach, Paula) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
March 2, 2010 334 Declaration of Beth Kellermann in Support of 332 Memorandum in Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 332 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
March 2, 2010 333 Declaration of David C. Kiernan in Support of 332 Memorandum in Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 332 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
March 2, 2010 332 Memorandum in Opposition re 306 REDACTION to MOTION to Compel filed byApple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
February 22, 2010 342 Declaration (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 341 SEALED MOTION pursuant to 340 order. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Received Document Declaration (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Received Document Motion (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 331 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 330 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Robbin (Manual Filing Notification) (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 2/22/2010) Modified on 2/22/2010, ***(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity. The MFN is meant to be a place-holder for the real filing, NOT an event unto itself.***) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2010 329 MOTION to dismiss (Manual Filing Notification) (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 2/22/2010) Modified on 2/22/2010, ***(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity. The MFN is meant to be a place-holder for the real filing, NOT an event unto itself.***) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2010 328 Declaration of Jeffrey Robbin in Support of 327 MOTION to Seal Administrative Motion to Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 327 ) (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 327 MOTION to Seal Motion and Declaration filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Seal)(Scott, Michael) (Filed on 2/22/2010) Modified on 2/22/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2010 326 Declaration of Michael Scott in Support of 325 MOTION to Dismiss Or, Alternatively, For Summary Judgment filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 6-7)(Related document(s) 325 ) (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 325 REDACTION to MOTION to Dismiss Or, Alternatively, MOTION For Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 2/22/2010) Modified on 2/22/2010,(counsel selected incorrect event and failed to select multiple motions.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2010 324 Featured Case ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 323 Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/17/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 12, 2010 323 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
January 26, 2010 322 AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT for Violations of Sherman Antitrust Act, Clayton Act, Cartwright Act, California Unfair Competition Law, Consumers Legal Remedies Act, and California Common Law of Monopolization. Amendment to 321 against Apple Inc.. Filed by Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/26/2010) Modified on 1/27/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2010 321 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 322 . *** AMENDED COMPLAINT Complaint for Violations Of Sherman Antitrust Act, Clayton Act, Cartwright Act, California Unfair Competition Law, Consumers Legal Remedies Act, and California Common Law of Monopolization against Apple Inc.. Filed byMelanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/25/2010) Modified on 1/26/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2010 320 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re ( 310 ) Motion to Continue 311 Declaration in Support, 312 Proposed Order (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/22/2010) Modified text to add linkage on 1/25/2010 (srm, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2010 319 Proposed Order re Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Further Response From Defendant Apple Inc. and Exhibits 11, 17, 22, 23, 24, 27, 30, 35 to the Roach Declaration Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(b)-(c) by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/22/2010) Modified text on 1/26/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2010 318 Declaration of Eddy Cue in Support of 317 Response to 304 Motion to Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Related document(s) 317 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/22/2010) Modified text on 1/22/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2010 317 Response to 304 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/22/2010) Modified on 1/22/2010,(counsel selected incorrect event. Correct event to be used is response, and also failed to link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2010 316 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING Withdrawal of Attorney Tracy Strong re (273 in 5:05-cv-00037-JW) Notice of Change In Counsel. Attorney Tracy Strong terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 315 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING Withdrawal of Attorney Adam Sand re (272 in 5:05-cv-00037-JW) Notice of Change In Counsel. Attorney Adam Richard Sand, Esq terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/20/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 314 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 310 Motion to Continue by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Motion hearing on 306 continued to 3/23/2010. Opposition or statement of non-opposition due 3/2/2010. Any reply due 3/9/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 19, 2010 313 Memorandum in Opposition re 310 MOTION to Continue Apple Inc.s Administrative Motion to Continue the Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byMelanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Roach, Paula) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 15, 2010 312 Proposed Order re 310 MOTION to Continue the Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/15/2010) Modified on 1/19/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2010 311 Declaration of David C. Kiernan in Support of 310 MOTION to Continue Apple Inc.s Administrative Motion to Continue the Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 310 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 310 MOTION to Continue the Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed by Apple Inc.. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 1/15/2010) Modified on 1/19/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2010 309 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. Motion Hearing for 306 Motion to Compel Further Response from Defendant Apple, Inc. filed by Melanie Tucker continued to 2/16/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Lloyd. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
January 7, 2010 Judge Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to case for settlement purposes. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
January 7, 2010 308 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all further discovery matters. Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 01/07/10. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
January 5, 2010 339 Declaration (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 338 SEALED MOTION (UNDER SEAL) pursuant to 336 Order. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 Received Document Declaration (submitted) under seal). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 Received Document Motion (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 307 REDACTION to Declaration of Paula M. Roach in Support of 306 MOTION to Compel Further Response from Defendant Apple, Inc. filed by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-17, # 2 Exhibit 18-35)(Related document(s) 306 ) (Roach, Paula) (Filed on 1/5/2010) Modified on 1/6/2010 ,(counsel selected incorrect event.)(cv, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2010 306 REDACTION to MOTION to Compel Further Response from Defendant Apple, Inc. filed by Melanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/5/2010) Modified on 1/6/2010,(counsel selected incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2010 305 Declaration of Paula M. Roach in Support of 304 MOTION to Seal Notice of Motion and Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Further Response from Defendant Apple, Inc. and Exhibits 11, 17, 22, 23, 24, 27, 30, 35 to the Roach Declaration Pursuant to Local filed byMelanie Tucker. (Related document(s) 304 ) (Roach, Paula) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 304 MOTION to Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Further Response from Defendant Apple, Inc. and Exhibits 11, 17, 22, 23, 24, 27, 30, 35 to the Roach Declaration Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(b)-(c) filed by Melanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Roach, Paula) (Filed on 1/5/2010) Modified on 1/6/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings:, Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Amended Pleadings due by 1/25/2010. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 21, 2009 303 Featured Case ORDER DECERTIFYING CLASSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO BEING RENEWED; INVITING FURTHER MOTIONS denying 236 Motion ; granting 240 Motion ; granting 244 Motion for Reconsideration re 240 MOTION for Decertification of Rule 23(B)(3) Class filed by Apple Inc., 244 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Apple Inc., 236 MOTION to Modify Injunctive Relief Class Definition to Include iTMS Purchasers filed by Melanie Tucker (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 7, 2009 302 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/23/09, before Judge Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/28/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/4/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2010. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
November 23, 2009 301 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/23/2009 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 11/23/2009) re (240 in 5:05-cv-00037-JW) MOTION for Decertification of Rule 23(B)(3) Class, (244 in 5:05-cv-00037-JW) MOTION for Reconsideration, (250 in 5:05-cv-00037-JW) SEALED MOTION, (236 in 5:05-cv-00037-JW) MOTION to Modify Injunctive Relief Class Definition to Include iTMS Purchasers. Motion Hearing re Summary Judgment set for 2/8/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/23/2009)
November 20, 2009 300 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO INTRODUCE OTHER DEPOSITION PARTS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 32(a)(6) by Judge James Ware granting 293 Motion (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
November 17, 2009 295 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula Michelle Roach (Roach, Paula) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 17, 2009 294 Declaration of Thomas R. Merrick in Support of 293 MOTION Administrative Motion to Introduce Other Deposition Parts Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 32(a)(6) MOTION Administrative Motion to Introduce Other Deposition Parts Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 32(a)(6) filed byMelanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 293 ) (Merrick, Thomas) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 17, 2009 293 MOTION Administrative Motion to Introduce Other Deposition Parts Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 32(a)(6) filed by Melanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Merrick, Thomas) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 17, 2009 292 Featured Case ORDER Granting 280 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/17/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 17, 2009 291 Featured Case ORDER Granting 275 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/17/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 16, 2009 290 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE 275 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Apple Inc.. (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 11/16/2009) Modified on 11/16/2009,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2009 289 Declaration of EDDY CUE in Support of 288 Reply Memorandum DECLARATION OF EDDY CUE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 288 ) (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
