Levitte v. Google Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Hall K. Levitte sued Defendant Google, Inc. in regards to the Google AdWords program. Plaintiff alleged that Defendant had damaged plaintiff and the class by improperly charging them for advertising placed by Google on low-quality domain and error page websites.

Plaintiff: Hal K. Levitte
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 5:2008cv03369
Filed: July 11, 2008
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated, Set Deadlines/Hearings 91 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief: Class Certification Motion due by 12/17/2010. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 29, 2010 91 Featured Case ORDER Granting 88 Motion to Modify Case Management Conference. This is the final continuance. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/29/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 24, 2010 90 Statement of Non-Opposition to 88 Motion for Administrative Relief To Modify Case Management Schedule filed by Hal K. Levitte. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 6/24/2010) Modified on 6/24/2010,(counsel failed to properly link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2010 89 Declaration of Leo P. Norton in Support of 88 MOTION For Administrative Relief to Modify Case Management Schedule filed byGoogle Inc.. (Related document(s) 88 ) (Norton, Leo) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 23, 2010 88 MOTION For Administrative Relief to Modify Case Management Schedule filed by Google Inc.. (Norton, Leo) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
April 26, 2010 87 Featured Case ORDER Granting 85 Motion for Expert Discovery Scheduling. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/26/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
March 17, 2010 84 NOTICE by Hal K. Levitte Notice of Association of Counsel (Schubert, Robert) (Filed on 3/17/2010)
March 16, 2010 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Joel Willsey (Willsey, Peter) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 11, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Close of Class Discovery due by 7/19/2010. Plaintiff to file Class Certification Motion by 9/3/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 10, 2010 82 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 79 Motion; 75 Stipulation to Modify Case Schedule. On or before 7/19/2010, the parties shall complete all class discovery, including class-related expert discovery. The Court sets a hearing on Plaintiffs' anticipated Motion for Class Certification on 11/15/2010 09:00 AM. On or before 9/3/2010, Plaintiffs shall notice and file their Motion in accordance with the Civil Local Rules of the Court. All briefing shall be completed on or before 10/22/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/10/2010.(jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010) Modified text on 3/11/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF). Modified linkage on 3/20/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2010 81 Proposed Order re 79 MOTION Unopposed Motion for Administrative Relief for Entry of Stipulated Modified Case Management Schedule by Hal K. Levitte. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
March 9, 2010 80 Declaration of Willem F. Jonckheer in Support of 79 MOTION Unopposed Motion for Administrative Relief for Entry of Stipulated Modified Case Management Schedule Declaration of Willem F. Jonckheer in Support of Unopposed Motion for Administrative Relief for Entry of Stipulated Modified Case Management Schedule filed byHal K. Levitte. (Related document(s) 79 ) (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
March 9, 2010 79 MOTION Unopposed Motion for Administrative Relief for Entry of Stipulated Modified Case Management Schedule filed by Hal K. Levitte. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
March 8, 2010 78 Notice of Change of Firm Name and Kimberly Kralowec is NO longer a partner of the firm. (Schubert, Robert) (Filed on 3/8/2010) Modified on 3/10/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2010 77 Defendant Google Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against JIT Packaging, Inc. byGoogle Inc.. (Norton, Leo) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
February 22, 2010 76 AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Google Inc.. Filed b yHal K. Levitte. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 2/22/2010) Modified on 2/23/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2010 75 STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Modifying Case Management Schedule by Hal K. Levitte. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 17, 2010 74 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER ADDING West Coast Cameras, Inc.and Richard Oesterling and TERMINATING Bolaji Olabode re 73 Stipulation. West Coast Cameras, Inc. and Richard Oesterling are herby added to the consolidated action as plaintiffs. Bolaji Olabode terminated. On or before 2/22/2010, Plaintiffs shall file an Amended Consolidated Complaint consistent with the terms of Stipulation as a separate docket entry. On or before 3/1/2010, Defendant shall file an Amended Answer consistent with the terms of Stipulation as a separate docket entry. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/17/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 12, 2010 73 STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Adding and Dropping Parties by Hal K. Levitte. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
January 14, 2010 72 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Howard R. Lloyd for all further discovery matters. Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 01/14/2010. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 4, 2010 71 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR re 70 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/4/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
November 19, 2009 70 STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Method Of ADR Selected By The Parties by Hal K. Levitte. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
