Realnetworks, Inc. et al v. DVD Copy Control Association, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff RealNetworks, Inc. and RealNetworks Home Entertainment, Inc. filed an action for a declaratory judgment that the CSS License Agreement permits Plaintiffs to manufacture and offer for sale the RealDVD product and that the Plaintiffs do not violate the DMCA.

Plaintiff: Realnetworks, Inc. and Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.
Defendant: DVD Copy Control Association, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. and Viacom, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2008cv04548
Filed: September 30, 2008
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Copyright Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:101 Copyright Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2008 10
Proposed Order Temporary Retraining Order and Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc.. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 11
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. PROOF OF SERVICE (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 12
Ex Parte Application Application to Seal (1) Notice of Application and Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities and (2) Declaration of Glenn D. Pomerantz in Support of Ex Parte Application filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc.. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 13
Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Application to Seal (1) Notice of Application and Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; and (2) Declaration of Glenn D. Pomerantz in Support of Ex Parte Application by Disney Enterprises, Inc.. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 14
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 15
COUNTERCLAIM CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 7 against Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.. Filed byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 16
REPLY to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Application for TRO and OSC re Preliminary Injunction filed byRealnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.. (Bal, Colleen) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 17
NOTICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 18
NOTICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. re 11 Certificate of Service NOTICE OF ERRATA (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 19
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE (Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
September 30, 2008 1
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief (Summons Issued); jury demand; against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611023854). Filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
October 1, 2008 2
EXHIBIT - 1 to the Complaint for Declaratory Relief re 1 Complaint, filed by Realnetworks, Inc., Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
October 1, 2008 3
ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/20/2009. Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2009 01:30 PM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
October 1, 2008 4
Summons Issued as to DVD Copy Control Association, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
October 1, 2008 5
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
October 3, 2008 6
Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Viacom, Inc. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Text modified on 10/3/2008 (bw, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 7
ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs byDisney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 8
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Lynch, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 9
Certificate of Interested Entities by Disney Enterprises, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corp., Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 10/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Realnetworks, Inc. et al v. DVD Copy Control Association, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Realnetworks, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy Tosh Lane, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Realnetworks Home Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy Tosh Lane, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVD Copy Control Association, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disney Enterprises, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Pictures Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBC Universal, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]