Facebook, Inc. v. John Does 1-10 Featured Case

Plaintiff Facebook, Inc. alleged that someone using Internet Protocol address 216.127.50.20 accessed Facebook\'s website with an automated script in an attempt gain unauthorized access to Facebook\'s friend-finder functionality.

Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Defendant: Brian Fabian, Josh Raskin, 1564476 Ontario Limited, Slickcash.com, Istra Holdings, Inc., Ming Wu, John Does 4-10 and John Does 11-20
 
Case Number: 5:2007cv03404
Filed: June 28, 2007
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2007 10 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying as moot 7 Motion for Order Shortening Time; and granting in part 3 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2007)
July 17, 2007 11
Application for Admission of Attorney James R. McCullagh to appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611001368) filed by Facebook, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/18/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2007 12
Application for Admission of Attorney Joseph P. Cutler to appear Pro Hac Vice to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611001359) filed by Facebook, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2007 13 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 11 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice as to James R. McCullagh. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2007)
July 18, 2007 14 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 12 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph P. Cutler. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2007)
September 20, 2007 15
CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Facebook, Inc. (Olle, Lisa) (Filed on 9/20/2007)
September 20, 2007 16
NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Delehunt Olle (Olle, Lisa) (Filed on 9/20/2007)
September 20, 2007 17
Ex Parte Application by Facebook, Inc for Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Facebook's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Leave to Take Further Discovery, to Issue Letters Rogatory, and to Continue Case Management Conference ( 20 ) filed by Facebook, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Olle, Lisa) (Filed on 9/20/2007) Text modified on 9/21/2007, linkage added (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2007 18
Declaration of Lisa D. Olle in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Facebook's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Leave to Take Further Discovery, to Issue Letters Rogatory, and to Continue Case Management Conference re ( 17 ) filed by Facebook, Inc. (Related document(s) 17 ) (Olle, Lisa) (Filed on 9/20/2007) Text modified on 9/21/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2007 19
(Proposed) Order Granting First Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Facebook's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Leave to Take Further Discovery, to Issue Letters Rogatory, and to Continue Case Management Conference ( 17 ) by Facebook, Inc. (Olle, Lisa) (Filed on 9/20/2007) Text modified on 9/21/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2007 1
COMPLAINT for: (1) Violation of the Computer Fraud and Abuse Act; and (2) Violation of the California Comprehensive Computer Data Access and Fraud Act (Summons Issued); jury demand; against John Does 1-10, John Does 11-20 ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611001261). Filed by Facebook, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2007 20
Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Take Further Discovery, to Issue Letter Rogatory, and to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Olle, Lisa) (Filed on 9/20/2007) Text modified on 9/21/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2007 21
MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Leave to Take Further Discovery, to Issue Letters Rogatory , and to Continue Case Management Conference re ( 20 ) filed by Facebook, Inc. (Related document(s) 20 ) (Olle, Lisa) (Filed on 9/20/2007) Text modified on 9/21/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2007 22
Declaration of Joseph Cutler in Support of MOTION for Discovery to Issue Letters Rogatory, and to Contunue Case Scheduling Conference re ( 20 ) filed by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Related document(s) 20 ) (Olle, Lisa) (Filed on 9/20/2007) Text modified on 9/21/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2007 23
(Proposed) Order Granting MOTION for Discovery to Issue Letters Rogatory, and to Continue Case Management Conference re 20 by Facebook, Inc. (Olle, Lisa) (Filed on 9/20/2007) Text modified on 9/21/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2007 24 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying as moot 17 plaintiff's ex parte application for order shortening time. Matter deemed appropriate for determination without oral argument. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007)
September 28, 2007 25 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 20 plaintiff's motion for leave to take discovery of Look Communications, Inc. and Rogers Cable Communications, Inc. Initial case management conference continued to 1/8/2008, 1:30 PM. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007)
September 28, 2007 26
LETTER ROGATORY as to Rogers Communications, Inc. signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007)
September 28, 2007 27
LETTER ROGATORY as to Look Communications, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/28/2007. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007)
December 12, 2007 28
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants. Filed by Facebook, Inc. (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 12/12/2007) Modified on 12/13/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2007 29