November 2, 2009 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 11/4/2009 is off calendar. Counsel will seek referral to private mediation instead of court-sponsored mediation. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
October 30, 2009 69 ADR Clerk's Notice rescheduling ADR Phone Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 11/4/2009. Plaintiff's counsel should initiate the call. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 27, 2009 68 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 11/4/2009 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel should initiate the call. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 2, 2009 67 Featured Case ORDER Granting Motion to Consolidate Cases in case (66) 5:08-cv-03369-JW . Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/2/2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009) Modified on 10/20/2009 (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified docket text re formatting on 11/5/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2009 66 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and [Proposed] Order Consolidating Olabode v. Google, Inc., No. 09-3414 Into In re Google AdWords Litigation, No. 08-3369 by Hal K. Levitte. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 9/21/2009) Modified on 9/22/2009,(Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is Motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2009 65 Featured Case ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. On or before 9/21/2009, the parties from both actions shall file the appropriate Stipulation to consolidate the Olabode action with the In re Google Adwords Litigation. Please see Order for further specifics as to Class Certification briefing in 5:08-cv-03369-JW "In re Google AdWords Litigation." Also, finding as MOOT re (56, 59 in 5:08-cv-03369-JW) Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/14/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009) Modified on 9/22/2009 (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified docket text on 9/28/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2009 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Claudia Edith Candelas (Candelas, Claudia) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
September 14, 2009 63 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/14/2009 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 9/14/2009), Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/14/2009 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 9/14/2009). Deadlines set in 08-cv-03369-JW "In re Google AdWords Litigation: Close of All Discovery as to Class Certification due 5/24/2010. Deadline to file Motion for Class Certificcation on or before 7/9/2010. Motion Hearing for Class Certification set for 9/20/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. The Court to issue further Order following conference.(Court Reporter Unreported.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/14/2009)
September 9, 2009 62 Proposed Order re 60 Case Management Statement Setting Expert Disclosure Schedule by Google Inc.. (Boot, Sarah) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
September 4, 2009 61 Proposed Order [Plaintiffs' Proposed] Order Setting Class Certification Briefing Schedule by Hal K. Levitte. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
September 4, 2009 60 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Hal K. Levitte. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
August 31, 2009 59 STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Modifying Class Discovery And Expert Disclosure Schedule by Hal K. Levitte. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 58 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: 57 (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 57 STIPULATION re: Protective Order by Google Inc.. (Boot, Sarah) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 56 STIPULATION re: Expert Witness Discovery Order by Google Inc.. (Boot, Sarah) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 28, 2009 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Ruth Boot (Boot, Sarah) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
August 22, 2009 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Reginald Von Terrell (Terrell, Reginald) (Filed on 8/22/2009)
August 21, 2009 53 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASE C08-3369 JW and C09-3414 JL. It is further ordered THAT THIS ORDER VACATES the previous 52 Order Denying Motion to Relate Cases. Create association to 3:09-cv-03414-JL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/21/2009. CLERK'S NOTICE As to case number C09-3414 JL, the court vacates the previous case management conference and and resets it to coordinate with the consolidated action on 9/14/09 at 10:00am. The Parties are to file a joint case management conference statement by 9/4/09.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2009) Modified text on 8/21/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/25/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/25/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified text re CMC time on 8/26/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2009 52 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 50 Motion to Relate Case (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
July 27, 2009 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Reginald Von Terrell in case number C09-3414 JL Olabode v. Google Inc. (Terrell, Reginald) (Filed on 7/27/2009) Modified text on 7/28/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2009 50 MOTION to Relate Case C09-3414 JL by Bolaji Olabode (Terrell, Reginald) (Filed on 7/27/2009) Modified on 7/28/2009,(counsel used incorrect event.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2009 49 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing Plaintiffs' Unjust Enrichment Claim and Defendant Google Inc.'s Counterclaim and Striking Plaintiffs' Jury Demand by Google Inc re 48 Stipulation; Finding as Moot 47 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
