Multiven, Inc. v. Cisco Systems, Inc.

Plaintiff: Multiven, Inc.
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2008cv05391
Filed: December 1, 2008
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Anti-Trust Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2010 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 76 Motion to Limit Scope of Confidentiality Agreement Signed by James Light and for Relief from 7-Hour Deposition Limit by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
March 11, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to the Complaint re 12 Stipulation. Deadline to file response by 3/27/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/11/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
March 7, 2010 147 Opinion or Order of the Court INTERIM ORDER re 129 Motion to Quash Subpoenas and Deposition Notices and for Protective Order filed by Pingsta, Inc., Multiven, Inc., Peter Alfred Adekeye. Supplemental briefs due 3/16/2010. Motion Hearing continued to 3/30/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. See order for more details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/7/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2010)
March 27, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to the Complaint and Modifying the Date of the Case Management Conference re 14 Stipulation. Deadline to respond to complaint due 5/1/2009. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/1/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/27/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 24, 2010 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART 129 Motion to Quash by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 24, 2010 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 137 Motion for Sanctions by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
May 1, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to the Complaint and Modifying the Date of the Case Management Conference re 16 Stipulation. Answer due 5/18/2009. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 6/5/2009, Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/1/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 13, 2010 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER; SETTING DEPOSITION OF PETER ALFRED-ADEKEYE; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDA; SETTING FURTHER HEARING ONPARTIES' CROSS-MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/13/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
May 12, 2010 209 Opinion or Order of the Court INTERIM ORDER re 155 Motion for Sanctions AND 196 Motion to Compel filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/12/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 27, 2010 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 211 Counterdefendants' Motion to Shorten Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 05/27/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
June 21, 2010 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 155 Cisco's Motion for FRCP 37 Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 06/21/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 22, 2010 240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 196 Cisco's Motion to Compel Production of Documents in Advance of Depositions. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 06/22/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 23, 2010 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 220 Cisco's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. The documents and excerpts listed in Exhibit A to the Declaration of Patrick Ryan filed with Docket No. 220 shall be filed under seal by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 06/23/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
July 9, 2010 265 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER GEORGE FISHER FOR DISCOVERY MATTERS re 264 Order on Report and Recommendations - Special Master (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 26, 2010 276 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND STIPULATION re 273 Stipulation, filed by Cisco Technology, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge James Ware on July 26, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND STIPULATION re 274 Stipulation filed by Cisco Technology, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge James Ware on July 26, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 28, 2010 279 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 278 Stipulation filed by Pingsta, Inc., Multiven, Inc., Peter Alfred Adekeye. The Clerk shall close this file.. Signed by Judge James Ware on July 28, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
February 23, 2011 281 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to file in the public record, in lieu of the original exhibits to Docket Entry re 280 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/23/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
June 10, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extension of Time for Counterdefendants' Time to Respond to the Counterclaims re 27 Stipulation. Deadline to respond due 7/8/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/10/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
July 16, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING COUNTERDEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS re 36 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
August 12, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Extension of Time for Counterdefendants Multiven, Inc., Pingsta, Inc. and Peter Alfred-Adekeye to respond to complaint re 39 Stipulation. Deadline to respond by 9/4/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/12/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009) Modified on 8/12/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 47 REGARDING PROCEDURES FOR EXPERT WITNESS DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Seeborg on 10/15/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
December 1, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/1/2009. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
January 21, 2010 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 70 GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE MOTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 01/21/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010). Modified on 1/22/2010 (rslc1, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2008 9 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to the Complaint and Continuing the Date of the Case Management Conference re 8 Stipulation. Response to complaint due 3/6/209. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 4/24/2009. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/29/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Multiven, Inc. v. Cisco Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Multiven, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Ross Pepperman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]