November 16, 2009 288 RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' 275 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL filed by Apple Inc.. (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 11/16/2009) Modified on 11/16/2009,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2009 299 Declaration of T. R. Merrick (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
November 9, 2009 298 Reply Memorandum (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
November 9, 2009 297 Declaration of A. Rangel (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
November 9, 2009 296 RESPONSE in Support (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
November 9, 2009 287 Declaration of David C. Kiernan in Support of Reply on 240 Motion for Decertification of Rule 23(B)(3) Class filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibit 6-8, # 4 Exhibit 9-11, # 5 Exhibit 12, # 6 Exhibit 13 part 1 of 2, # 7 Exhibit 13 part 2 of 2)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 11/9/2009) Modified text on 11/13/2009,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2009 286 Reply Expert Report of Dr. Michelle M. Burtis filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 11/9/2009) Modified on 11/13/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2009 285 Reply in Support of 240 Motion for Decertification of Rule 23(B)(3) Class filed by Apple Inc.. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 11/9/2009) Modified on 11/13/2009,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2009 284 REDACTION to Reply in Support of Motion for Reconsideration of Rule 23(B)(2) Class filed by Apple Inc.. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 11/9/2009) Modified on 11/12/2009,(counsel selected incorrect event, Correct event to be used is redaction.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2009 283 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 281 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), 282 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
November 9, 2009 282 Reply in Support of Motion for Reconsideration of Rule 23(b)(2) Class (NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING) Item Under Seal (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 11/9/2009) Modified on 11/9/2009***(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity. The MFN is meant to be a place-holder for the real filing, NOT an event unto itself.***) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2009 281 Declaration of Art Rangel in Support of Apple's Reply in Support of Motion for Reconsideration of Rule 23(b)(2) Class - (NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL)Item Under Seal (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 11/9/2009) Modified on 11/9/2009***(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity. The MFN is meant to be a place-holder for the real filing, NOT an event unto itself.***) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2009 280 MOTION to Seal Defendants Reply in Support of Motion for Reconsideration of Rule 23(B)(2) Class and Declaration of Arthur Rangel filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Michael) (Filed on 11/9/2009) Modified text on 11/9/2009,(counsel selected incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2009 279 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
November 9, 2009 Received Document Declaration (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
November 9, 2009 Received Document Reply (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
November 9, 2009 278 REDACTION to Declaration of Thomas R. Merrick in Support of 277 Reply Memorandum filed by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 277 ) (Merrick, Thomas) (Filed on 11/9/2009) Modified on 11/12/2009,(counsel selected incorrect event, Correct event to be used is redaction.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2009 277 REDACTION to Reply Memorandum re 236 MOTION to Modify Injunctive Relief Class Definition to Include iTMS Purchasers filed by Melanie Tucker. (Merrick, Thomas) (Filed on 11/9/2009) Modified text on 11/12/2009,(counsel selected incorrect event, Correct event to be used is redaction.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2009 276 Declaration of Thomas R. Merrick in Support of 275 MOTION to Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Modify Injunctive Relief Class Definition to Include iTMS Purchasers and Exhibit 1 to the Merrick Declaration Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(b)-(c) filed by Melanie Tucker. (Related document(s) 275 ) (Merrick, Thomas) (Filed on 11/9/2009) Modified text on 11/13/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2009 275 MOTION to Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Modify Injunctive Relief Class Definition to Include iTMS Purchasers and Exhibit 1 to the Merrick Declaration Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(b)-(c) filed by Melanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Merrick, Thomas) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
October 30, 2009 274 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO THE FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION FOR VIOLATIONS OF SECTION 1 OF THE SHERMAN ACT AND THE FIFTH CAUSE OF ACTION FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE CARTWRIGHT ACT by Judge James Ware granting 229 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 30, 2009 273 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Robert Allan Mittelstaedt Withdrawal of Attorney Tracy Strong (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 30, 2009 272 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Robert Allan Mittelstaedt Withdrawal of Attorney Adam Sand (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 19, 2009 271 Declaration of Thomas R. Merrick in Support of 269 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Decertification of Rule 23(b)(3) Class filed by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 269 ) (Merrick, Thomas) (Filed on 10/19/2009) Modified on 10/26/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2009 270 Declaration of Roger G. Noll in Support of 269 Memorandum in Opposition (Reply Declaration of Roger G. Noll) filed byMelanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 269 ) (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
October 19, 2009 269 Memorandum in Opposition re 240 MOTION for Decertification of Rule 23(B)(3) Class filed byMelanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
October 16, 2009 268 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Briefing Schedule re 266 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/15/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
October 13, 2009 267 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/05/09, before Judge Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 11/2/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/10/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/8/2010. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
October 9, 2009 266 STIPULATION Regarding Briefing Schedule by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 6, 2009 264 Letter from Robert Mittelstaedt. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
October 5, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (236 in 5:05-cv-00037-JW) MOTION to Modify Injunctive Relief Class Definition to Include iTMS Purchasers, (240 in 5:05-cv-00037-JW) MOTION for Decertification of Rule 23(B)(3) Class, (244 in 5:05-cv-00037-JW) MOTION for Reconsideration, (250 in 5:05-cv-00037-JW) SEALED MOTION. Briefing to be completed by 11/9/2009. The parties shall meet and confer and Stipulate to a schedule that is consistent with the dates provided by the Court. Stipulation due on or before 10/9/2009. Binders due 11/13/2009. Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
October 5, 2009 265 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/5/2009 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 10/5/2009) re 229 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to plaintiffs' rule of reason tying claim. The Court took the matter under submission after oral argument. The Court to issue further order following hearing. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/5/2009)
October 5, 2009 263 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting in part and denying in part 259 Motion (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
September 25, 2009 262 Reply in support re Administrative 259 Motion To Set Briefing Schedule. filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 9/25/2009) Modified on 9/28/2009 ,(Document NOT linked to motion and Incorrect event used. Correct event to be used is reply in support.)(cv, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2009 261 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of 260 Memorandum in Opposition to Apple's Administrative Motion to Set Briefing Schedule for Decertification Motion filed byMelanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 260 ) (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 23, 2009 260 Memorandum in Opposition re 259 MOTION Briefing Schedule re Motion to Decertify filed byMelanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 22, 2009 259 MOTION Briefing Schedule re Motion to Decertify filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Robert Mittelstaedt, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
September 16, 2009 258 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT CONTINUING HEARING DATES re (252 in 5:05-cv-00037-JW) Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to (236 in 5:05-cv-00037-JW) MOTION to Modify Injunctive Relief Class Definition to Include iTMS Purchasers, (240 in 5:05-cv-00037-JW) MOTION for Decertification of Rule 23(B)(3) Class, (244 in 5:05-cv-00037-JW) MOTION for Reconsideration, (250 in 5:05-cv-00037-JW) SEALED MOTION are continued from 10/5/2009 to 11/9/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. PLEASE NOTE: The hearing on Apple's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings re the Rule of Reason(229 in 5:05-cv-00037-JW) shall remain on calendar for 10/5/2009, at 9 a.m. Apple shall file its reply brief on 9/18/2009.Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009) Modified docket text on 9/21/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2009 257 Reply Memorandum in Support of 229 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiffs' Rule of Reason Tying Claim filed by Apple Inc.. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 9/14/2009) Modified on 9/15/2009,(Document NOT linked to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2009 256 Declaration of Eddy Cue in Support of 255 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintffs' Motion to Modify Injunctive Relief Class Definition to Include iTMS Purchasers filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 255 ) (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