July 10, 2009 48 STIPULATION and Order Dismissing Plaintiffs' Unjust Enrichment Claim and Defendant Google Inc.'s Counterclaim and Striking Plaintiffs' Jury Demand by Google Inc.. (Norton, Leo) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
June 8, 2009 47 STIPULATION Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a) Continuing JIT Packaging, Inc.'s Response To Defendant Google, Inc.'s Counterclaim by Hal K. Levitte. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 6/8/2009) Modified on 6/11/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2009 46 Defendant Google Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against JIT Packaging, Inc. byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Norton, Leo) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
April 24, 2009 45 CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Violation of California Business & Professions Code Section 17200 et seq. and 17500 et seq. and Unjust Enrichment against all defendants. Filed by Hal K. Levitte. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 4/24/2009) Modified on 7/28/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2009 44 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING DEADLINE FOR FILING THE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT re 43 Stipulation. Consolidated Amended Complaint due 4/24/2009. Consolidated Amended Answer due 5/18/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/3/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
March 31, 2009 43 STIPULATION CONTINUING DEADLINE FOR FILING THE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hal K. Levitte. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 23, 2009 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Google Inc. sent on 2/4/2009, answer due 4/6/2009. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
February 25, 2009 41 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER FOR CLASS DISCOVERY: Deadline to File Consolidated Amended Complaint due 4/6/2009, Deadline to File Answer to Consolidated AmendedComplaint due 4/30/2009, Close of Class Discovery set for 11/2/2009. Interim Case Management Conference statement due 9/4/2009. Inteirm Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2009 10:00 AM. Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/25/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 25, 2009 40 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 34 Motion to Consolidate C08-3369 JW, C08-3452 JW, C08-3888 JW and C08-4701 JW. The Clerk of Court SHALL CONSOLIDATE these actions such that the earlier filed action, C08-3369 JW, is the LEAD CASE. ALL future filings SHALL be in C08-3369 and bear the caption:"In re Google AdWords Litigation." In addition, the Clerk SHALL administratively close C08-3452 JW, C08-3888 JW and C08-4701 JW. Plaintiffs SHALL file and Amended Consolidated Complaint by 4/6/09 and Appointing Schubert Jonckheer Kolbe & Kralowec LLP Interim Class Counsel(jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009) Modified on 2/25/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2009 39 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Hal K. Levitte, Pulaski & Middleman, LLC. (Schubert, Dustin) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
February 12, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 34 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
February 12, 2009 38 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing (34 in 08-cv-03369-JW Levitte v. Google Inc.); Continuing Case Management Conference in ALL RELATED cases from 2/23/2009 to 3/2/2009. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/20/2009 to be filed in each respective case docket. Case Management Conference in all related cases set for 3/2/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
January 16, 2009 37 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation re 32 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 16, 2009 36 Proposed Order ( 34 ) Motion to Consolidate; Proposed Order by Hal K. Levitte. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 1/16/2009) Modified text to add linkage on 1/28/2009 (srm, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2009 35 Declaration of Willem F. Jonckheer Declaration of Willem F. Jonckheer in Support of ( 34 ) Motion to Consolidate filed byHal K. Levitte. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 1/16/2009) Modified text to add linkage on 1/28/2009 (srm, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2009 34 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Hal K. Levitte. Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2009 10:00 AM. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 6, 2009 33 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Norton, Leo) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
January 5, 2009 32 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Hal K. Levitte (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
December 8, 2008 31 NOTICE of Change of Address by Guido Saveri (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 12/8/2008) Modified on 12/9/2008,(*** Related cases require filing for each related case.***) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2008 30 Featured Case ORDER Granting Motion to Relate Cases C-08-3369 JW, C-08-3452 RMW, C-08-4701 PVT and C-08-3888 SI re 28 MOTION to Relate Cases. Motions terminated: 28 MOTION to Relate Cases C08-3369 JW, C08-3452 RMW, C08-4701 PVT and C08-3888 SI filed by Google Inc. The parties are to file a joint case management conference statement by 2/13/09. ***Related cases require filing for each related case in their respective dockets.*** Initial Case Management Conference set for ALL CASES on 2/23/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/3/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008) Modified on 12/9/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2008 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Joel Willsey (Willsey, Peter) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 16, 2008 28 MOTION to Relate Cases C08-3369 JW, C08-3452 RMW, C08-4701 PVT and C08-3888 SI filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Norton, Leo) (Filed on 10/16/2008) Modified text on 10/16/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2008 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hal K. Levitte (Kralowec, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 10, 2008 26 Statement in Response to 21 Notice of Pendency of Other Action filed by Hal K. Levitte. (Kralowec, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/10/2008) Modified text on 10/16/2008,( to conform with document posted by counsel.)(cv, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2008 25 Featured Case ORDER Granting 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Peter J. Willsey. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/6/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
