Guzman v. Sheraton Hotel

Plaintiff: Alfonso Guzman
Defendant: Sheraton Hotel
Case Number: 5:2009cv03217
Filed: July 15, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on April 4, 2011. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
February 8, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER To Show Cause Why Case Should Not Be Dismissed For Failure To Prosecute. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on February 7, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
March 3, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER That Case Be Reassigned. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 3, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guzman v. Sheraton Hotel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Guzman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheraton Hotel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]