September 14, 2009 255 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' 236 Motion to Modify Injunctive Relief Class Definition to Include iTMS Purchasers filed by Apple Inc.. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 9/14/2009) Modified on 9/15/2009,(Document NOT linked to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2009 254 Declaration of Thomas R. Merrick in Support of 253 Memorandum in Opposition To Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of Rule 23(b)(2) Class filed byMelanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 253 ) (Merrick, Thomas) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
September 14, 2009 253 Memorandum in Opposition re 244 MOTION for Reconsideration of Rule 23(b)(2) Class filed byMelanie Tucker. (Merrick, Thomas) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
September 14, 2009 252 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order re Scheduling for Briefing and Hearing Pending Motions by Apple Inc.. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
September 3, 2009 248 Featured Case ORDER Granting 234 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/3/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
September 3, 2009 247 Featured Case ORDER Granting 232 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/3/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
August 31, 2009 251 Declaration of E. Cue (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 250 SEALED MOTION (UNDER SEAL) pursuant to 247 order. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 249 Declaration of T. R. Merrick (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 246 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 244 MOTION for Reconsideration, 243 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2009 Received Document declaration of E. Cue (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 Received Document motion (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 245 REDACTION to 244 Motion for Reconsideration of Rule 23(B)(2) Class by Apple Inc.. (Stewart, Craig) (Filed on 8/31/2009) Modified on 9/1/2009,(counsel failed to link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2009 244 MOTION for Reconsideration of Rule 23(B)(2) Class (NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING) (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 8/31/2009) Modified on 9/1/2009***(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity. The MFN is meant to be a place-holder for the real filing, NOT an event unto itself.***) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2009 243 DECLARATION of Eddy Cue (NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING) (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 8/31/2009) Modified on 9/1/2009***(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity. The MFN is meant to be a place-holder for the real filing, NOT an event unto itself.***) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2009 242 Declaration of Michael Scott in Support of 240 MOTION for Decertification of Rule 23(B)(3) Class filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Related document(s) 240 ) (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 8/31/2009) Modified on 9/1/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2009 241 Expert Report of Michelle M. Burtis filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations), # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D-F)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 8/31/2009) Modified on 9/1/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2009 240 MOTION for Decertification of Rule 23(B)(3) Class filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 8/31/2009) Modified on 9/1/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2009 239 Declaration in Support of 238 Brief Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Resposne to Court's July 17, 2009 Order as to Injunctive Relief Sought filed byMelanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 238 ) (Merrick, Thomas) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 238 Memorandum in Response to 228 Court's July 17, 2009 Order as to Injunctive Relief Sought filed by Melanie Tucker. (Related document(s) 228 ) (Merrick, Thomas) (Filed on 8/31/2009) Modified on 8/31/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2009 237 Declaration of Thomas R. Merrick in Support of 236 MOTION Motion to Modify Injunctive Relief Class Definition to Include iTMS Purchasers filed byMelanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 236 ) (Merrick, Thomas) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 236 MOTION to Modify Injunctive Relief Class Definition to Include iTMS Purchasers filed by Melanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Merrick, Thomas) (Filed on 8/31/2009) Modified on 8/31/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2009 Received Document declaration (submitted) under seal. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 235 Declaration of Thomas R. Merrick in Support of 234 MOTION to Seal Portion of Declaration of Thomas R. Merrick in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Response to Court's July 17, 2009 Order as to Injunctive Relief Sought filed by Melanie Tucker. (Related document(s) 234 ) (Merrick, Thomas) (Filed on 8/31/2009) Modified on 8/31/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2009 234 MOTION to file Under Seal Portion of Declaration of Thomas R. Merrick in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Response to Court's July 17, 2009 Order as to Injunctive Relief Sought filed by Melanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Merrick, Thomas) (Filed on 8/31/2009) Modified on 8/31/2009,(counsel used incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2009 233 Declaration of Steven Leung in Support of Apple's 232 Motion to File Under Seal Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of Rule 23(B)(2) Class and Declaration of Eddy Cue filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Scott, Michael) (Filed on 8/31/2009) Modified on 8/31/2009,(counsel failed to link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2009 232 MOTION to Seal Motion for Reconsideration of Rule 23(B)(2) Class and Declaration of Eddy Cue filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Michael) (Filed on 8/31/2009) Modified on 8/31/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2009 231 Declaration of Thomas R. Merrick in Support of 230 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiffs' Rule of Reason Claims filed byMelanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 230 ) (Merrick, Thomas) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
August 27, 2009 230 Memorandum in Opposition re 229 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to plaintiffs' rule of reason tying claim filed byMelanie Tucker. (Merrick, Thomas) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
August 3, 2009 229 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to plaintiffs' rule of reason tying claim filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
July 17, 2009 228 Featured Case ORDER Directing Parties to Submit Further Briefing. Motion hearing set for 10/5/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on July 17, 2009. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009) Modified docket text on 7/21/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2009 227 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR APPLE'S RULE 12(C) MOTION WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFFS' RULE OF REASON TYING CLAIM re 226 Stipulation filed by Apple Inc. Defendant shall file Rule 12(c) Motion by 8/3/2009; Opposition due 8/27/2009; Reply due 9/14/2009. Briefing on all motions shall be completed on or before 9/14/2009. At the completion of the briefing, the moving party shall compile a three ring binder due on or before 9/28/2009. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/10/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 8, 2009 226 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR APPLE'S RULE 12(C) MOTION WITH RESPECT TO PLAINTIFFS' RULE OF REASON TYING CLAIM by Apple Inc.. (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
June 30, 2009 225 Featured Case ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Briefing on all motions shall be completed on or before 9/14/2009. At the completion of the briefing, the moving party shall compile a three ring binder due on or before 9/28/2009. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/30/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
June 30, 2009 224 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/30/2009 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 6/30/2009). Anticipated Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. The Court to issue further Order following conference.(Court Reporter Unreported.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/30/2009)
June 26, 2009 223 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING TIME FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2009)
June 19, 2009 222 NOTICE of Appearance by David Craig Kiernan (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 4, 2009 221 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 66 Stipulation. The Court continues the Evidentiary Hearing and Case Management Conference from 6/5/2009 to 6/30/2009: 07-cv-06507-JW Somers v. Apple, Inc.: Evidentiary Hearing set for 6/30/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. As to 5:05-cv-00037-JW: Further Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2009 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/4/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2009)
May 28, 2009 220 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNECE FROM 6/1/2009 TO 6/5/2009 re 218 Joint Case Management Statement. Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/28/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
May 26, 2009 219 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Robert Merrick (Merrick, Thomas) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 22, 2009 218 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 19, 2009 217 Declaration of Helen Zeldes in Support of 214 Reply to Response to Motion to Certify Class and Appointment of Co-Lead Class Counsel filed byStacie Somers. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 214 ) (Haeggquist, Alreen) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
May 19, 2009 216 REPLY Memorandum in support of motion for class certification by Stacie Somers of Manual Filing (Haeggquist, Alreen) (Filed on 5/19/2009) Modified text on 5/20/2009, ***(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity. The MFN is meant to be a place-holder for the real filing, NOT an event unto itself.***)(cv, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2009 215 MOTION to Seal portions of the Reply Memorandum and Exhibits 2 and 4 to the Declaration of H. Zeldes filed by Stacie Somers. Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Haeggquist, Alreen) (Filed on 5/19/2009) Modified on 5/20/2009,(counsel used incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2009 214 REDACTION to REPLY in support of re 201 MOTION to Certify Class and MOTION to Appoint Class Counsel filed by Stacie Somers. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Appendix)(Haeggquist, Alreen) (Filed on 5/19/2009) Modified on 5/20/2009, (counsel used incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/22/2009. Case Management Conference set for 6/1/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 15, 2009 213 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting in part 200 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
March 19, 2009 212 Featured Case ORDER Vacating Hearing 200 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/19/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 9, 2009 211 Reply Memorandum In Support Of Defendant's 200 Motion for Judgment On The Pleadings As To Plaintiffs' Tying Claims filed by Apple Inc.. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 3/9/2009) Modified on 3/10/2009,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2009 210 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of 209 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiffs' Tying Claims filed byMelanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 209 ) (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