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by David P. Chiappetta (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 12/13/2007)
June 28, 2007 2
ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/25/2007. Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2007 01:30 PM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
December 26, 2007 30
STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference and Initial Discovery Deadlines by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B to Stipulation and Proposed Order) (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 12/26/2007) Text modified on 12/26/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2008 31 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting plaintiffs' request to continue case management conference and initial discovery deadlines. Case management conference continued to 2/12/2008. Deadline for Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f) conference: 1/22/2008. Initial disclosures due by 2/5/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/3/2008. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2008)
January 4, 2008 32
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Ian MacIntyre re service to 1564476 Ontario Limited of Summons, First Amended Complaint ( 28 ) , and Required Papers Regarding the U.S. Northern District Court of California served on 1564476 Ontario Limited on December 18, 2007, filed by Facebook, Inc. (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 1/4/2008) Text modified, hyper link added on 1/7/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2008 33
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Ian MacIntyre re service to Istra Holdings, Inc. of Summons, First Amended Complaint ( 28 ), and Required Papers Regarding the U.S. Northern District Court of California served on Istra Holdings Inc. on December 18, 2007, filed by Facebook, Inc. (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 1/4/2008) Text modified, hyer link added on 1/7/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2008 34
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Ian MacIntyre re service to Ming Wu of Summons, First Amended Complaint ( 28 ), and Required Papers Regarding the U.S. Northern District Court of California served on Ming Wu on December 18, 2007, filed by Facebook, Inc. (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 1/4/2008)Text modified, hyper link added on 1/7/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2008 35
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Ian MacIntyre re service to Brian Fabian of Summons, First Amended Complaint ( 28 ) , and Required Papers Regarding the U.S. Northern District Court of California served on Brian Fabian on December 19, 2007, filed by Facebook, Inc. (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 1/4/2008) Text modified, hyper link added on 1/7/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2008 36
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Ian MacIntyre re service to Josh Raskin c/o Beard Winter, LLP of Summons, First Amended Complaint ( 28 ), and Required Papers Regarding the U.S. Northern District Court of California served on Josh Raskin c/o Beard Winter LLP on December 21, 2007, filed by Facebook, Inc. (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 1/4/2008) Text modified, hyper link added on 1/7/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2008 37
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Ian MacIntyre re service to Slickcash.com of Summons, First Amended ( 28 ) Complaint, and Required Papers Regarding the U.S. Northern District Court of California served on Slickcash.com on December 18, 2007, filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 1/7/2008) Text modified, hyper link added on 1/8/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2008 38
Answer to First Amended Complaint ( 28 ); Jury Demand by Brian Fabian, Josh Raskin, Ming Wu, Istra Holdings, Inc., Slickcash.com, 1564476 Ontario Limited. (Iskander, Gregory) (Filed on 2/1/2008) Text modified on 2/4/2008 conforming to posted document caption, linkage added. (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2008 39
STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, ADR AND RULE 26 DEADLINES by Brian Fabian, Josh Raskin, Istra Holdings, Inc., Slickcash.com, 1564476 Ontario Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Iskander, Gregory) (Filed on 2/1/2008) Text modified on 2/4/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 3, 2007 3
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE DISCOVERY ON ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC. AND FCI, INC. filed by Facebook, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Delehunt, Lisa) (Filed on 7/3/2007) Text modified on 7/9/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2008 40
Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Brian Fabian, Josh Raskin, Istra Holdings, Inc., Slickcash.com, 1564476 Ontario Limited (Iskander, Gregory) (Filed on 2/1/2008) Text modified on 2/4/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2008 41 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Intial Case Management Conference. Case management conference tontinued to 3/4/2008. All ADR and Fed.R.Civ.P. 26 deadlines adjusted accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/5/2008. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2008)
February 26, 2008 42
CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Brian Fabian, Josh Raskin, Ming Wu, Istra Holdings, Inc., Slickcash.com, 1564476 Ontario Limited. (Iskander, Gregory) (Filed on 2/26/2008) Modified on 2/27/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2008 43