October 1, 2008 24 Proposed Order re 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Peter J. Willsey by Google Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
October 1, 2008 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Peter J. Willsey ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611003981.) filed by Google Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
September 30, 2008 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Graham Rhodes (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 21 Notice of Pendency of Other Action case number 08-CV-4543 filed on 8/11/08 pending at the District Court of Illinois Eastern Division (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2)(Norton, Leo) (Filed on 9/30/2008) Modified on 10/1/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2008 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google Inc. (Norton, Leo) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 19 NOTICE by Google Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Norton, Leo) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Google Inc.. (Norton, Leo) (Filed on 9/30/2008) Modified on 10/1/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 17 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 5 Motion to Relate Case; denying 9 Motion to Relate Case (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 12, 2008 16 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint re 15 Stipulation filed by Google Inc. Response due 9/30/2008. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/12/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 10, 2008 15 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Google Inc.. (Norton, Leo) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 8, 2008 14 DECLARATION of Leo P. Norton in Opposition to 9 MOTION to Relate C08-3452 RMW and C08-3888 SI Case with C08-3369 JW, 5 MOTION to Relate C08-3369 JW, C08-3452 RMW, C08-3888 SI Cases Consolidated filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 9 , 5 ) (Norton, Leo) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 8, 2008 13 Memorandum in Opposition re 9 MOTION to Relate C08-3452 RMW and C08-3888 SI Case with C08-3369 JW, 5 MOTION to Relate C08-3369 JW, C08-3452 RMW, C08-3888 SI Cases filed byGoogle Inc.. (Norton, Leo) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 3, 2008 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hal K. Levitte (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 9/3/2008)
September 3, 2008 11 Proposed Order re: 9 Motion to relate cases by Hal K. Levitte. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 9/3/2008) Modified on 9/3/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).(counsel failed to properly link to motion.)
September 3, 2008 10 Declaration of Willem F. Jonckheer in Support of Plaintiff Hal K. Levitte's Administrative 9 Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Hal K. Levitte. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 9/3/2008) Modified on 9/3/2008 (counsel failed to properly link to motion.)(cv, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2008 9 MOTION to Relate C08-3452 RMW, C08-3888 SI Case to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related to C08-3369 JW Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 filed by Hal K. Levitte. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 9/3/2008) Modified on 9/3/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2008 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pulaski & Middleman, LLC re 5 MOTION to Relate Case (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
September 2, 2008 7 Proposed Order re 5 MOTION to Relate Case by Pulaski & Middleman, LLC. (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
September 2, 2008 6 Declaration in Support of 5 MOTION to Relate Case filed byPulaski & Middleman, LLC. (Related document(s) 5 ) (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
September 2, 2008 5 MOTION to Relate C08-3369 JW, C08-3452 RMW, C08-3888 SI Cases filed by Pulaski & Middleman, LLC. (Saveri, Guido) (Filed on 9/2/2008) Modified on 9/3/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2008 4 PROOF OF SERVICE by Hal K. Levitte re 2 ADR Scheduling Order, 1 Complaint, 3 Summons Issued (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2008)
July 14, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2008)
July 11, 2008 2 Featured Case ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/16/2009. Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/11/08. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2008)
July 11, 2008 3 Summons Issued as to Google Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2008) (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2008 1 COMPLAINT (summons issued) against Google Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611003506.). Filed byHal K. Levitte. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2008: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levitte v. Google Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hal K. Levitte
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Kralowec
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]