March 2, 2009 209 Memorandum in Opposition re 200 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings As To Plaintiffs' Tying Claims filed byMelanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 26, 2009 208 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael David Braun (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 25, 2009 207 DECLARATION of A. Haeggquist **NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING. (Haeggquist, Alreen) (Filed on 2/25/2009) Modified on 3/2/2009,**(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2009 206 Proposed Order re 204 MOTION to Seal Document by Stacie Somers. (Haeggquist, Alreen) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 25, 2009 205 Declaration of Alreen Haeggquist in Support of 204 MOTION to Seal Document filed byStacie Somers. (Related document(s) 204 ) (Haeggquist, Alreen) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 25, 2009 204 MOTION to Seal portions of exhibit 1 to the declaration of A. Haeggquist filed by Stacie Somers. (Haeggquist, Alreen) (Filed on 2/25/2009) Modified on 3/2/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2009 203 Proposed Order re 201 MOTION to Certify Class and Appoint Class Counsel by Stacie Somers. (Haeggquist, Alreen) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 25, 2009 202 Declaration of Alreen Haeggquist in Support of 201 MOTION to Certify Class and Appoint Class Counsel filed byStacie Somers. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (French Affidavit), # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (ZH Resume), # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 (MS Resume), # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 201 ) (Haeggquist, Alreen) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 25, 2009 201 MOTION to Certify Class and MOTION to Appoint Class Counsel filed by Stacie Somers. Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Haeggquist, Alreen) (Filed on 2/25/2009) Modified on 3/2/2009,(counsel failed to select multiple motions.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2009 200 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings As To Plaintiffs' Tying Claims filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
January 15, 2009 199 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/16/08, before Judge Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 2/2/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2009. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 15, 2009 198 Featured Case ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; CLARIFYING AND CORRECTING CLASS CERTIFICATION ORDER re 196 Order on Motion to Certify Class ; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. The Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2009 is VACATED. The Court sets hearing on Defendant's anticipated Motion for Reconsideration. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/14/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 6, 2009 197 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT filed by Apple Inc.. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
December 22, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings/Deadlines: pursuant to 196 Order. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/6/2009. Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 22, 2008 196 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting in part and denying in part 165 Motion to Certify Class (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 16, 2008 195 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2008 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 12/16/2008) re 165 MOTION to Certify Class and Appoint Class Counsel filed by Melanie Tucker. The Court VACATED the 12/16/2008 Case Management Conference. The Court took the matter under submission after oral argument. The Court to issue further Order on Motion and scheduling dates. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2008)
December 11, 2008 194 CLERKS NOTICE ADVANCING TIME FOR Motion Hearing re 165 Motion for Class Certification. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2008 09:00 AM. The Case Management to follow oral argument in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
December 10, 2008 193 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR THE DIRECT PURCHASERS ACTION; VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR THE INDIRECT PURCHASERS ACTION re (165 in 5:05-cv-00037-JW) MOTION to Certify Class and Appoint Class Counsel filed by Melanie Tucker. The Court continues the Class Cerfication Motion AND Case Management Conference in 5:05-cv-00037-JW from 12/15/2008 to 12/16/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. The Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2008 in 5:07-cv-06507-JW is VACATED. The Court will set a new Case Management Conference, if necessary, in its Order addressing Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time to File and Modify Briefing Schedule on Motion for Class Certification. (See Docket Item No. 36 in 5:07-cv-06507-JW.) Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/10/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
December 9, 2008 192 Featured Case ORDER Denying 190 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/9/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
December 4, 2008 191 Memorandum in Opposition re 190 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of 165 MOTION Class Certification MOTION for Leave to File filed by Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 12/4/2008) Modified text on 12/5/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2008 190 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of 165 MOTION Class Certification filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 12/2/2008) Modified on 12/2/2008,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2008 189 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of 188 Reply Memorandum, In Support of Plaintiffs' 165 Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel filed by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 188 ) (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 11/17/2008) Modified on 11/19/2008,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2008 188 Reply Memorandum In Support of Plaintiffs' 165 Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel filed by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Amended [Proposed] Order (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 11/17/2008) Modified on 11/19/2008,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2008 184 Featured Case ORDER Granting 173 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/23/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 20, 2008 185 CORRECTED COPY OF UNREDACTED Memorandum in Opposition (UNDER SEAL) pursuant to 184 order. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
October 20, 2008 Received AMENDED/corrected UNREDACTED MEMORANDUM (SUBMITTED) under seal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008) Modified on 10/20/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2008 183 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 181 Memorandum in Opposition, 182 Memorandum in Opposition, (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
October 20, 2008 182 UNREDACTED AMENDED/corrected MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 165 Motion for Class Certification NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING Document Submitted Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Related document(s) 177 ) (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 10/20/2008) Modified on 10/20/2008(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2008 181 REDACTED/corrected MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 165 Motion for Class Certification filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Addendum 1-2)(Related document(s) 175 ) (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 10/20/2008) Modified on 10/20/2008 (counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2008 187 Declaration of A. Rangel (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 186 Declaration of Jo-Anne Knysh (UNDER SEAL) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Received Declaration of Jo-Anne Knysh (SUBMITTED) under seal) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Received Declaration of A. Rangel (SUBMITTED) under seal)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 180 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 173 MOTION to Seal MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND THE DECLARATIONS OF JO-ANNE KNYSH AND ARTHUR RANGEL; DECLARATION OF TRACY M. STRONG IN SUPPORT, 177 Notice (Other), 179 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), 174 Proposed Order,, 175 Memorandum in Opposition,, 178 Notice (Other), (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 10/17/2008) Modified on 10/20/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2008 179 Declaration of Jo-Anne Knysh in Support of Apple's Memorandum in Opposition to 165 Motion for Class Certification - Document Submitted Under Seal (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 10/17/2008) Modified text on 10/20/2008 NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/14/2008) Modified text on 10/16/2008 ***(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity. The MFN is meant to be a place-holder for the real filing, NOT an event unto itself.***) (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2008 178 Declaration of Arthur Rangel in Support of Apple's Memorandum in Opposition to 165 Motion for Class Certification - Document Submitted Under Seal (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 10/17/2008) Modified text on 10/20/2008 NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/14/2008) Modified text on 10/16/2008 ***(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity. The MFN is meant to be a place-holder for the real filing, NOT an event unto itself.***) (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2008 177 UNREDACTED MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 165 Motion for Class Certification - Document Submitted Under Seal (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 10/17/2008) Modified text on 10/20/2008 NOTIFICATION OF MANUAL FILING (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 10/14/2008) Modified text on 10/16/2008 ***(counsel used incorrect event, pursuant to General Order 45 VII do not efile the MFN as a "Notice" of any activity. The MFN is meant to be a place-holder for the real filing, NOT an event unto itself.***) (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2008 176 Declaration of Michael Scott in Support of 175 Memorandum in Opposition re: 165 MOTION for class certification,filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-5, # 2 Exhibit 6-10, # 3 Exhibit 11-13, # 4 Exhibit 14-15, # 5 Exhibit 16-17, # 6 Exhibit 18-20, # 7 Exhibit 21)(Related document(s) 175 ) (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 10/17/2008) Modified on 10/20/2008,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2008 175 REDACTED DOCUMENT re: MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO 165 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION , 174 Proposed Order filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Addendum 1-2)(Related document(s) 173 , 174 ) (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 10/17/2008) Modified text on 10/20/2008,(counsel used incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2008 174 Proposed Order re 173 MOTION to Seal by Apple Inc.. (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 10/17/2008) Modified on 10/20/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2008 173 MOTION to Seal MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO 165 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND THE DECLARATIONS OF JO-ANNE KNYSH AND ARTHUR RANGEL; DECLARATION OF TRACY M. STRONG IN SUPPORT filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 10/17/2008) Modified on 10/20/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2008 172 Featured Case ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. The parties are scheduled to appear for a CM Conference on 10/8/08. The parties timely filed a Joint CM Statement. Based on the representations of the parties in their Joint Statement, the Court VACATES the CM Conference set for 10/8/08. The CM Conference is CONTINUED to 12/15/2008 to coincide with the hearing on Plaintiffs' anticipated 165 MOTION FOR Class Certification. .Further Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/2/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008) Modified on 10/20/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2008 171 NOTICE of supplemental authority re: 165 MOTION for class certification by M. Rosen, M. Tucker, Somtai Troy Charoensak (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit In re SRAM Antitrust Litig. - Order Granting Plaintiffs' 165 Motion For Class Certification)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 10/2/2008) Modified on 10/3/2008,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2008 170 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc.. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 9/26/2008) Modified text on 9/29/2008,(to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2008 169 NOTICE by Stacie Somers of Counsel's Firm Name and Address Change (Haeggquist, Alreen) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