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Brian Fabian, Josh Raskin, Ming Wu, Istra Holdings, Inc., Slickcash.com, 1564476 Ontario Limited. (Iskander, Gregory) (Filed on 2/26/2008) Text modified on 2/27/2008 conforming to posted document caption (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2008 44
PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT MARCH 4, 2008 CONFERENCE filed by Facebook, Inc. (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 3/3/2008) Modified on 3/4/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2008 45 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting plaintiff's request for telephonic appearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/4/2008. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 46
Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/4/2008 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 3/4/2008). (Tape #FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/4/2008)
March 4, 2008 47 Opinion or Order of the Court
SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties have until 4/25/08 to file stipulation to ADR process or notice of need for ADR conference. Assuming case does not settle, initial disclosures to be completed by 4/4/2008. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Trumbull for settlement conference to take place just prior to final pretrial conference. Fact discovery cutoff: 6/27/2008. Designation of experts with reports: 8/1/2008. Designation of rebuttal experts with reports: 8/29/2008. Expert discovery cutoff: 9/26/2008. Last day to hear dispositive motions: 11/25/2008, 10:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/20/2009 01:30 PM. Start of jury trial (estimated 5 days): 1/26/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/4/2008. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
April 25, 2008 48
[Proposed] Final Judgment on Consent by Facebook, Inc. (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 4/25/2008) Modified on 4/28/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2008 49
Stipulated Order and Permanent Injunctionre 48 by Facebook, Inc. (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 4/25/2008) Modified on 4/28/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 3, 2007 4
MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE DISCOVERY ON ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC. AND FCI, INC. re ( 3 ) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) 3 ) (Delehunt, Lisa) (Filed on 7/3/2007) Text modified on 7/9/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2008 50
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Josh Raskin by Facebook, Inc. (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 4/28/2008) Modified on 4/29/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2008 51
CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Facebook, Inc. against Istra Holdings, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/30/2008. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2008)
April 30, 2008 52 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATED ORDER AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/30/2008. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2008)
July 3, 2007 5
Declaration of James R. McCullagh in Support of Motion for Leave to Take Discovery on Accretive Technology Group, Inc. and FCI, Inc. re ( 3 ) filed by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 4 ) (Delehunt, Lisa) (Filed on 7/3/2007) Modified on 7/9/2007 clerk made correction to hyper-link motion number (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 3, 2007 6
Proposed Order Granting LEAVE TO TAKE DISCOVERY ON ACCRETIVE TECHNOLOGY GROUP, INC. AND FCI, INC. re 3 by Facebook, Inc. (Delehunt, Lisa) (Filed on 7/3/2007) Text modified on 7/9/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 3, 2007 7
Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Facebook, Inc's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery on Accretive Technology Group, Inc. and FCI, Inc re 3 filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Delehunt, Lisa) (Filed on 7/3/2007) Text modified on 7/9/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 3, 2007 8
Declaration of Lisa D. Olle in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Facebook, Inc's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery on Accretive Technology Group, Inc. and FCI, Inc re 7 , re 3 filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 7 ) (Delehunt, Lisa) (Filed on 7/3/2007) Text modified on 7/9/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).
July 3, 2007 9
Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Facebook, Inc's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery on Accretive Technology Group, Inc. and FCI, Inc re 7 re 3 by Facebook, Inc.. (Delehunt, Lisa) (Filed on 7/3/2007) Text modified on 7/9/2007 to conform to document caption post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Facebook, Inc. v. John Does 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Perry Cutler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Fabian
Represented By: Gregory G. Iskander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Raskin
Represented By: Gregory G. Iskander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1564476 Ontario Limited
Represented By: Gregory G. Iskander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slickcash.com
Represented By: Gregory G. Iskander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Istra Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory G. Iskander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ming Wu
Represented By: Gregory G. Iskander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 4-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 11-20
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]