Ralston .v Mortgage Investors Group, Inc., et.al.

Plaintiff: Jay J Ralston
Defendant: Mortgage Investors Group, Inc. and Mortgage Investors Group
 
Case Number: 5:2008cv00536
Filed: January 24, 2008
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
 
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2009 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 101 ). The Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2009 is CONTINUED to 7/17/2009 at 9:00 AM, immediately following the motion hearing. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/12/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009) Modified on 6/15/2009 (jflc2, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2010 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 93 , 97 MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; AND GRANTING 111 MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY AS TO MOVING PARTIES. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/22/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
April 29, 2010 127 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FOR DEFENANTS TO RESPOND TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT re 120 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/23/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
July 12, 2010 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 145 ). The Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2010 are CONTINUED to 7/30/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/12/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
August 12, 2010 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 139 , 140 MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/12/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
November 22, 2010 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 161 Approving Stipulation Re: Briefing on Plaintiffs Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/22/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
December 23, 2010 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal re 158 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses from Defendant Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
January 11, 2011 188 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO VACATE CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULE (approving 187 ). A Case Management Conference is set for 1/21/2011 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/11/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 18, 2011 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE 184 DEFENDANT COUNTRYWIDE'S OBJECTION TO ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/18/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 215 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (as modified by the court in Sections 1, 2.3, 10.2 & 12.4) re 170 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 2/18/11. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
March 14, 2011 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 184 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/14/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
March 23, 2011 232 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Stipulation 231 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 23, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
June 6, 2011 254 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CASE DEADLINES AND PENDING SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS (approving 253 ). The Motion Hearing re Class Certification set for July 29, 2011 is CONTINUED to 10/14/2011 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/6/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 16, 2011 262 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PAGE EXTENSIONS FOR BRIEFS RELATING TO PLAINTIFF'S CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION re 234 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/8/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
September 12, 2011 285 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 163 MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN CLASS ALLEGATIONS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/12/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 27, 2011 297 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 295 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC. TO FILE REPLY BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF LEONARD H. LYONS AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF JESSICA MOYS DECLARATION INSUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, AND FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF CORRECTED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/27/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 27, 2011 298 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE REPLY TO OPPOSITION OF MORTGAGE INVESTORS GROUP IN SUPPORT OF CORRECTED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (approving 296 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/27/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
October 5, 2011 303 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PAGE EXTENSION FOR PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION (approving 301 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/5/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 5, 2011 304 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING PAGE LIMIT FOR PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION OF MORTGAGE INVESTORS GROUP IN SUPPORT OF CORRECTED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (approving 302 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/5/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 12, 2011 305 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAUL GREWAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/12/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
November 30, 2011 340 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 275 Motion To Exclude Expert Testimony; granting in part and denying in part 313 Motion To Exclude Expert Testimony (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
February 27, 2012 356 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 274 280 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF JESSICA MOY'S DECLARATION; OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS; DENYING 346 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE; GRANTI NG 352 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISIONS; AND REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING RE 268 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/27/2012. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012) Modified on 2/27/2012 (jflc2, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2012 368 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART 268 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. (also granting 364 , 366 ). Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/30/2012. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
July 11, 2012 375 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 374 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONF. & PENDING SETTLEMENT. The Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2012 is CONTINUED to 12/14/2012. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/11/2012. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
October 23, 2008 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 35 Stipulation to Extend Time to Complete the ADR Process. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/15/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
June 19, 2013 388 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT, AND WITH RESPECT TO CLASS NOTICE, COURT APPROVAL HEARING AND ADMINISTRATION (granting 386 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/19/2013. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
November 6, 2008 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 38 Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/6/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
December 17, 2008 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR MEDIATION; AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 12/19/08 is CONTINUED to 2/13/2009 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/17/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
September 19, 2013 426 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 413 MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; OVERRULING OBJECTIONS; GRANTING 394 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS; AND GRANTING SERVICE PAYMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/19/2013. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 19, 2013 428 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/19/2013. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
October 7, 2013 429 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/7/2013. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
November 21, 2013 430 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONCERNING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/21/2013. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
January 15, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 Changing the Alternative Dispute Resolution Process; Case is referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/7/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
February 2, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 51 Extending the Alternative Dispute Resolution Process. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/28/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
March 3, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 54 Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/23/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
March 12, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON 42 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/12/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 16, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 25 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; AND (2) GRANTING 42 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/16/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
April 1, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 72 . Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/1/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ralston .v Mortgage Investors Group, Inc., et.al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay J Ralston
Represented By: Jennie Lee Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Investors Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Investors Group
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]