August 20, 2008 168 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER as Further Modified by the Court Modifying Class Certification Briefing Schedule re (28 in 5:07-cv-06507-JW) Stipulation filed by Stacie Somers, (167 in 5:05-cv-00037-JW) Stipulation filed by Melanie Tucker. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 9/26/2008. Interim Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2008 10:00 AM Plaintiff's 165 Motion for Class Certification (Direct Case) Hearing set for 12/15/2008 09:00 AM, and Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (Indirect Case) Hearing set for 4/20/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/20/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2008) Modified on 10/20/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2008 167 STIPULATION Modifying Class Certification Briefing Schedule by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 8/20/2008)
July 21, 2008 166 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of 165 MOTION to Certify Class and Appoint Class Counsel filed byMelanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3_part 1, # 4 Exhibit 3_part 2, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19)(Related document(s) 165 ) (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 21, 2008 165 MOTION to Certify Class and Appoint Class Counsel filed by Melanie Tucker. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Appointing Coughlin Stoia and The Katriel Law Firm as Co-Lead Class Counsel)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 7/21/2008) Modified on 12/2/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2008 164 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re Discovery Related to Testifying Experts in This Matter re 163 Stipulation filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/11/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2008)
July 3, 2008 163 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order re Discovery Related to Testifying Experts in This Matter by Apple Inc.. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 7/3/2008)
June 4, 2008 162 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER as Modified by the Court Setting Briefing for Class Certification re (26 in 5:07-cv-06507-JW) Stipulation filed by Stacie Somers, (160 in 5:05-cv-00037-JW) Stipulation filed by Stacie Somers. Joint Case Management Statement due 8/15/2008, Further Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2008 10:00 AM, Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/4/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2008)
June 4, 2008 161 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER as Modified by the Court Setting Class Certification Briefing Schedule re 159 Stipulation filed by Melanie Tucker. Please see Order for further specifics. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/4/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2008)
May 29, 2008 160 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Stacie Somers. (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 5/29/2008)
May 27, 2008 159 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Setting Class Certification Briefing Schedule by Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 5/27/2008)
May 14, 2008 158 Featured Case ORDER Following Case Management Conference held on 5/12/2008. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2008 10:00 AM, Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2008 09:00 AM, Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. The parties are to file a stipulated briefing schedule with respect to the planned motion within ten (10) days from the date of this order. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/14/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2008)
May 12, 2008 157 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/12/2008 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 5/12/2008). The parties are to file a stipulation re briefing schedule re motions discussed at the case management conference. Case Management Conference set in ALL cases for 8/25/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/12/2008)
May 2, 2008 156 Statement in Favor of Consolidation. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 5/2/2008) Modified on 5/5/2008,(counsel used incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2008 155 Brief re 154 Order Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Response to the Court's Order Regarding Consolidation filed byMelanie Tucker. (Related document(s) 154 ) (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 5/2/2008)
April 22, 2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings: pursuant Order (21) in 5:07-cv-06507-JW Somers v. Apple, Inc; (154) in 5:05-cv-37-JW, (51) in 5:06-cv-4457-JW. Parties to file response to Court's request by 5/2/2008. Case Management Conference set IN ALL CASES for 5/12/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
April 22, 2008 154 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING ALL PARTIES TO SUBMIT BRIEFING RE: CONSOLIDATION OF THE PRESENT ACTION WITH C 05-00037. Signed by Judge James Ware on April 22, 2008. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
February 15, 2008 153 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASE. The Court finds that C 07-06507 HRL is related with C 05-0037 JW and C 06-04457 JW. The clerk shall reassign the case. Related cases: Create association to 5:07-cv-06507-HRL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/14/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2008)
February 15, 2008 152 Featured Case ORDER Granting (151) Motion to Relate Case in case 5:05-cv-00037-JW; ORDER Relating Case in case 5:06-cv-04457-JW; ORDER Relating case in C 07-06507 HRL. The Clerk shall relate and reassign C 07-06507 HRL Somers v. Apple Inc. to C 05-0037 JW "The Apple iPod iTunes Anti-Trust Litigation". Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/14/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2008)
January 29, 2008 151 MOTION to Relate C07-6507 HRL, C05-37 JW, C06-4457 JW Cases filed by Stacie Somers. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation of the Parties, # 2 Proposed Order)(Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 1/29/2008) Modified on 1/30/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2008 150 Featured Case ORDER Granting Withdrawal of Attorney Gregory Steven Weston as Counsel of Record re 148 Notice (Other) filed by Plaintiffs. Attorney Gregory Steven Weston terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/16/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2008)
January 16, 2008 149 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing not held on 1/16/2008 before Judge Richard Seeborg 133 MOTION to Compel Defendant Apple Inc.'s Production of Documents Relating to Class Certification filed by Plaintiffs, ***Motions terminated: 137 MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Production of Documents Relating to Class Certification filed by Plaintiffs, 133 MOTION to Compel Defendant Apple Inc.'s Production of Documents Relating to Class Certification filed by Plaintiffs.. Motion issues are resolved and motion is withdrawn from the calendar on joint request of counsel. (not reported.) (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/16/2008)
January 14, 2008 148 MOTION TO Withdrawal as Attorney (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/14/2008) Modified text on 1/23/2008,(counsel used incorrect event, correct event is motion, not Notice.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 2, 2008 147 Reply Memorandum re 137 MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Production of Documents Relating to Class Certification Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Production of Documents Relating to Class Certification filed byPlaintiffs. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/2/2008)
December 21, 2007 146 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 143 Declaration in Support, 145 Declaration in Support, 142 Memorandum in Opposition, 144 Declaration in Support, (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 12/21/2007)
December 21, 2007 145 Declaration of Steven Leung in Support of 142 Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of Steven Leung in Support of Apple's Opposition to Motion to Compel Production of Documents "Relating to Class Certification" filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 142 ) (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 12/21/2007)
December 21, 2007 144 Declaration of Charles Lancaster in Support of 142 Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of Charles Lancaster in Support of Apple's Opposition to Motion to Compel Production of Documents "Relating to Class Certification" filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 142 ) (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 12/21/2007)
December 21, 2007 143 Declaration of Tracy M. Strong in Support of 142 Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of Tracy M. Strong in Support of Apple's Opposition to Motion to Compel Production of Documents "Relating to Class Certification" filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 142 ) (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 12/21/2007)
December 21, 2007 142 Memorandum in Opposition re 133 MOTION to Compel Defendant Apple Inc.'s Production of Documents Relating to Class Certification Apple's Opposition to Motion to Compel Production of Documents "Relating to Class Certification" filed byApple Inc.. (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 12/21/2007)
December 20, 2007 141 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 140 Stipulation (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 12/20/2007)
December 20, 2007 140 Stipulation Regarding Privileged Information by Apple Inc.. (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 12/20/2007) Modified on 1/16/2008 (cfe, Court Staff).
December 7, 2007 139 Proposed Order (Amended) Compelling Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Production of Documents Relating to Class Certification re 137 by Plaintiffs. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 12/7/2007) Modified on 1/11/2008 (cfe, Court Staff).
