Ewert v. eBay, Inc.

Plaintiff: Michael Ewert
Defendant: eBay, Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2007cv02198
Filed: April 20, 2007
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2010 106 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 99 Motion to Seal Document (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
February 8, 2010 107 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 104 Motion to Seal Document (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
March 17, 2010 113 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER 112 to Continue Hearing Dates on Motions: Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/17/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010)
April 6, 2010 115 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 114 Motion to Seal (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
September 30, 2010 124 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Whyte granting (86) Motion to Certify Class, denying (88) Motion to Appoint Counsel, denying (111) Motion to Strike in case 5:07-cv-02198-RMW; granting (83) Motion to Certify Class, denying (121) Motion to Strike in case 5:07-cv-04487-RMW. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
October 15, 2010 128 Featured Case ORDER denying (150 in 5:07-cv-04487-RMW) and (127 in 5:07-cv-02198-RMW) Defendant eBay Inc.'s Request To Maintain Confidentiality of Redacted Order. Signed by Judge Whyte on 10/15/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 25, 2010 134 Featured Case Unredacted ORDER by Judge Whyte granting (86) Motion to Certify Class, denying (88) Motion to Appoint Counsel, denying (111) Motion to Strike in case 5:07-cv-02198-RMW; granting (83) Motion to Certify Class, denying (121) Motion to Strike in case 5:07-cv-04487-RMW. Signed by Judge Whyte on 9/30/10.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
November 5, 2010 135 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Whyte consolidating cases pursuant to (129) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 5:07-cv-02198-RMW, (152) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 5:07-cv-04487-RMW. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 19, 2010 138 Featured Case ORDER appointing lead counsel for the class. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
August 11, 2011 147 Featured Case ORDER approving stipulation regarding scheduling. Signed by Judge Whyte on 8/11/2011. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
September 2, 2011 149 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 141 Motion to Decertify Class and Ordering Proposed Schedule. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 29, 2011 153 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER 152 to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/29/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
December 16, 2011 158 Featured Case ORDER RE: SCHEDULING re 156 . Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on December 16, 2011. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
September 10, 2012 175 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (REDACTED). Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on September 10, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 11, 2012 176 Featured Case JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on September 11, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
September 11, 2012 177 Featured Case ORDER RE SEALING. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on September 11, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
September 20, 2012 179 Featured Case Revised Order Granting Administrative Motions to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on September 20, 2012. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
September 25, 2012 181 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 159 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
March 23, 2009 56 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 46 Motion for Leave to File; denying 49 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution; vacating hearing on motions; scheduling case management conference for April 24, 2009 at 10:30 a.m.. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
July 15, 2009 75 Featured Case ORDER re 74 to eBay, Inc. to Show Cause Why Sanctions Should Not Be Awarded Against it for Failing to Appear for its Deposition; and ORDER Advancing Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 7/15/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
August 20, 2009 81 Featured Case ORDER re 75 Dissolving Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 8/20/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
December 30, 2009 92 Featured Case ORDER setting briefing schedule and hearing date for 87 MOTION to Certify Class and 88 MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Proposed Class. Signed by Judge Whyte on 12/30/09. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
January 4, 2010 93 Featured Case ORDER setting amended briefing schedule and hearing date for 86 MOTION to Certify Class, 88 MOTION to Appoint Counsel for Proposed Class. Signed by Judge Whyte on 1/4/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
January 14, 2010 98 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Whyte denying motion for administrative relief (95) in case 5:07-cv-02198-RMW, (89) in case 5:07-cv-04487-RMW. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ewert v. eBay, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ewert
Represented By: John R. Fabry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]