December 7, 2007 138 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney (Amended) in Support of Motion to Compel Defendant Apple Inc.'s Production of Documents Relating to Class Certification re 137 filed byPlaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 12/7/2007) Modified on 1/11/2008 (cfe, Court Staff).
December 7, 2007 137 MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Production of Documents Relating to Class Certification filed by Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom #4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 12/7/2007)
December 6, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg for Settlement (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2007)
December 6, 2007 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg for all discovery matters. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 12/07/07. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2007)
December 6, 2007 136 Featured Case ORDER of Recusal. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 12/5/07. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/6/2007)
December 3, 2007 135 Proposed Order 133 motion to Compel Defendant Apple Inc.'s Production of Documents Relating to Class Certification by Plaintiffs. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 12/3/2007) Modified on 12/19/2007,(counsel failed to link to motion) (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2007 134 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of 133 Motion to Compel Defendant Apple Inc.'s Production of Documents Relating to Class Certification filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 12/3/2007) Modified on 12/19/2007,(counsel failed to link to motion) (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2007 133 MOTION to Compel Defendant Apple Inc.'s Production of Documents Relating to Class Certification filed by Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom #5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 12/3/2007)
October 16, 2007 132 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Consider Whether C05-0037 JW and C07-5152 JW Cases Should be Related filed by Apple Inc.. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 10/16/2007) Modified on 10/17/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/22/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2007 131 Memorandum in Opposition to Administrative Motion to Consider Whether C05-37 JW and C07-5152 RS Cases Should Be Related filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Civil Local Rule 3-12)(Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 10/16/2007) Modified text on 10/17/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2007 130 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael David Braun (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 10/3/2007)
September 13, 2007 129 NOTICE by Melanie Tucker, Mariana Rosen Notice of Firm Name Change (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 9/13/2007)
July 20, 2007 128 Featured Case ORDER re: 119 Plaintiffs' Motion for Administrative Relief (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2007)
July 17, 2007 127 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 126 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas J. Kennedy (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2007)
July 16, 2007 Proposed Order re 126 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Thomas J. Kennedy( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 5461100135.) by Melanie Tucker, Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2007)
July 16, 2007 126 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas J. Kennedy ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 5461100135.) filed by Melanie Tucker, Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2007)
July 12, 2007 125 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 123 Memorandum in Opposition, 124 Declaration in Support, (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 7/12/2007)
July 12, 2007 124 Declaration of Tracy M. Strong in Support of 123 Memorandum in Opposition, re 119 Motion for Administrative Relief to clarify whether the discovery bifurcation provision of the case management order Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 123 ) (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 7/12/2007)
July 12, 2007 123 Memorandum in Opposition re 119 MOTION for Administrative Relief to clarify whether the discovery bifurcation provision of the case management order Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Administrative Relief)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 7/12/2007)
July 9, 2007 122 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney in Support of Plaintiffs' 119 Motion for Administrative Relief Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-11 filed by Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 7/9/2007) Modified text on 7/11/2007,(counsel failed to properly link to motion) (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2007 121 Proposed Order re: 119 [Alternative Proposed] Order Governing Discovery by Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 7/9/2007) Modified text on 7/11/2007, (counsel failed to properly link to motion)(cv, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2007 120 Proposed Order re: 119 Governing Discovery by Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 7/9/2007) Modified text on 7/11/2007, (counsel failed to properly link to motion) (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2007 119 MOTION to clarify whether the discovery bifurcation provision of the case management order Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11 filed by Melanie Tucker. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 7/9/2007) Modified on 7/11/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2007 118 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Governing Electronic Discovery Formats. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 6/29/07. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 6/29/2007)
June 28, 2007 117 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER GOVERNING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY FORMATS by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Table 1)(Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 6/28/2007)
June 22, 2007 116 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 115 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Francis J. Balint, Jr., (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2007)
June 22, 2007 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew S. Friedman (Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 6/22/2007)
June 21, 2007 Proposed Order re 115 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Francis J. Balint, Jr.,( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 5461100120.) by Melanie Tucker. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2007)
June 21, 2007 115 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Francis J. Balint, Jr., ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 5461100120.) filed by Melanie Tucker. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2007)
June 15, 2007 113 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Steven Weston (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 6/15/2007)
June 13, 2007 112 Featured Case STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on June 13, 2007. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2007)
June 12, 2007 111 Stipulation and [Proposed] Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information by Apple Inc.(Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 6/12/2007) Modified on 6/15/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2007 110 ANSWER to Complaint (Consolidated) and Defenses byApple Inc.. (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 6/6/2007)
May 7, 2007 109 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting extension of time to respond to complaint by 6/6/2007 re 108 Stipulation filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/7/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2007)
May 4, 2007 108 STIPULATION re 107 Amended Complaint, by Apple Inc.. (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 5/4/2007)
April 19, 2007 107 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Complaint for Violations of Sherman Antitrust Act, Clayton Act, Cartwright Act, California Unfair Competition Law, Consumer Legal Remedies Act, and California Common Law of Monopolization against all plaintiffs. Filed byMelanie Tucker, Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 4/19/2007)
March 21, 2007 106 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware Consolidating Related Cases; The CLERK shall CONSOLIDATE these related cases WITH the earlier filed action, C05-0037 JW, is the LEAD CASE. ALL FUTURE filings shall be in THE LEAD CASE C05-0037 JW and bear the CAPTION "The Apple iPod iTunes Anti-Trust Litigation"; Appointing Co-Lead Counsel. WITHIN 30 days of the date of this Order plaintiffs SHALL FILE a CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/20/2007. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2007)
March 15, 2007 105 Featured Case ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 3/19/2007. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/14/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2007)
March 6, 2007 104 Minute Entry: Show Cause Hearing Held in Chambers, Matter Submitted, Court to Issue Further Order re 92 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASES SHOULD NOT BE CONSOLIDATED. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS (Date Filed: 3/6/2007). (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/6/2007)
February 12, 2007 103 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING re 99 unopposed motion for leave to file the declaration of Dr. J. Pisarkiewicz and 97 Declaration of Pisarkiewicz in Support SHALL REMAIN ON FILE AND BE PUBLICLY AVAILABLE., The Sealed version of the Declaration of Pisarkiewicz will be filed under seal... Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/12/07. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2007 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2007 102 RESPONSE in Support Response of Plaintiffs Charoensak and Rosen to Order to Show Cause Why Cases Should Not Be Consolidated filed bySomtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen. (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 2/12/2007)
February 5, 2007 101 DECLARATION OF TRACY M. STRONG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO FILE THE DECLARATION OF DR. JOHN PISARKIEWICZ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' 93 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION UNDER SEAL filed byApple Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 99 ) (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 2/5/2007) Modified on 2/7/2007 link to motion.(cv, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2007 Received Document Declaration of John Pisarkiewicz, Ph.D. in support of 93 motion for class certification under seal filed byMelanie Tucker, Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen. by Melanie Tucker, Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen. (under seal) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2007)
January 30, 2007 Proposed Order re 99 UNOPPOSED motion for leave to file the declaration John Pisarkiewicz, Ph.D. in support of 93 motion for class certification under seal filed by Melanie Tucker, Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen. by Melanie Tucker, Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2007)
January 30, 2007 100 Declaration of Roy A. Katriel in Support of 99 UNOPPOSED motion for leave to file the Declaration of John Pisarkiewicz, Ph.D. in support of 93 motion for class certification under seal filed byMelanie Tucker, Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen. filed byMelanie Tucker, Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen. (Related document(s) 99 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2007)
January 30, 2007 99 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE of Court to file the Declaration of John Pisarkiewicz, Ph.D. in support of 93 motion for class certification under seal filed byMelanie Tucker, Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2007)
January 25, 2007 98 unopposed MOTION to Remove from the docket No. 95 inadvertently filed the declaration of Dr. John Pisarkiewicz Filed Pursuant To Civil L.R. 7-11 Document filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen. (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2007) Modified on 1/30/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2007 97 Declaration of Dr. John Pisarkiewicz in Support of 93 MOTION to Certify Class Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, 95 Declaration in Support, CORRECTED AND REDACTED Declaration of Dr. John Pisarkiewicz in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed bySomtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen. (Related document(s) 93 , 95 ) (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 1/25/2007)
January 22, 2007 96 Declaration of Lee Morse filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen. (Related document(s) 93 ) (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 1/22/2007) Modified text on 1/30/2007, to conform with document posted by counsel (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2007 95 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT POSTED UPSIDE DOWN. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 97 . *** Declaration of Dr. John Pisarkiewicz in Support of 93 MOTION to Certify Class Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed bySomtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen. (Related document(s) 93 ) (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 1/22/2007) Modified on 1/25/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/25/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 1/30/2007, document posted by counsel is upside down. (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2007 94 *** ERROR The attachment POSTED is upside down*** Declaration of Roy A. Katriel in Support of 93 MOTION to Certify Class Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed bySomtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen. (Related document(s) 93 ) (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 1/22/2007) Modified on 1/30/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified TEXT on 1/30/2007, document posted by counsel is upside down. (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2007 93 *** ERROR The attachment POSTED is UPSIDE DOWN *** MOTION to Certify Class Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Somtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 1/22/2007) Modified on 1/30/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified TEXT on 1/30/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF). document posted by counsel is upside down
January 18, 2007 92 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASES SHOULD NOT BE CONSOLIDATED. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS.Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2007 10:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/18/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2007)
January 17, 2007 91 Featured Case AMENDED STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 1/17/07. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 1/17/2007)
December 21, 2006 90 Amendment to 89 Stipulation and Proposed Order re: Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information. (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 12/21/2006) Modified on 1/3/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2006 89 Amended Stipulation And [Proposed Order] Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 12/21/2006) Modified on 1/3/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2006 88 Featured Case ORDER re 87 Parties' Proposed Form of Protective Order. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 12/15/06. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/15/2006)
December 11, 2006 87 Proposed Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 12/11/2006)
November 21, 2006 86 Featured Case ORDER Following Further Case Management Conference. Please see Order for specfics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/21/2006. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2006)
November 21, 2006 85 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/20/2006 before James Ware (Date Filed: 11/21/2006). Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2007 09:00 AM and Further Case Management set for 3/19/2007 @ 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/21/2006)
November 17, 2006 84 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Parties' Further Joint Case Management Statement And Proposed Order filed by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 11/17/2006)
November 2, 2006 83 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Second Amended) byApple Computer, Inc.. (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 11/2/2006)
November 2, 2006 82 NOTICE by Apple Computer, Inc. of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Antitrust Claims of Second Amended Complaint or, Alternatively, Request for Leave to File Rule 56 Motion on Antitrust Claims (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 11/2/2006)
October 30, 2006 81 Memorandum in Opposition - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I-V AND VII OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed bySomtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen. (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 10/30/2006)
October 12, 2006 80 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference previously set for 10/30/2006 at 10:00 am has been reset to 11/20/2006 10:00 AM. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2006)
September 15, 2006 79 Proposed Order re 78 MOTION to Dismiss Antitrust Claims of Second Amended Complaint or, Alternatively, Request for Leave to File Rule 56 Motion on Antitrust Claims by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 9/15/2006)
September 15, 2006 78 MOTION to Dismiss Antitrust Claims of Second Amended Complaint or, Alternatively, Request for Leave to File Rule 56 Motion on Antitrust Claims filed by Apple Computer, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 9/15/2006)
August 28, 2006 77 AMENDED COMPLAINT - SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Apple Computer, Inc.. Filed bySomtai Troy Charoensak, Mariana Rosen. (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 23, 2006 76 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 74 Motion to Relate Cases C05-0037JW and C06-4457HRL. Magistrate Judge Lloyd no longer assigned to C06-4457HRL. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2006)
August 22, 2006 75 STIPULATION re 74 MOTION to Related Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related -- Civil L.R. 3-12 by Melanie Tucker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Stoia, John) (Filed on 8/22/2006)
August 22, 2006 74 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases C05-37 JW and C06-4457 HRL Should Be Related -- Civil L.R. 3-12 filed by Melanie Tucker. (Stoia, John) (Filed on 8/22/2006) Modified text on 8/22/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2006 73 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO file a second AMENDED complaint filed within 15 days from the day of this order. Upon the filing of the second amended complaint, the clerk's office shall REMOVE Thomas William Slattery from the docket and make the appropriate changes so that the docket will reflect the names of the new plaintiff's. The Court, sua sponte, dismisses plaintiff Thomas William Slattery from the action. by Judge James Ware granting 57 60 . (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2006) Modified text on 8/17/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2006 72 Featured Case ORDER VACATING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge James Ware on June 22, 2006. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2006)
June 2, 2006 71 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/2/2006 before James Ware (Date Filed: 6/2/2006). (Court Reporter LEE-ANNE SHORTRIDGE.) (mp, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/2/2006)
May 26, 2006 70 Featured Case ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION. Signed by Judge James Ware on May 26, 2006. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2006)
May 26, 2006 69 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Motion Hearing continued to 6/30/2006 09:00 AM.. Signed by Judge JAMES WARE on 5/26/06. (mp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2006)
May 24, 2006 68 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 5/24/2006)
May 4, 2006 67 Featured Case ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARINGS ON MOTIONS. Signed by Judge James Ware on May 4, 2006. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2006)
April 25, 2006 66 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 4/25/2006)
April 24, 2006 65 Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint filed byThomas William Slattery. (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 4/24/2006)
April 17, 2006 64 DECLARATION of Tracy M. Strong in Opposition to 63 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed byApple Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 63 ) (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 4/17/2006)
April 17, 2006 63 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed byApple Computer, Inc.. (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 4/17/2006)
March 24, 2006 59 Declaration of Michael D. Braun in Support of 57 First MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint - "REDACTED/PUBLIC VERSION", 58 Memorandum in Support filed byThomas William Slattery. (Related document(s) 57 , 58 ) (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 3/24/2006)
March 24, 2006 58 MEMORANDUM in Support re 57 First MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint - "REDACTED/PUBLIC VERSION" filed byThomas William Slattery. (Related document(s) 57 ) (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 3/24/2006)
March 24, 2006 57 First MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint - "REDACTED/PUBLIC VERSION" filed by Thomas William Slattery. Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 3/24/2006)
March 24, 2006 56 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas William Slattery PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 3/24/2006)
March 23, 2006 55 Featured Case ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; SETTING HEARING FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge James Ware on March 23, 2006. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2006)
March 20, 2006 54 Featured Case ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Miscellaneous Administrative Request to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge James Ware on March 20, 2006. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2006)
March 20, 2006 53 ERRATA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Thomas William Slattery, Thomas William Slattery. (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 3/20/2006)
March 20, 2006 52 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Thomas William Slattery. AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE. (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 3/20/2006)
March 17, 2006 62 Declaration of Michael D. Braun in Support of 60 MOTION for Leave to File filed byThomas William Slattery. see order 54 under seal (Related document(s) 60 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2006)
March 17, 2006 61 MEMORANDUM in Support re 60 MOTION for Leave to File filed byThomas William Slattery. see order 54 (Related document(s) 60 ) (under seal)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2006)
March 17, 2006 60 NOTICE OF MOTION for Leave to File SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Thomas William Slattery. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2006) (under seal)
March 17, 2006 Proposed Order re: #51 by Thomas William Slattery. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2006)
March 17, 2006 51 AMENDED ADMINIDTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE Document under seal the deposition transcript of Thomas Slattery are quoted in plaintiff's motion for leave to live a 2nd amended complaint pages 326-328 as exhibit 2 to the declaration of M. D. Braun. filed by Thomas William Slattery. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2006)
March 17, 2006 50 CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File the administrative request to file documents under seal and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2006)
March 17, 2006 49 MOTION to Seal Notice of Motion for leave to file 2nd amended complaint and declaration of Roy A. Katriel; Memorandum in support of; declaration M. D. Braun and proposed order. filed by Thomas William Slattery. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2006) Modified on 4/3/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2006 48 Compendium of Non-Federal Authorities in Support of plaintiff's motion for leavr to file a 2nd amended complaint filed byThomas William Slattery. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2006)
March 17, 2006 Proposed Order (granting plaintiff's motion for leave to file second amended complaint) by Thomas William Slattery. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2006) (under seal)
March 17, 2006 Received Document (declaration of Michael D. Braun in support of plaintiff's motion for leave to fiile a 2nd amended complaint) by Thomas William Slattery. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2006) (under seal)
March 17, 2006 Received Document (Memorandum in support of plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint) by Thomas William Slattery. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2006) (under seal)
March 17, 2006 Received Document (Notice of Motion for leave to file a second amended complaint by Thomas William Slattery. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2006) (under seal)
March 8, 2006 47 Letter from Robert Mittelstaedt of Jones Day to the Honorable James Ware. (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 3/8/2006)
March 6, 2006 46 Letter from Michael D. Braun, Counsel for Plaintiff To The Honorable James Ware. (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 3/6/2006)
March 2, 2006 45 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/6/05; (motion) pages 1-34 before Judge James Ware. Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2006)
February 21, 2006 44 Declaration of Tracy M. Strong in Support of Apple Computer, Inc.'s Administrative Request for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed byApple Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 Proposed Order # 3 # 4 # 5)(Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 2/21/2006)
November 16, 2005 Set/Reset Hearings: Further Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2006 10:00 AM. (mp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2005)
November 16, 2005 43 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 11/14/2005 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 11/16/2005), Date Filed: 11/16/2005). Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification set for 5/15/2006 09:00 AM. (Court Reporter not reported.) (mp, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/16/2005)
November 15, 2005 42 Featured Case ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge James Ware on November 15, 2005. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2005)
October 31, 2005 41 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Thomas William Slattery. (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 10/31/2005)
October 18, 2005 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Computer, Inc. re 39 Answer to Amended Complaint (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 10/18/2005)
October 18, 2005 39 Answer to Amended Complaint 37 Amended Complaint (First) byApple Computer, Inc.. (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 10/18/2005)
October 11, 2005 38 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO FILE ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 10/11/2005)
September 23, 2005 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Apple Computer, Inc.. Filed byThomas William Slattery. (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 9/23/2005)
September 14, 2005 36 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge James Ware on September 14, 2005. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2005)
September 9, 2005 35 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge James Ware on September 9, 2005. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2005)
September 7, 2005 34 Letter from Tracy Strong, atty. JONES DAY re: Case Management Conference. (Strong, Tracy) (Filed on 9/7/2005)
August 9, 2005 33 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge James Ware on August 9, 2005. jwlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2005)
June 15, 2005 32 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge James Ware on June 15, 2005. (jwlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2005)
June 15, 2005 31 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge James Ware on June 15, 2005. jwlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2005)
June 14, 2005 30 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference and (Proposed) Order by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 6/14/2005)
June 10, 2005 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Computer, Inc. re 27 Response ( Non Motion ), 28 Declaration in Support, (Sand, Adam) (Filed on 6/10/2005)
June 10, 2005 28 Declaration of Adam R. Sand in Support of 27 Response ( Non Motion ) to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice filed byApple Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B)(Related document(s) 27 ) (Sand, Adam) (Filed on 6/10/2005)
June 10, 2005 27 RESPONSE to re 23 Request for Judicial Notice by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Sand, Adam) (Filed on 6/10/2005)
June 7, 2005 26 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/6/2005 before James Ware (Date Filed: 6/7/2005). (Court Reporter I. Rodriguez.) (mp, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/7/2005)
June 7, 2005 Remark - clerk mailed copy of order filed on 6/6/05 docket #22 to attorney Roy A. Katriel along with the E-Filing registration form. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2005)
June 6, 2005 25 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of His Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint by Thomas William Slattery. (Godino, Marc) (Filed on 6/6/2005)
June 6, 2005 24 Declaration of Marc L. Godino in Support of 23 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed byThomas William Slattery. (Related document(s) 23 ) (Godino, Marc) (Filed on 6/6/2005)
June 6, 2005 23 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed byThomas William Slattery. (Godino, Marc) (Filed on 6/6/2005)
June 6, 2005 22 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Roy A. Katriel (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2005)
June 3, 2005 Proposed Order re 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Thomas William Slattery. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2005)
June 3, 2005 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Roy A. Katriel (fee paid) receipt number 5512528. filed by Thomas William Slattery. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2005)
March 8, 2005 20 Featured Case ORDER Continuing Hearing Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge James Ware on March 8, 2005. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2005)
March 7, 2005 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Computer, Inc. re 18 Response in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 3/7/2005)
March 7, 2005 18 RESPONSE in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed byApple Computer, Inc.. (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 3/7/2005)
February 28, 2005 17 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint by Thomas William Slattery. (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 2/28/2005)
February 28, 2005 16 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed byThomas William Slattery. (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 2/28/2005)
February 18, 2005 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Computer, Inc. re 14 Certificate of Interested Entities (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 2/18/2005)
February 18, 2005 14 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 2/18/2005)
February 16, 2005 13 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric J. Belfi (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2005)
February 10, 2005 Received Document: (Proposed) order granting application of Admission of Attorney ERIC J. BELFI Pro Hac Vice re 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Thomas William Slattery. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2005)
February 10, 2005 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney ERIC J. BELFI (fee paid, receipt # 3369189)filed by Thomas William Slattery. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2005)
February 10, 2005 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Computer, Inc. re 10 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint , Appendix and [Proposed] Order Dismissing Complaint of Thomas William Slattery (Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 2/10/2005)
February 10, 2005 10 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed by Apple Computer, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2005 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Stein v. Pacific Bell Telephone Co., No. C 00-2915 SI (N.D. Cal. 2004)# 2 Proposed Order Dismissing Complaint of Thomas William Slattery)(Mittelstaedt, Robert) (Filed on 2/10/2005)
January 24, 2005 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas William Slattery OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT APPLE COMPUTER, INC. (Godino, Marc) (Filed on 1/24/2005)
January 24, 2005 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas William Slattery OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT APPLE COMPUTER, INC. (Godino, Marc) (Filed on 1/24/2005)
January 24, 2005 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Computer, Inc. re 6 Stipulation (Sand, Adam) (Filed on 1/24/2005)
January 24, 2005 6 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Apple Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Sand, Adam) (Filed on 1/24/2005)
January 5, 2005 Clerk mailed copy of Reassignment Order to all parties of record. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2005)
January 5, 2005 5 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Ware for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Patricia V Trumbull remains as the referral judge. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/5/05. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2005)
January 5, 2005 4 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2005)
January 5, 2005 3 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Thomas William Slattery and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Godino, Marc) (Filed on 1/5/2005)
January 3, 2005 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2005)
January 3, 2005 Summons Issued as to Apple Computer, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2005)
January 3, 2005 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/3/2005. Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2005 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2005)
January 3, 2005 1 COMPLAINT (Summons Issued); jury demand; against Apple Computer, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 5511509.). Filed byThomas William Slattery. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2005 (bw, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2005 (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: "The Apple iPod iTunes Anti-Trust Litigation"
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs
Represented By: Michael David Braun
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacie Somers
Represented By: Helen I. Zeldes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariana Rosen
Represented By: Brian P Murray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Somtai Troy Charoensak
Represented By: Brian P Murray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Tucker
Represented By: Thomas J. Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Tracy Strong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]